Harper et al v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-02837 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jun 21, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Alabama Northern, 2:23-cv-00669 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 19, 2023 4:14 AM EST |
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Amercas Inc
|
|
Defendant
Allstar Fire Equipment
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corp
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Fire-Dex LLC
780 Progress Dr.
Medina, OH 44256 |
|
Defendant
Globe Manufacturing Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Honeywell Safety Products USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
Lion Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
Mallory Safety and Supply LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Municipal Emergency Services Inc
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
PBI Performance Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Southern Mills Inc
|
|
Defendant
Stedfast USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
WL Gore & Associates Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
Carl J Harper
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leon Guy Patterson, Sr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wayne Earl Paul
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Joseph Payn
|
|
Plaintiff
Antonio Andrea Payne, Sr
|
|
Plaintiff
David William Payne
|
|
Plaintiff
Dennis Russel Payne
|
|
Plaintiff
Patrick Henry Payne
|
|
Plaintiff
Robert Herbert Peabody
|
|
Plaintiff
Philip Miles Peacock
|
|
Plaintiff
Medwin F Peck
|
|
Plaintiff
Jay Dural Pederson
|
|
Plaintiff
Charles Garry Penhale
|
|
Plaintiff
Delma Benard Penn
|
|
Plaintiff
Robert Joseph Pepin
|
|
Plaintiff
Fredrick Arthur Perdue
|
|
Plaintiff
Abel Perez
|
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Joel Perez
|
|
Plaintiff
Michael Keith Perry
|
|
Plaintiff
Stephen Scott Perry
|
|
Plaintiff
Michael Perryman
|
|
Plaintiff
Allen Peters
|
|
Plaintiff
James Jay Peterson
|
|
Plaintiff
John Logan Petrey
|
|
Plaintiff
Archelle Petrucci, Jr.
|
|
Plaintiff
Jack Franklin Pettit
|
|
Plaintiff
James Ely Pety
|
|
Plaintiff
Jay Thomas Petz
|
|
Plaintiff
Rodney Joe Pevytoe
|
|
Plaintiff
Brian Phillips
|
|
Plaintiff
Robert Louie Phillips
|
|
Plaintiff
William Phillips
|
|
Plaintiff
Gino Mario Picciolo
|
|
Plaintiff
Reginald K Pickens
|
|
Plaintiff
Abel Pierce
|
|
Plaintiff
Joe A Pierce
|
|
Plaintiff
Kenna Pierce
|
|
Plaintiff
Martin John Pike
|
|
Plaintiff
Michael Emerson Pinelli
|
|
Plaintiff
Rodney Pitts
|
|
Plaintiff
Dan Russell Platt
|
|
Plaintiff
James Christian Poehlman
|
|
Plaintiff
Austin Francis Pohl, II
|
|
Plaintiff
Elmer Raymond Poirier
|
|
Plaintiff
Melvin Wayne Polk
|
|
Plaintiff
Ernest William Pollock, Jr
|
|
Plaintiff
Clarence Lee Poore
|
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Bryant Pope
|
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Martin Poste
|
|
Plaintiff
Thomas James Postell, Sr
|
|
Plaintiff
Jesse Powell, Jr
|
|
Plaintiff
Daryl Mark Premmer
|
|
Plaintiff
Arnold Scott Presley
|
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Andrew Pressley
|
|
Plaintiff
Vernon Bernard Pressley
|
|
Plaintiff
Fred William Prevo
|
|
Plaintiff
Edward Price
|
|
Plaintiff
Nenus Ray Price
|
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Wayne Price
|
|
Plaintiff
Woodrow Price, Jr
|
|
Plaintiff
Ted Edward Pritchard
|
|
Plaintiff
Wilbert Pritchett
|
|
Plaintiff
Matthew Arthur Probst
|
|
Plaintiff
Perry Proctor
|
|
Plaintiff
Jonathan Gus Prokopis
|
|
Plaintiff
Ruggero Provenghi
|
|
Plaintiff
Michael Putnam
|
|
Plaintiff
Maurice Russell Rakestraw, II
|
|
Plaintiff
Stenley Joseph Rakowsky
|
|
Plaintiff
Nelson Ramos
|
|
Plaintiff
James A Ramsey
|
|
Plaintiff
Raymond Roger Ramsey
|
|
Plaintiff
Philip Joseph Randall
|
|
Plaintiff
Julian Robert Raper, III
|
|
Plaintiff
Lyn Lee Rapp
|
|
Plaintiff
Richard Rapson
|
|
Plaintiff
Terry Lynn Ratliff
|
|
Plaintiff
Ellis Ray
|
|
Plaintiff
Howard Rechtschaffen
|
|
Plaintiff
Rickey Dean Redmon
|
|
Plaintiff
Nathaniel Phoebie Reed
|
|
Plaintiff
Thomas John Reed
|
|
Plaintiff
Benjamin Charles Reese
|
|
Plaintiff
Robert Chester Reese
|
|
Plaintiff
Scott Keith Reid
|
|
Plaintiff
Stephen James Renison
|
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Gerard Renkas, Sr
|
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Michael Renz
|
|
Plaintiff
William Howard Rhodes
|
|
Plaintiff
William Quinlevan Rice
|
|
Plaintiff
Robert Elroy Richards, Jr
|
|
Plaintiff
Charles A Richardson
|
|
Plaintiff
David Carter Richardson
|
|
Plaintiff
Kelly Brian Richardson
|
|
Plaintiff
Rolland Lyle Richarson
|
|
Plaintiff
Henry Anthony Richter
|
|
Plaintiff
John Gregory Rickabaugh
|
|
Plaintiff
Carl Branch Rickerson
|
|
Plaintiff
James Michael Ridgway
|
|
Plaintiff
Oliver Augustus Riggs, Jr
|
|
Plaintiff
Robert James Rihel
|
|
Plaintiff
Aleck Joseph Rinaldo
|
|
Plaintiff
Douglas Donald Rinella
|
|
Plaintiff
Mark Andrew Rinkevicz
|
|
Plaintiff
David Lee Rivers
|
|
Plaintiff
Joe Robbins
|
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Patrick Robbins
|
|
Plaintiff
John Richard Roberts
|
|
Plaintiff
Michael Ronald Roberts
|
|
Plaintiff
Daniel James Robertson
|
|
Plaintiff
Gregory Lloyd Robertson
|
|
Plaintiff
Timothy Robertson, Sr
|
|
Plaintiff
Donald Stanley Wilson
|
|
Plaintiff
Dwayne Samuel Forde Wilson
|
|
Plaintiff
Brent Curtis Wimpee
|
|
Plaintiff
David Gerald Winans
|
|
Plaintiff
Bob Thomas Winbush
|
|
Plaintiff
Derek Lionel Wingfield
|
|
Plaintiff
Timothy Laurie Winters
|
|
Plaintiff
Dennis George Wise
|
|
Plaintiff
Bernard Francis Wojciechowski
|
|
Plaintiff
Teddy Leroy Wolfe, Jr
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, September 09, 2024 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 09/09 10:22 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kenneth Charles Shaw Et al., Edwin Gomez, Sr, Ronald Spontak Et al., Brian James Rizner Et al., Terri Smith, Robert Turley, Christopher Burris Et al., John Dunn, Kathy Battle, David C Bolt, Paul A Brady, Raegan Dowdell, Tommie Reese, Sharon Sizer, Joseph Michauskas Et al., Gary Hanna Et al., John Belton Et al., Craig Tully, Abel Perez, Allen Kairis, Andrew Plumlee, RUSSELL LEE LORD, Teresa Harrell, Nina Jones, John Perez, Benjamin Smith, Jr, Dwight Taylor, Steve Dubosky, Larry Beemer Et al., Keith Alan Bluestein, James Ouzts Et al. Carl Sarvey as to Hanna, et al; Robert Raymond Bonomini as to Shaw, et al; Ellis Nakamura as to Shaw, et al; Melvin Alex Garcia as to Beemer, et al; Kevin Hinzo as to Burris, et al; Randall Jones, Jr., as to Ouzts, et al; Alonzo E. Lagle as to Ouzts, et al; Mitchell Feller as to Belton, et al; Robert C. Powell, Sr. as to Rizner, et al; Joey Rios, III as to Rizner, et al; Chris Ban Noy as to Spontak, et al; Will A. Peden, Jr. as to Spontak, et al; James Desmond Bocek as to Michauskas, et al; Raymond Chenevert as to Michauskas, et al; Eric Cordy as to Michauskas, et al; WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Wednesday, September 04, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 09/04 12:03 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Dominick Frazia, Kevin O. Goins, Steven James Hart, Issac Hatton, Roger Ralph Reed, Richard Bryan Shearin, Michael Sherman, James Smith, Michael E Smith, Desi D Wade, Robert Thomas Welch, Lawrence Edward Wells, Frank Edward White, Sr, Michael William Stockton, David A Wrightson, Raymond Roger Ramsey, William Edward Carr, James Ray Carwile, Neil Colosi, Frank Sefl, Jr, Ildebarando Boby Francone, Thomas Joseph Futterer, Russell Ackerman, Richard F Blackford, Ralph Charles Alario, II, Kenneth Aman, Jose Pabalan Bautista, Gene Spencer, John Joseph Sweeney, Lee Richard Tague, Gary Martin Blasingame, Senator Madison Brunson, Nelson Blaine Burk, Mitchell Clay McDonald, Jr, Stephen Brad McLaughlin, Jeffrey D Meddin, Greg Miller, Lawrence Mitchell Moore, Bruce Lester Morgan, William Niefer, John N Peterson, Michael Patrick Donovan, Joe Louis Duster, Michael Alan Chance, Anthony Creen, Brently Ian Dorsey, Michael Doust, Rajah Echols, Anthony D Elzy, Perry Jerome Fields Of Particular Personal Injury Claims WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
31 | 31
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 09/04 11:13 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Fred Allen Johnson, Sr, Lloyd Randal Lowe, Stephen Walter Miller, Gregory Mark Mullaley, Elijah James Oliver, Janice Winchester, Eric Firdaus Weilenman, Charles Carlyle Whitmore, Jr, Philip Miles Peacock, Charles Garry Penhale, Abel Perez, Robert Elroy Richards, Jr, Sean Craig Ronsen, Sr, Steven Allen Ross, William Louis Schaff, Jr, Michael Paul Sexton, Charles Edward Shannon, Joe Lynn Wooley, Robert Duane Colt, John Rico Cortest, Richard Andrew Couvillon, Jr, Gregory John Crispo, John Charles Fields, Johnnie Winston Busby, Teriko J Adams, Carlie Adams Mosley, Maria Quintans Godfrey, Betty Louise Thomas, Esther Lynn Gomes, Edward J Fitzgerald, Willie James Allen, Demetris Batts, Patrick James Baumgard, John Keith Berry, James P Smith, Leonard Vaughn Steving, Fred B. Stewart, Gerard Sullivan, Dennis Albert O'Key, Mundo Valez Olford, Cynthia Carner, Wesley Scott Bitner, Gary Dean Brabant, Gary Paul Broughton, Harold Gregory Brown, Sr, David Quinn Davis, Larry Darnell Dickerson, Robert Raymond Ducharme, Sandra Conley, Robert Cott Cook Of Particular Personal Injury Claims WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Status Report
Tue 08/27 11:51 PM
STATUS REPORT - General Denial and Statement of Affirmative Defenses by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
29 | 29
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 08/27 10:26 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent MSA Safety Inc. for Globe Manufacturing Company LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
28 | 28
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/27 8:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige) |
|
27 | 27
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/27 5:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 08/14 1:24 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Donnie Ray Smith, James Allen Smith, William Becker Spaun, Jr, Dwayne Erbin Steele, Larry Stiles, Calvin Stripling, Jr, Jere Richard Strizek, Robert Daryl Stucker, Douglas Edward Sykes, Michael Irwin Talley, Sr, William Lawrence Tassian, Harry Lewis Taylor, Jr, Carlton Lumm Terry, Clarence Thompson, James Bennie Tillerson, Ronald Wayne Timberman, David William Payne, James Ely Pety, Jay Thomas Petz, Martin John Pike, Rodney Pitts, Austin Francis Pohl, II, Elmer Raymond Poirier, Anthony Bryant Pope, Fred William Prevo, Ronald Wayne Price, Wilbert Pritchett, Philip Joseph Randall, Thomas John Reed, Henry Anthony Richter, Bob Thomas Winbush, Harold Roell, Jr, Eddie Rogers, Kenneth John Rogers, Benny T. Ruiz, Thomas Ray Russell, Richard Matthew Sadowski, George Samuels, Jr, Dewayne Lee Saxton, Jan Steven Schatzberg, Ronald Dennis Schlitt, Baldomero Ozuna, Ray Charles Parker, James Walter Parrott, Sr, August Pasquariello, Douglas Wilson, Harold Joseph Wilson WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-02836-RMG, 2:23-cv-02837-RMG, 2:23-cv-02838-RMG, 2:23-cv-02839-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 07/17 8:49 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Burt Gam, Ronald David Gerding, Patrick M. Hamer, Patrick Hilton, Allen Wilson Valentine, III, William Lamont Wade, Edwin Eugene Welch, David Joseph Wetzel, Wayne Williams, Randy Garfield, Timothy Moffett, Rusty Myers, Norris Gene Thomas, Robert Cleveland Upchurch, Kenneth Mize, David Tooley, John Wygant, Andrew Anderson Et al., Carl J Harper, Allen Peters, Kenna Pierce, Perry Proctor, Ruggero Provenghi, James A Ramsey, Pablo Carrasco, Warren Cook, Daniel Austin Davis, James A Robinson, Gregory Michael Sawka, Matthew J. Shields, Herston John Simmons, Bruce Carey Sims, Gary M Lohmeier, Jose Antonio Loquiao, Scott Lundgren, John Manzi, Brian Marsh, John Steven McDuff, David Medina, Jodey Michelson, Larry James Miller, William Paul Ernst, David Friend, Donald P Loren, Archie Charles Williams Charles Bradley Claywell as to Anderson, et al; Paul Joseph Dudzinski as to Anderson, et al; Thomas Keith League as to Anderson, et al; James Harold Patton, Jr. as to Anderson, et al; Joseph Chester Vann as to Anderson, et al; Richard Ray Tallman as to Thompson, et al; WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 07/16 10:43 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kelvin Donnell Battle, Sr, Timothy Jon Bendekovic, Willaim Paul Bentley, James Felix Binkowski, Mark Michael Bonsanti, Jonathan Hogg, Kenneth Wayne Johnson, Jenni L Jones, Patrick Psarras, John Rossetti, Craig Mark Sanders, Alton Norman Shook, Ronald Jay Toxey, George Godfrey Watkins, Jr, Robert Allen Young, Richard Mosely, Daniel Murphy, William Owen Nuss, Charles Daniel O'Neil, Gus Wilson, Willie L Thomas, James Rickey Thompson, David Willingham, Paul E Wilson, Jr, Jimmy Smith, Kevin James Smith, Michael Alan Stetler, Thomas Calvin Stoudt, Craig Allen Strauss, Timothy Allen Tanno, Sr, Destiny McCowen, Fredrick Arthur Perdue, John Logan Petrey, Dan Russell Platt, Charles A Richardson, Demitricus Torres Coleman, Eduardo Del Valle, David Johnathan Edwards, Douglas Michael Rosell, John Schoen, Paul L. Simonson, Charles Edwin Sledge, Jose Cruz Espinoza, Jr, John M Fahrer, Larry Ray Farrah, Franklin Gerald Ferguson, Sr, Edward William Floyd, Clifton E Gaddie, Thomas Heinz Gibbs Notice of Voluntary dismissal by Derrick Tamar Thompson Et al as to James Nicholas Ungren; WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Tuesday, July 02, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 07/02 10:40 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by James C Smith, Raymond Alan Smith, Richard Taylor Smith, Michael G. Smith, William Stanley Smith, James Harry Sorensen, Winston Doyle Spencer, Eugene Jones Stephenson, Paul Vincent Steusel, Grady Stewart, Alfred Dean Swift, Martin John Tallent, Richard Stewart Taylor, Robert S. Thomas, Daniel Jerrold Thomas, Leland C. Thomas, Ralph david Thomas, Gil Ray Thompson, Raymond Timmer, Teddy Leroy Wolfe, Jr, Joe Earl Rogers, George Francis Rose, Michael Anthony Roussell, David Herman Rucker, Sr, Eric L. Ruggs, Kenneth W. Russell, Steve Martin Sager, Jr, Ersa Lynn Sample, Willie James Saulsberry, David Wayne Savage, Kenneth Duane Schmidt, Roger Jeffry Schoot, Glenn Allen Schultz, Charles Harrison Scott, Douglas Dale Senn, Barbara Ellen Shaw, Daniel Rollin Shrum, David K. Shultz, Claire Christine Sims, Timothy Williams Eubanks, Dennis D Ewing, John Patrick Farrigan, Alvin Floyd, Jonathan Gregory Floyd, David Edward Foley, Cliff Ford, Jr, Jerome Edward Franks, Grant Alvin Gay, Jr, Phillip Nathaniel Williams, Sr, Tony Devern Williamson WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-02837-RMG, 2:23-cv-02838-RMG, 2:23-cv-02839-RMG, 2:23-cv-02840-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 07/02 8:08 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Andrew Anderson Et al., Dennis Russel Payne, Jay Dural Pederson, Delma Benard Penn, James Christian Poehlman, Melvin Wayne Polk, Jesse Powell, Jr, Vernon Bernard Pressley, Jonathan Gus Prokopis, Maurice Russell Rakestraw, II, Nelson Ramos, Julian Robert Raper, III, Lyn Lee Rapp, Ellis Ray, Howard Rechtschaffen, Rickey Dean Redmon, Nathaniel Phoebie Reed, Stephen James Renison, Mark Andrew Rinkevicz, Kenneth Patrick Robbins, John Richard Roberts, Timothy Robertson, Sr, Brent Curtis Wimpee, Randy Paul Miltier, Isidro Molina, David Michael Montgomery, Joseph M Moody, Charles Ace Moon, Paul Dupont Moore, Jr, Ransom Moreland, Jr, Brian Eugene Moses, Donald Wiley Muellhaupt, David Lee Murray, Lyle Laverne Musick, William Nolze, Leonard Robert O'Brian, Thomas John O'Connell, Michael Anthony Opalinski, Harold G Pappas, Jason Paul Parham, Ricky Tyrone Parker, Sr, Joseph O'Neal Pate, Martin Richard Willis, Robi Ted Willis, John Patrick McGaffin, Kirk Anthony McLaughlin, Kemper Neal Meade, Gary Lynn Meeks, David Bettencourt Mendonca, Alfred Miller Gregory Bunn as to Anderson, et al; WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-01746-RMG, 2:23-cv-02712-RMG, 2:23-cv-02836-RMG, 2:23-cv-02837-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Tuesday, June 25, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 06/25 10:42 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Reginald K Pickens, Abel Pierce, Joe A Pierce, Michael Emerson Pinelli, Ernest William Pollock, Jr, Clarence Lee Poore, Thomas Martin Poste, Thomas James Postell, Sr, Daryl Mark Premmer, Arnold Scott Presley, Thomas Andrew Pressley, Nenus Ray Price, Woodrow Price, Jr, Ted Edward Pritchard, Matthew Arthur Probst, Michael Putnam, Stenley Joseph Rakowsky, Richard Rapson, Terry Lynn Ratliff, Benjamin Charles Reese, Robert Chester Reese, Scott Keith Reid, Daniel Gerard Renkas, Sr, Thomas Michael Renz, William Howard Rhodes, William Quinlevan Rice, David Carter Richardson, Kelly Brian Richardson, Rolland Lyle Richarson, John Gregory Rickabaugh, Carl Branch Rickerson, James Michael Ridgway, Oliver Augustus Riggs, Jr, Robert James Rihel, Aleck Joseph Rinaldo, Douglas Donald Rinella, David Lee Rivers, Michael Ronald Roberts, Daniel James Robertson, Gregory Lloyd Robertson, Donald Stanley Wilson, Dwayne Samuel Forde Wilson, David Gerald Winans, Derek Lionel Wingfield, Timothy Laurie Winters, Dennis George Wise, Bernard Francis Wojciechowski Howard Reed; WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-02837-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 06/25 9:33 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Leon Guy Patterson, Sr, Wayne Earl Paul, John Joseph Payn, Antonio Andrea Payne, Sr, Patrick Henry Payne, Robert Herbert Peabody, Medwin F Peck, Robert Joseph Pepin, Michael Keith Perry, Stephen Scott Perry, Michael Perryman, James Jay Peterson, Archelle Petrucci, Jr, Jack Franklin Pettit, Rodney Joe Pevytoe, Brian Phillips, Robert Louie Phillips, Gino Mario Picciolo, Larry German Et al., Paul Morris Etheredge, Joseph Nickolas Evans, Gary Allen Farnum, Ron Anthony Fillman, Devon Edward Fletcher, Robert Flores, David J Floyd, Dennis Lee Fontelroy, Sr, Bobby L Ford, Joseph Michael Fortnash, Sr, Stephen James Foster, Kevin Ray Foundray, Woodard Carlton Fowler, Scott Francis Franken, Gregg Allan Fredericks, Rex Loren Frieze, James David Gadacz, John Steven Gajdek, Jr, Manuel Joseph Garcia, George Adam Gardis, Jr, William Charles Gebo, Walter John Gerber, Gary Lee Gillespie, Michael Kevin Gillespie, William John Miller, Otto Reynolds, Jr, Elmore Williams, Jr, Gerald Stephen Williams, Jeffrey Lee Williamson, John Allen Williamson Timothy Callahan as to German, et al WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-02837-RMG, 2:23-cv-02840-RMG, 2:23-cv-04525-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Thursday, June 06, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 06/06 3:56 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney James L. Stengel and Paige Pavone and to substitute in their place Joseph C. Orlet, Paul A. Calfo, and Dominique Savinelli by Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC. Response to Motion due by 6/20/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 04/01 1:47 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by William Phillips Without Prejudice Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-02837-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Tuesday, March 12, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 03/12 12:09 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company identifying Corporate Parent Sag Main Holding, LLC, Other Affiliate R&Q Insurance Holdings Ltd., Other Affiliate Obra Capital, Inc. for Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 03/12 11:06 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Global Manufacturing Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent MSA Safety Inc. for Global Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Monday, March 11, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 03/11 6:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 03/11 5:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Global Manufacturing Company LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Friday, February 09, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 02/09 10:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige) |
|
Monday, February 05, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 02/05 6:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Global Manufacturing Company LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige) |
|
Friday, October 13, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
Fri 10/13 6:34 PM
TEXT ORDER This Order Relates to Case Nos. et al. (as listed in the motion). The motion to substitute counsel of record (Dkt. No. 3719 in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.) is denied without prejudice. Counsel therein is not in fact attempting to "substitute" existing counsel in any given action for new counsel. Rather it appears counsel is attempting to make an appearance in various actions currently consolidated for pretrial proceedings before this Court. Counsel is directed to CMO 1 (Dkt. No. 3 at 3) (noting that counsel who appeared in the transferor district court prior to transfer need not enter a separate appearance or apply to proceed pro hac vice). To the extent counsel desires to file a notice of appearance related to the matters for which it seeks "substitution," it may do so. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 10/13/2023.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
|
Friday, September 22, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Substitute Attorney
Fri 09/22 1:56 AM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney by PBI Performance Products Inc. Response to Motion due by 10/6/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Van Zandt, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Substitution of Attorney | ||
Monday, June 26, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Mon 06/26 11:15 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Alabama Northern (associated as of 6/21/2023), 2:23-cv-00669, Harper et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-02837-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
6 | 6
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Mon 06/26 11:12 AM
Case transferred in from District of Alabama Northern; Case Number 2:23-cv-00669. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2023 | ||
5 | 5 ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of South Carolina for inclusion in MDL 2873; electronic record transferred to Clerk of Court in District of South Carolina. (KAM) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 6/26/2023.] | |
Wednesday, May 31, 2023 | ||
4 | 4 TEXT ORDER granting3 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendant 3M is ORDERED to respond to the complaint on or before 28 days after a transfer declination from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden on 05/31/2023. (SUH) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 6/26/2023.] | |
Tuesday, May 30, 2023 | ||
3 | 3 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Notice of Removal by 3M Company. (Radney, W) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 6/26/2023.] | |
Thursday, May 25, 2023 | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by 3M Company (KAM) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 6/26/2023.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M Company from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 2023-901278., filed by 3M Company.(KAM) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 6/26/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number AALNDC-4350425. related document1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M Company from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 2023-901278., filed by 3M Company.(KAM). (Radney, W) Modified on 5/25/2023 NDAL rec# B-5478(KAM). [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 6/26/2023.] |