Araghi v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Case #: | 9:23-cv-80953 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jun 23, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jul 17, 2023 |
Case in other court: | California Northern, 3:23-cv-02390 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 20, 2023 5:36 AM EST |
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chattem Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DSM Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
GlaxoSmithkline LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kaiser Permanente International
|
|
Defendant
Patheon Manfacturing Services LLC
|
|
Defendant
Pfizer, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sanofi U.S. Services Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shahin Araghi
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, June 23, 2023 | ||
29 | 29 Case transferred in from California Northern; Case Number 3:23-cv-02390. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(jas). | |
Thursday, June 22, 2023 | ||
31 | 31 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of California Northern. Case Number 23-cv-02390 with documents 1-28. Assigned FLSD Case Number 23-cv-80953. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 20-md-2924. Clerks Note: JPML notified. (jas) | |
30 | 30 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jas) | |
28 | 28 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-116) by MDL Panel on 6/21/2023. (wsn, COURT STAFF) | |
Case transferred to the Southern District of Florida (MDL 2924). (wsn, COURT STAFF) | ||
Wednesday, June 21, 2023 | ||
27 | 27 CLERK'S NOTICE ON REASSIGNMENT. All pending motions will be taken off-calendar and must be re-noticed by the moving party for a new hearing according to Judge Thompson's available dates, dates of unavailability are listed on her webpage under the section "Scheduling Notes." The new hearing date must be at least five weeks from the date the motion was filed and at least three weeks from the date the re-notice is filed. The due date for any opposition or reply papers not yet filed shall be calculated in accordance with Civil Local Rule 7-3. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rfm, COURT USER) | |
Thursday, June 15, 2023 | ||
26 | 26 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/15/2023. (ls, COURT STAFF) | |
Case Reassigned to Judge Trina L Thompson. Judge Charles R. Breyer no longer assigned to the case. (as, COURT STAFF) | ||
Wednesday, June 14, 2023 | ||
25 | 25 Remark: Order of Recusal at 20 in case 3:20-cv-03915, pertains to all related cases. (ark, COURT STAFF) | |
24 | 24 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Judge Susan Illston no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 6/14/23.(as, COURT STAFF) | |
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
23 | 23 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/14/2023. (ec, COURT STAFF) | |
Friday, June 02, 2023 | ||
22 | 22 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING & REGISTRATION: The Motion to Stay All Proceedings Hearing is set for 6/23/2023 at 10:00 AM - Videoconference Only before Judge Susan Illston. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. MANDATORY ZOOM REGISTRATION: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at sicrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 6/14/2023 at 2 pm. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/si] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . Motion Hearing set for 6/23/2023 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Susan Illston. (ec, COURT STAFF). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) | |
21 | 21 Re-Notice of Motion Hearing re7 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed byGlaxoSmithKline LLC. (Bhimani, Jay) | |
Wednesday, May 31, 2023 | ||
20 | 20 CLERK'S NOTICE ON REASSIGNMENT: Counsel are instructed to re-notice any Motions which had previously been noticd. The Motion shall be set for a Friday at 10 a.m. (please review Judge Illston's "Scheduling Notes" for any closed dates). The briefing schedule remains UNCHANGED from the original filing date. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ec, COURT STAFF) | |
19 | 19 Case Reassigned to Judge Susan Illston. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (mbc, COURT STAFF) | |
18 | 18 Order by Judge Susan Illston granting (62) Administrative Motion Relating Case in case 3:20-cv-03913-SI.Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-03913-SI, 4:23-cv-02390-DMR(ec, COURT STAFF) | |
Tuesday, May 30, 2023 | ||
17 | 17 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by GlaxoSmithKline LLC.. (Bhimani, Jay) | |
Thursday, May 25, 2023 | ||
16 | 16 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANTS Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff and Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 6/1/2023. (ig, COURT STAFF) | |
15 | 15 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by GlaxoSmithKline LLC. (Bhimani, Jay) | |
Wednesday, May 24, 2023 | ||
14 | 14 Refund Status re13 Application for Refund Approved. (rgh, COURT STAFF) | |
Monday, May 22, 2023 | ||
13 | 13 Application for Refund, Receipt Number ACANDC-18271063 by GlaxoSmithKline LLC. (Bhimani, Jay) | |
Thursday, May 18, 2023 | ||
12 | 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by GlaxoSmithKline LLC re9 Notice (Other) Notice of Defendants' Notice of Related Case (Bhimani, Jay) | |
Wednesday, May 17, 2023 | ||
11 | 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by GlaxoSmithKline LLC re6 Certificate of Interested Entities,7 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation ,2 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed ,1 Notice of Removal,5 Certificate of Interested Entities,4 Notice of Appearance (Bhimani, Jay) | |
10 | 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by GlaxoSmithKline LLC re2 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed ,1 Notice of Removal, (Bhimani, Jay) | |
9 | 9 Notice of Defendants' Notice of Related Case by GlaxoSmithKline LLC(Bhimani, Jay) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
8 | 8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/9/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/16/2023 at 1:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (tn, COURT STAFF) | |
Tuesday, May 16, 2023 | ||
7 | 7 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by GlaxoSmithKline LLC. Motion Hearing set for 6/22/2023 01:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 5/30/2023. Replies due by 6/6/2023.(Bhimani, Jay) | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
6 | 6 Certificate of Interested Entities by GlaxoSmithKline LLC identifying Corporate Parent GlaxoSmithKline plc for GlaxoSmithKline LLC. (Bhimani, Jay) | |
5 | 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GlaxoSmithKline LLC identifying Corporate Parent GlaxoSmithKline plc for GlaxoSmithKline LLC. (Bhimani, Jay) | |
4 | 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jay L. Bhimani (Bhimani, Jay) | |
3 | 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/30/2023. (as, COURT STAFF) | |
2 | 2 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed filed by GlaxoSmithKline LLC.(Bhimani, Jay) | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. §§ 1332, 1441, AND 1446; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL from Superior Court of Alameda County. Their case number is 22CV017595, (Filing Fee: $402.00, receipt number BCANDC-18271063). Filed by GlaxoSmithKline LLC.(Bhimani, Jay) Modified on 5/17/2023 (tn, COURT STAFF). | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet |