Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Jonathan JC Grey
Referred: Curtis Ivy, Jr
Case #: 2:23-cv-10987
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Apr 27, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 24, 2023 5:02 AM EDT
Defendant
Belle Fountain Nursing & Rehabilitation Center, Inc.
Represented By
Christopher Rubey
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Christina M. Janice
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Costanzo Z. Lijoi
Moore Penna & Associates PLLC
contact info
Mark W. Wallin
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jessica Drumm
Represented By
Austin W. Anderson
Anderson Alexander, PLLC
contact info
Austin Anderson
Anderson Alexander, PLLC
contact info
Andrew W. Dunlap
Josephson Dunlap LLP
contact info
Jennifer Lossia McManus
Fagan Mcmanus, P.C.
contact info
William M. Hogg
Josephson Dunlap LLP
contact info
Michael A. Josephson
Josephson Dunlap LLP
contact info
William Clifton Alexander
Anderson Alexander, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
minutes Motion Hearing Fri 04/25 3:53 PM
Minute Entry for remote proceedings before District Judge Jonathan J.C. Grey: Motion Hearing held on 4/25/2025 re35 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by Jessica Drumm,34 Joint MOTION for FLSA Settlement Approval filed by Jessica Drumm Disposition: Motion taken under advisement (Court Reporter: Leann Lizza) (SOso)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
39 39 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 04/21 9:03 PM
REPLY to Response re35 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by Jessica Drumm. (Hogg, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit - Supplemental Declaration of William Hogg,
Att: 2 Exhibit 4 - Medlegal Final Arbitration Award,
Att: 3 Exhibit 5 - 2014 NLJ Billing Survey,
Att: 4 Exhibit 6 - AutoAlliance - Order on Attorney Fees
38 38 motion File Excess Pages Mon 04/21 7:34 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re: Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs by Jessica Drumm. (Hogg, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order
Monday, April 14, 2025
37 37 respm Response to Motion Mon 04/14 9:48 PM
RESPONSE to35 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by Belle Fountain Nursing & Rehabilitation Center, Inc.. (Rubey, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Christopher Rubey and Corresponding Exhibits
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
36 36 notice Hearing on Motion* Wed 04/02 4:57 PM
NOTICE OF REMOTE HEARING on34 Joint MOTION for FLSA Settlement Approval ,35 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs . Motion Hearing set for 4/25/2025 01:30 PM before District Judge Jonathan J.C. Grey |Remote Access Phone Number: 6692545252 and Meeting ID: 160 301 6649| (SOso)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
35 35 motion Attorney Fees Mon 03/31 9:55 PM
MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs by Jessica Drumm. (Hogg, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of WMH,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of WMH,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of WMH,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of WMH,
Att: 5 Declaration of McManus,
Att: 6 Declaration of Anderson
34 34 motion Motion - Free Mon 03/31 2:18 PM
Joint MOTION for FLSA Settlement Approval by Jessica Drumm. (Hogg, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Settlement Agreement
Monday, January 27, 2025
33 33 notice Notice - Other Mon 01/27 1:13 PM
NOTICE by Jessica Drumm of Settlement (Hogg, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
32 32 28 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel Order on Motion to Strike Fri 09/20 8:59 AM
ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part Plaintiff's Motion to Compel (ECF No.18 ) and Denying Defendant's Motion to Strike (ECF No.21 ). Signed by District Judge Jonathan J.C. Grey. (SOso)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
minutes Motion Hearing Thu 05/30 10:01 AM
Minute Entry for remote proceedings before District Judge Jonathan J.C. Grey: Motion Hearing held on 5/29/2024 re18 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Jessica Drumm Disposition: Motion taken under advisement (Court Reporter: Leann Lizza) (SOso)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
31 31 notice Hearing on Motion* Tue 05/28 4:36 PM
RE-NOTICE OF REMOTE HEARING on18 MOTION to Compel Discovery . Motion Hearing set for 5/29/2024 03:00 PM before District Judge Jonathan J.C. Grey ***PLEASE MAKE NOTE TO APPEAR VIA ZOOM *** |Remote Access Phone Number: 6468287666 and Meeting ID: 160 757 1065| (SOso)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
30 30 misc Statement of Resolved and Unresolved Issues Wed 05/22 5:18 PM
STATEMENT of Resolved and Unresolved Issues re18 MOTION to Compel Discovery by Jessica Drumm (Hogg, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
29 29 notice Hearing on Motion* Wed 05/15 9:48 AM
RE-NOTICE OF IN PERSON HEARING on18 MOTION to Compel Discovery . JOINT Resolved/Unresolved Issues due by 5/22/2024 Motion Hearing reset for 5/29/2024 03:00 PM before District Judge Jonathan J.C. Grey (SOso)
Related: [-]
order Text-Only Order Wed 05/15 9:35 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER: The Court set a hearing date on plaintiff's motion to compel discovery (ECF No.18 ) for May 15, 2024, at 10:00 a.m. Pursuant to the Honorable Jonathan J.C. Grey's practice guidelines, the parties were required to submit a joint list of unresolved issues by May 8, 2024. Due to the parties' failure to follow the Court's procedures, this hearing is adjourned to a later date in the future to be determined by the Court. SO ORDERED . Signed by District Judge Jonathan J.C. Grey. (SOso)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
28 28 misc Statement of Resolved and Unresolved Issues Tue 05/14 12:38 PM
STATEMENT of Resolved and Unresolved Issues re18 MOTION to Compel Discovery by Jessica Drumm (Hogg, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
27 27 notice Hearing on Motion* Wed 04/17 5:03 PM
NOTICE OF IN PERSON HEARING on18 MOTION to Compel Discovery . Resolved/Unresolved Issues due by 5/8/2024 Motion Hearing set for 5/15/2024 10:00 AM before District Judge Jonathan J.C. Grey (SOso)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Wed 04/17 4:59 PM
Minute Entry for remote proceedings before District Judge Jonathan J.C. Grey: Status Conference held on 4/17/2024 (Court Reporter: Christin Douglas) (SOso)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
26 26 notice Appear* Fri 04/05 3:59 PM
NOTICE TO APPEAR REMOTELY: Status Conference set for 4/17/2024 03:00 PM before District Judge Jonathan J.C. Grey |Remote Access Phone Number: 16468287666 and Meeting ID: 160 377 1819| (SOso)
Related: [-]
25 25 order Order on Motion - Free Fri 04/05 3:54 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER: On April 2, 2024, plaintiff Jessica Drumm filed a motion requesting a status conference. (ECF No.24 .) Upon GOOD CAUSE shown, the Court GRANTS Drumm's motion for a status conference. The Court will hold a remote status conference with parties on April 17, 2024 at 3:00 p.m. SO ORDERED . Signed by District Judge Jonathan J.C. Grey. (SOso)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
24 24 motion Motion - Free Tue 04/02 11:02 AM
MOTION Requesting a Status Conference by Jessica Drumm. (Hogg, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, November 30, 2023
23 23 trial Exhibit Thu 11/30 8:55 PM
EXHIBIT Proposed Order re22 Response to Motion, by Jessica Drumm (Hogg, William)
Related: [-]
22 22 respm Response to Motion Thu 11/30 8:54 PM
RESPONSE to21 MOTION to Strike20 Reply to Response to Motion to Compel Discovery and Cross-Motion for an Extension of Time filed by Jessica Drumm. (Hogg, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Potter v. Dawn Food Products - Dkt. 20,
Att: 2 Exhibit Declaration of William Hogg
21 21 motion Strike Thu 11/30 4:03 PM
MOTION to Strike20 Reply to Response to Motion to Compel Discovery by Belle Fountain Nursing & Rehabilitation Center, Inc.. (Rubey, Christopher)
Related: [-]
20 20 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 11/30 12:35 PM
REPLY to Response re18 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Jessica Drumm. (Hogg, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
19 19 respm Response to Motion Wed 11/22 7:54 PM
RESPONSE to18 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Belle Fountain Nursing & Rehabilitation Center, Inc.. (Rubey, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - October 17, 2023 Email,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Interrogatories,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Defendant's Initial Disclosures,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Christopher Rubey
Thursday, November 09, 2023
18 18 motion Compel Thu 11/09 5:58 PM
MOTION to Compel Discovery by Jessica Drumm. (Hogg, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Email correspondence,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Email correspondence,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Email correspondence,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Defendant's Answers to Interrogatories,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Defendant's Responses to Requests for Production,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - Email correspondence,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 - Email correspondence,
Att: 8 Exhibit - Declaration of William Hogg,
Att: 9 Exhibit - Proposed Order
Thursday, September 07, 2023
17 17 notice Appearance Thu 09/07 6:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Rubey on behalf of All Defendants. (Rubey, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 16, 2023
16 16 misc Attorney Appearance Wed 08/16 5:40 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Costanzo Z. Lijoi appearing on behalf of All Defendants (Lijoi, Costanzo)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Scheduling Order Wed 08/16 5:06 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/15/2024 Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 5/17/2024 Jury Trial set for 3/3/2025 08:30 AM before District Judge Jonathan J.C. Grey Signed by District Judge Jonathan J.C. Grey. Related [+] (SOso)
Related: [-] fer to image for additional dates
minutes Scheduling Conference Wed 08/16 4:02 PM
Minute Entry for virtual proceedings before District Judge Jonathan J.C. Grey: Scheduling Conference held on 8/16/2023 (Court Reporter: Digitally Recorded) (SOso)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines Wed 08/16 5:09 PM
Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Jury Trial reset for 3/4/2025 08:30 AM before District Judge Jonathan J.C. Grey (SOso)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 09, 2023
14 14 misc Discovery Plan - Rule 26f Wed 08/09 7:13 PM
DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Hogg, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Model ESI Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Default Protective Order
Tuesday, August 08, 2023
13 13 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Tue 08/08 10:50 AM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Belle Fountain Nursing & Rehabilitation Center, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Belle Fountain Nursing & Rehabilitation Center Inc. for Belle Fountain Nursing & Rehabilitation Center, Inc.. (Wallin, Mark)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Appearance Tue 08/08 10:45 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mark W. Wallin on behalf of Belle Fountain Nursing & Rehabilitation Center, Inc.. (Wallin, Mark)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 03, 2023
11 11 notice Appear* Thu 08/03 1:28 PM
NOTICE TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 8/16/2023 03:30 PM before District Judge Jonathan J.C. Grey ***Parties are to file FRCP 26(f) one week prior to conference*** |Zoom Webinar Information: https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1615673376?pwd=MmtXWGhQc0dVcnN6V0lYaHo4dTlGQT09 Passcode: 335512 Or One tap mobile : +16692545252,,1615673376# US (San Jose) +16692161590,,1615673376# US (San Jose) Or Telephone: Dial(for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): +1 669 254 5252 US (San Jose) +1 669 216 1590 US (San Jose) +1 415 449 4000 US (US Spanish Line) +1 551 285 1373 US +1 646 828 7666 US (New York) +1 646 964 1167 US (US Spanish Line) Webinar ID: 161 567 3376 International numbers available: https://www.zoomgov.com/u/aMSuNZ2da Or an H.323/SIP room system: H.323: 161.199.138.10 (US West) or 161.199.136.10 (US East) Meeting ID: 161 567 3376 Passcode: 335512 SIP: 1615673376@sip.zoomgov.com Passcode: 335512| (SOso)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 24, 2023
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 07/24 11:42 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Belle Fountain Nursing & Rehabilitation Center, Inc.. (Janice, Christina)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 26, 2023
order Text-Only Reassignment Mon 06/26 2:34 PM
Text-Only Order of reassignment from District Judge Shalina D. Kumar to District Judge Jonathan J.C. Grey pursuant to Administrative Order 23-AO-022. Except in cases previously referred to a magistrate judge, existing scheduling orders and motion hearing dates are suspended. Status conferences will be scheduled in the near future for general civil cases. Cases referred to a magistrate judge will keep all previously scheduled dates. (SSch)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 01, 2023
9 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Jessica Drumm waiver sent on 5/24/2023, answer due 7/24/2023. (Josephson, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 30, 2023
8 8 NOTICE of Appearance by William M. Hogg on behalf of Jessica Drumm. (Hogg, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 19, 2023
7 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Austin Anderson on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Anderson, Austin)
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE of Appearance by William Clifton Alexander on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Alexander, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 27, 2023
5 5 NOTICE by Jessica Drumm of Filing Notice of Consent (Josephson, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Consent
4 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew W. Dunlap on behalf of Jessica Drumm. (Dunlap, Andrew)
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Josephson on behalf of Jessica Drumm. (Josephson, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Belle Fountain Nursing & Rehabilitation Center, Inc.* (TTho)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT ORIGINAL COLLECTIVE ACTION COMPLAINT and JURY DEMAND filed by Jessica Drumm against Belle Fountain Nursing & Rehabilitation Center, Inc. with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9328240 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (McManus, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Consent to Join - Drumm
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (TTho)
Related: [-]