Floyd et al v. 3M Company
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-02840 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jun 21, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Alabama Northern, 2:23-cv-00663 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 19, 2023 4:14 AM EST |
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corp
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Fire-Dex LLC
780 Progress Dr.
Medina, OH 44256 |
|
Defendant
Globe Manufacturing Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Honeywell Safety Products USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
Lion Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
Mallory Safety and Supply LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Municipal Emergency Services Inc
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
PBI Performance Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Southern Mills Inc
|
|
Defendant
Stedfast USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
as successor in interest to the Ansul Company One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
WI Gore & Associates Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
William Paul Ernst
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Larry Layne Eshleman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jose Cruz Espinoza, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Philip Thomas Esposito
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul Morris Etheredge
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Leroy Etzel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Timothy Williams Eubanks
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Nickolas Evans
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lejarrell Evans
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dennis D Ewing
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John M Fahrer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Fajardo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary Allen Farnum
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Larry Ray Farrah
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Patrick Farrigan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Michael Farrow
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Franklin Gerald Ferguson, Sr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald C Fernelius
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George Ferrell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Danny Joe Fetters
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Craig Feuer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Charles Fields
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ron Anthony Fillman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Fenton Filo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bret Finch
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Peter Fiorino, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jerreld Fisher
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Lea Fiske
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jerry Marlin Fleming
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Fleming
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul Fleming
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Devon Edward Fletcher
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Flores
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alvin Floyd
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David J Floyd
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edward William Floyd
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jonathan Gregory Floyd
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Edward Foley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dennis Lee Fontelroy, Sr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bobby L Ford
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cliff Ford, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Earnest Lee Ford
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Michael Forshee
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Michael Fortnash, Sr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Fosella
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Foster
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Earl Ralph Foster
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Allen Foster
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephen James Foster
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Ray Foundray
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Woodard Carlton Fowler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alan Ray Fox
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edward Raymond Fox
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ildebarando Boby Francone
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott Francis Franken
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jerome Edward Franks
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Lee Frantz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Terry Wayne Frazier
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas B Frederick
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gregg Allan Fredericks
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Friend
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rex Loren Frieze
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles John Frizziola
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephen M Fudali
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Carsten Fulton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Timothy Wayne Funchion
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Joseph Futterer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John P Gabriel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James David Gadacz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Clifton E Gaddie
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Melvin Darryl Gage
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Steven Gajdek, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dale Eugene Gale
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Walter Nicholas Gapinski
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Manuel Joseph Garcia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George Adam Gardis, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fenwick Gardner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Billy Ray Garrett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Merlin Gaspard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Douglas Burr Gates
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Gaughan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Grant Alvin Gay, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Charles Gebo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Herbert Gendusa
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Walter John Gerber
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Raoul Oscar Gervais
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Heinz Gibbs
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary Lee Gillespie
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Kevin Gillespie
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Glenn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andre Gordon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Greening
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Randall Guse
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Armando Hall
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jonathan Hall
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Hill
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Martin Hohnhorst, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carl Horton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Todd Howell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Kitchens
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bennie Kovar
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Keith Lamberth
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Henry Latz, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leonard Littlejohn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donald P Loren
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Mandacina
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Maynard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donald McBurney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Megison
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Messina
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William John Miller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Otto Reynolds, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Archie Charles Williams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Demetrius Clarence Williams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Don Argene Williams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elmore Williams, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gerald Stephen Williams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Eugene Williams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Phillip Nathaniel Williams, Sr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffrey Lee Williamson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Allen Williamson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tony Devern Williamson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rosemary Gannone
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
Patrick Peter Farrell
Terminated: 09/29/2023
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, September 04, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 09/04 12:03 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Dominick Frazia, Kevin O. Goins, Steven James Hart, Issac Hatton, Roger Ralph Reed, Richard Bryan Shearin, Michael Sherman, James Smith, Michael E Smith, Desi D Wade, Robert Thomas Welch, Lawrence Edward Wells, Frank Edward White, Sr, Michael William Stockton, David A Wrightson, Raymond Roger Ramsey, William Edward Carr, James Ray Carwile, Neil Colosi, Frank Sefl, Jr, Ildebarando Boby Francone, Thomas Joseph Futterer, Russell Ackerman, Richard F Blackford, Ralph Charles Alario, II, Kenneth Aman, Jose Pabalan Bautista, Gene Spencer, John Joseph Sweeney, Lee Richard Tague, Gary Martin Blasingame, Senator Madison Brunson, Nelson Blaine Burk, Mitchell Clay McDonald, Jr, Stephen Brad McLaughlin, Jeffrey D Meddin, Greg Miller, Lawrence Mitchell Moore, Bruce Lester Morgan, William Niefer, John N Peterson, Michael Patrick Donovan, Joe Louis Duster, Michael Alan Chance, Anthony Creen, Brently Ian Dorsey, Michael Doust, Rajah Echols, Anthony D Elzy, Perry Jerome Fields Of Particular Personal Injury Claims WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
31 | 31
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 09/04 11:13 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Fred Allen Johnson, Sr, Lloyd Randal Lowe, Stephen Walter Miller, Gregory Mark Mullaley, Elijah James Oliver, Janice Winchester, Eric Firdaus Weilenman, Charles Carlyle Whitmore, Jr, Philip Miles Peacock, Charles Garry Penhale, Abel Perez, Robert Elroy Richards, Jr, Sean Craig Ronsen, Sr, Steven Allen Ross, William Louis Schaff, Jr, Michael Paul Sexton, Charles Edward Shannon, Joe Lynn Wooley, Robert Duane Colt, John Rico Cortest, Richard Andrew Couvillon, Jr, Gregory John Crispo, John Charles Fields, Johnnie Winston Busby, Teriko J Adams, Carlie Adams Mosley, Maria Quintans Godfrey, Betty Louise Thomas, Esther Lynn Gomes, Edward J Fitzgerald, Willie James Allen, Demetris Batts, Patrick James Baumgard, John Keith Berry, James P Smith, Leonard Vaughn Steving, Fred B. Stewart, Gerard Sullivan, Dennis Albert O'Key, Mundo Valez Olford, Cynthia Carner, Wesley Scott Bitner, Gary Dean Brabant, Gary Paul Broughton, Harold Gregory Brown, Sr, David Quinn Davis, Larry Darnell Dickerson, Robert Raymond Ducharme, Sandra Conley, Robert Cott Cook Of Particular Personal Injury Claims WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Status Report
Tue 08/27 11:51 PM
STATUS REPORT - General Denial and Statement of Affirmative Defenses by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
29 | 29
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 08/27 10:26 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent MSA Safety Inc. for Globe Manufacturing Company LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
28 | 28
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/27 8:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige) |
|
27 | 27
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/27 5:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 08/20 8:47 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Christopher Cannes, Joseph Michauskas Et al., RUSSELL LEE LORD, Dennis Edward Holladay, Steven Gockley, Charles Foster Dwayne Trennell Byous as to Michauskas, et al; Thomas Carlisle as to Michauskas, et a; Joe Roger Carlomagno as to Michauskas, et al; David Carlton as to Michauskas, et al; Carlos Castaneda as to Michauskas, et al; Charles Chaffee as to Michauskas, et al; Raymond Chenevert as to Michauskas, et al; Robert Christiansen as to Michauskas, et al; Michael Churchill as to Michauskas, et al; James Todd Conn as to Michauskas, et al; James Robert Cook as to Michauskas, et al; Phillip Cooper as to Michauskas, et al; WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Thursday, August 15, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 08/15 8:26 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Eugene Robert Scott, William Ray Self, James Bradford Senn, Rodney C. Shaffer, Eddie Sharpe, Clarence Shuler, Willie Edward Sims, James Smith, Marshall Worbington, Michael Joseph Tracey, Willmon Tunstall, Robert Stephen Turinski, Michael Leroy Etzel, Ronald C Fernelius, George Ferrell, Danny Joe Fetters, Brian Craig Feuer, Michael Fenton Filo, Charles Peter Fiorino, Jr, Jerry Marlin Fleming, Michael Fleming, Paul Fleming, Alvin Floyd, Earnest Lee Ford, James Michael Forshee, Anthony Fosella, Earl Ralph Foster, Richard Allen Foster, Alan Ray Fox, Edward Raymond Fox, Richard Lee Frantz, Terry Wayne Frazier, Charles John Frizziola, Stephen M Fudali, David Carsten Fulton, Timothy Wayne Funchion, John P Gabriel, Melvin Darryl Gage, Dale Eugene Gale, Rosemary Gannone, Walter Nicholas Gapinski, Billy Ray Garrett, Douglas Burr Gates, Mark Gaughan, Charles Herbert Gendusa, Raoul Oscar Gervais, Demetrius Clarence Williams, Don Argene Williams, Michael Eugene Williams John Anthony Woodall as to Jones, et al; WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-02839-RMG, 2:23-cv-02840-RMG, 2:23-cv-02841-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 07/17 8:49 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Burt Gam, Ronald David Gerding, Patrick M. Hamer, Patrick Hilton, Allen Wilson Valentine, III, William Lamont Wade, Edwin Eugene Welch, David Joseph Wetzel, Wayne Williams, Randy Garfield, Timothy Moffett, Rusty Myers, Norris Gene Thomas, Robert Cleveland Upchurch, Kenneth Mize, David Tooley, John Wygant, Andrew Anderson Et al., Carl J Harper, Allen Peters, Kenna Pierce, Perry Proctor, Ruggero Provenghi, James A Ramsey, Pablo Carrasco, Warren Cook, Daniel Austin Davis, James A Robinson, Gregory Michael Sawka, Matthew J. Shields, Herston John Simmons, Bruce Carey Sims, Gary M Lohmeier, Jose Antonio Loquiao, Scott Lundgren, John Manzi, Brian Marsh, John Steven McDuff, David Medina, Jodey Michelson, Larry James Miller, William Paul Ernst, David Friend, Donald P Loren, Archie Charles Williams Charles Bradley Claywell as to Anderson, et al; Paul Joseph Dudzinski as to Anderson, et al; Thomas Keith League as to Anderson, et al; James Harold Patton, Jr. as to Anderson, et al; Joseph Chester Vann as to Anderson, et al; Richard Ray Tallman as to Thompson, et al; WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 07/16 10:43 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kelvin Donnell Battle, Sr, Timothy Jon Bendekovic, Willaim Paul Bentley, James Felix Binkowski, Mark Michael Bonsanti, Jonathan Hogg, Kenneth Wayne Johnson, Jenni L Jones, Patrick Psarras, John Rossetti, Craig Mark Sanders, Alton Norman Shook, Ronald Jay Toxey, George Godfrey Watkins, Jr, Robert Allen Young, Richard Mosely, Daniel Murphy, William Owen Nuss, Charles Daniel O'Neil, Gus Wilson, Willie L Thomas, James Rickey Thompson, David Willingham, Paul E Wilson, Jr, Jimmy Smith, Kevin James Smith, Michael Alan Stetler, Thomas Calvin Stoudt, Craig Allen Strauss, Timothy Allen Tanno, Sr, Destiny McCowen, Fredrick Arthur Perdue, John Logan Petrey, Dan Russell Platt, Charles A Richardson, Demitricus Torres Coleman, Eduardo Del Valle, David Johnathan Edwards, Douglas Michael Rosell, John Schoen, Paul L. Simonson, Charles Edwin Sledge, Jose Cruz Espinoza, Jr, John M Fahrer, Larry Ray Farrah, Franklin Gerald Ferguson, Sr, Edward William Floyd, Clifton E Gaddie, Thomas Heinz Gibbs Notice of Voluntary dismissal by Derrick Tamar Thompson Et al as to James Nicholas Ungren; WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Tuesday, July 02, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 07/02 10:40 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by James C Smith, Raymond Alan Smith, Richard Taylor Smith, Michael G. Smith, William Stanley Smith, James Harry Sorensen, Winston Doyle Spencer, Eugene Jones Stephenson, Paul Vincent Steusel, Grady Stewart, Alfred Dean Swift, Martin John Tallent, Richard Stewart Taylor, Robert S. Thomas, Daniel Jerrold Thomas, Leland C. Thomas, Ralph david Thomas, Gil Ray Thompson, Raymond Timmer, Teddy Leroy Wolfe, Jr, Joe Earl Rogers, George Francis Rose, Michael Anthony Roussell, David Herman Rucker, Sr, Eric L. Ruggs, Kenneth W. Russell, Steve Martin Sager, Jr, Ersa Lynn Sample, Willie James Saulsberry, David Wayne Savage, Kenneth Duane Schmidt, Roger Jeffry Schoot, Glenn Allen Schultz, Charles Harrison Scott, Douglas Dale Senn, Barbara Ellen Shaw, Daniel Rollin Shrum, David K. Shultz, Claire Christine Sims, Timothy Williams Eubanks, Dennis D Ewing, John Patrick Farrigan, Alvin Floyd, Jonathan Gregory Floyd, David Edward Foley, Cliff Ford, Jr, Jerome Edward Franks, Grant Alvin Gay, Jr, Phillip Nathaniel Williams, Sr, Tony Devern Williamson WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-02837-RMG, 2:23-cv-02838-RMG, 2:23-cv-02839-RMG, 2:23-cv-02840-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Tuesday, June 25, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 06/25 9:33 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Leon Guy Patterson, Sr, Wayne Earl Paul, John Joseph Payn, Antonio Andrea Payne, Sr, Patrick Henry Payne, Robert Herbert Peabody, Medwin F Peck, Robert Joseph Pepin, Michael Keith Perry, Stephen Scott Perry, Michael Perryman, James Jay Peterson, Archelle Petrucci, Jr, Jack Franklin Pettit, Rodney Joe Pevytoe, Brian Phillips, Robert Louie Phillips, Gino Mario Picciolo, Larry German Et al., Paul Morris Etheredge, Joseph Nickolas Evans, Gary Allen Farnum, Ron Anthony Fillman, Devon Edward Fletcher, Robert Flores, David J Floyd, Dennis Lee Fontelroy, Sr, Bobby L Ford, Joseph Michael Fortnash, Sr, Stephen James Foster, Kevin Ray Foundray, Woodard Carlton Fowler, Scott Francis Franken, Gregg Allan Fredericks, Rex Loren Frieze, James David Gadacz, John Steven Gajdek, Jr, Manuel Joseph Garcia, George Adam Gardis, Jr, William Charles Gebo, Walter John Gerber, Gary Lee Gillespie, Michael Kevin Gillespie, William John Miller, Otto Reynolds, Jr, Elmore Williams, Jr, Gerald Stephen Williams, Jeffrey Lee Williamson, John Allen Williamson Timothy Callahan as to German, et al WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-02837-RMG, 2:23-cv-02840-RMG, 2:23-cv-04525-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Monday, June 24, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 06/24 3:06 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Charles Robert Hudler, Charles Bruce Curry, Charles Alonza Dale, Larry Eugene Daniels, Michael Fred Davis, Sylvester Davis, Benny Lame Dawes, Roy James Deakins, John Joseph Deangelo, Carlos Delvalle, James Paul Depalma, Walter Deptuch, Frank Joseph Derylak, Raymond Julien Desrosiers, Jr, Robert James Devers, James W Dewitt, Elmer Manuel Dickens, Larry Darnell Dickerson, David William Dickson, Roy McDowell Dickson, III, Edward George Dirkes, Michael Edward Doherty, Robert Richard Domini, William Joseph Donnelly, Philip Bruce Dowd, David Draughn, John Adolph Duerr, Joe Louis Duster, Robert Gregory Dutton, David James Early, Matthew Allen Eckard, Erwin Norman Ecker, Lee Grant Ellem, James Paul Carozza, Phillip Arthur Carroll, Steven Michael Costello, David Eugene Crabb, Kenneth Douglas Cunningham, Jerel Lamar Davis, Mark Stephen Doss, Samuel Matthew Dresel, II, John Robert Eeten, Jr, Lamar Elston, Francis Joseph Fennessy, Jr, Jack Charles Crookshanks, Steven Lee Crump, John Andrew Culberson, Glen Theodore Cullen, Larry Layne Eshleman, Philip Thomas Esposito WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Thursday, June 06, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 06/06 3:56 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney James L. Stengel and Paige Pavone and to substitute in their place Joseph C. Orlet, Paul A. Calfo, and Dominique Savinelli by Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC. Response to Motion due by 6/20/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Tuesday, March 12, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 03/12 12:09 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company identifying Corporate Parent Sag Main Holding, LLC, Other Affiliate R&Q Insurance Holdings Ltd., Other Affiliate Obra Capital, Inc. for Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
17 | 17
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 03/12 11:06 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Global Manufacturing Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent MSA Safety Inc. for Global Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Monday, March 11, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 03/11 6:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 03/11 5:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Global Manufacturing Company LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Friday, February 09, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 02/09 10:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige) |
|
Monday, February 05, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 02/05 6:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Global Manufacturing Company LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige) |
|
Friday, October 13, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
Fri 10/13 6:34 PM
TEXT ORDER This Order Relates to Case Nos. et al. (as listed in the motion). The motion to substitute counsel of record (Dkt. No. 3719 in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.) is denied without prejudice. Counsel therein is not in fact attempting to "substitute" existing counsel in any given action for new counsel. Rather it appears counsel is attempting to make an appearance in various actions currently consolidated for pretrial proceedings before this Court. Counsel is directed to CMO 1 (Dkt. No. 3 at 3) (noting that counsel who appeared in the transferor district court prior to transfer need not enter a separate appearance or apply to proceed pro hac vice). To the extent counsel desires to file a notice of appearance related to the matters for which it seeks "substitution," it may do so. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 10/13/2023.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
|
Thursday, September 28, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 09/28 1:04 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Patrick Peter Farrell WITHOUT PREJUDICE Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-02840-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Friday, September 22, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Substitute Attorney
Fri 09/22 1:56 AM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney by PBI Performance Products Inc. Response to Motion due by 10/6/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Van Zandt, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Substitution of Attorney | ||
Monday, July 10, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Party
Mon 07/10 2:22 PM
ORDER This Order Relates to: Floyd et al. v. 3M Co. et al., Case No. 2:23-cv-2840-RMG. The unopposed motion to substitute Rosemary Gannone for John Anthony Gannone (Dkt. No. 3349 in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG; (7) in case 2:23-cv-02840-RMG) is granted. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 7/10/2023.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-02840-RMG(sshe, ) |
|
Tuesday, June 27, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Substitute Party
Tue 06/27 12:28 PM
First MOTION to Substitute Party by John Anthony Gannone. Response to Motion due by 7/11/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-02840-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Death Certificate | ||
Monday, June 26, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Mon 06/26 11:59 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Alabama Northern (associated as of 6/21/2023), 2:23-cv-00663, Floyd et al v. 3M Company, as DSC case 2:23-cv-02840-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
4 | 4
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Mon 06/26 11:57 AM
Case transferred in from District of Alabama Northern; Case Number 2:23-cv-00663. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2023 | ||
3 | 3 ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of South Carolina for inclusion in MDL No 2873; certified copy of docket entries and documents requested by transferee clerk sent electronically to Clerk of Court in District of South Carolina. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 06/20/2023. (AKD) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 6/26/2023.] | |
Tuesday, May 30, 2023 | ||
2 | 2 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Notice of Removal by 3M Company. (Radney, W) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 6/26/2023.] | |
Thursday, May 25, 2023 | ||
State Court Complaint deemed filed in Circuit Court of Jefferson County, AL on 4/19/2023. (AKD) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 6/26/2023.] | ||
Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number AALNDC-4349772 (ALND reciept# B-5463). related document1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M Company from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, AL, case number 01-CV-2023-901272.00., filed by 3M Company.(AKD). (Radney, W) Modified on 5/25/2023 (AKD). [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 6/26/2023.] | ||
Wednesday, May 24, 2023 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M Company from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, AL, case number 01-CV-2023-901272.00., filed by 3M Company.(AKD) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 6/26/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A |