District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:John D Bates
Case #: 1:14-cv-01770
Nature of Suit895 Other Statutes - Freedom of Information Act
Cause05:552 Freedom of Information Act
Case Filed:Oct 23, 2014
Terminated:Aug 16, 2018
Last checked: Friday May 15, 2015 3:22 AM EDT
Defendant
DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Represented By
Carl Ezekiel Ross
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
JASON LEOPOLD
Represented By
Ryan Steven James
Law Office Of Ryan S. James
contact info
Jeffrey Louis Light
Law Offices Of Jeffrey Light
contact info


1. Feds fight Hillary Clinton-focused email lawsuit (politico.com)
Submitted Mon 03/30/2015
Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, August 16, 2018
44 44 misc Stipulation Thu 08/16 1:39 PM
STIPULATION of Settlement and Dismissal by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Campbell, Rhonda)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 02, 2018
43 43 misc Status Report Mon 07/02 10:01 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Campbell, Rhonda)
Related: [-]
order .Order Mon 07/02 12:19 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of43 the parties' joint status report, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on the status of settlement negotiations by not later than September 3, 2018. As the parties have been discussing settlement for approximately 90 days, and now have an additional 60 days for discussion, the Court does not anticipate granting any further extensions of time. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 7/2/2018. (lcjdb2)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 07/03 8:12 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report on the status of Settlement Negotiations due by 9/3/2018. (jth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 21, 2018
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Thu 06/21 9:50 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of42 plaintiff's unopposed motion for extension of time, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on the status of settlement negotiations by not later than July 2, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 6/21/2018. (lcjdb2)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 06/21 12:12 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/2/2017. (tb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 20, 2018
42 42 motion Extension of Time to File Document Wed 06/20 3:15 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by JASON LEOPOLD(Light, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, May 01, 2018
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 05/01 10:23 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/29/2018. (tb)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 30, 2018
41 41 misc Status Report Mon 04/30 1:37 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Campbell, Rhonda)
Related: [-]
order .Order Mon 04/30 4:04 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of41 the parties' joint status report, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on the status of settlement negotiations by not later than June 29, 2018. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 4/30/2018. (lcjdb2)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2018
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 02/08 8:49 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/30/2018. (tb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2018
40 40 misc Status Report Wed 02/07 10:22 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Campbell, Rhonda)
Related: [-]
order .Order Wed 02/07 5:03 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of40 the parties' joint status report, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the Court will maintain33 the current monthly production schedule entered on July 25, 2016. The parties shall submit another joint status report updating the Court on the status of the production by not later than April 30, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 2/7/2018. (lcjdb2)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 08, 2017
order .Order Tue 08/08 10:41 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of39 the parties' joint status report, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the Court will maintain33 the current monthly production schedule entered on July 25, 2016. The parties shall submit another joint status report updating the Court on the status of the production by not later than February 7, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 8/8/17. (lcjdb2)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 08/08 3:57 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/7/2018. (tb)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 07, 2017
39 39 misc Status Report Mon 08/07 7:08 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Campbell, Rhonda)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 27, 2017
38 38 notice Notice of Substitution of Counsel Mon 02/27 1:21 PM
NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Rhonda Lisa Campbell on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE Substituting for attorney Alexander Haas (Campbell, Rhonda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 07, 2017
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 02/07 3:32 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/7/2017. (tb)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 06, 2017
order .Order Mon 02/06 4:33 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of37 the parties' joint status report, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the Court will maintain33 the current monthly production schedule entered on July 25, 2016. The parties are further ORDERED to submit another joint status report by not later than August 7, 2017 updating the Court on the status of the feeder email production. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 2/6/17. (lcjdb2)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 03, 2017
37 37 misc Status Report Fri 02/03 1:07 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Haas, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2017
36 36 notice Notice of Substitution of Counsel Tue 01/17 5:05 PM
NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Alexander Kenneth Haas on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Carl E. Ross (Haas, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 08, 2016
order .Order Thu 12/08 1:58 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of35 defendant's status report, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the Court will maintain33 the current monthly production schedule entered on July 25, 2016. Accordingly, the first production date for feeder emails will be December 30, 2016, and defendant will release the three remaining Air Wing Weekly reports upon their return from the outside agency. The parties are further ORDERED to submit an additional joint status report by not later than February 7, 2017 updating the Court on the status of the feeder email production, and of the three remaining Air Wing Weekly reports. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 12/8/16. (lcjdb2)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 12/08 2:59 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/7/2017. (tb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 30, 2016
35 35 misc Status Report Wed 11/30 6:40 PM
STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Ross, Carl)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 03, 2016
order .Order Mon 10/03 8:47 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of34 defendant's consent motion for an extension of time, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendant's initial release of Air Wing Weekly Reports shall be produced by not later than October 14, 2016. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 10/3/16. (lcjdb2)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 10/03 10:13 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's initial release of Air Wing Weekly Reports production due by 10/14/2016. (tb)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 30, 2016
34 34 misc Status Report Fri 09/30 6:43 PM
STATUS REPORT Defendant's Status Report and Consent Motion for Extension of Time by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Ross, Carl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, July 25, 2016
33 33 order .Order Mon 07/25 11:55 AM
ORDER establishing new search and production schedule. See text for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 7/25/2016. (lcjdb2)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 07/25 12:16 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 11/30/2016. (tb)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 22, 2016
32 32 misc Status Report Fri 07/22 3:16 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Ross, Carl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 07/22 12:08 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/22/2016. (tb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 19, 2016
31 31 motion Extension of Time to File Document Tue 07/19 3:39 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Status Report by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE(Ross, Carl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
30 30 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance Tue 07/19 10:20 AM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. Attorney Benton Gregory Peterson terminated. (Peterson, Benton)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Tue 07/19 4:36 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of31 the parties' joint motion for an extension of time, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the parties shall file their joint status report by not later than July 22, 2016. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 7/19/2016. (lcjdb2)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 07/19 4:45 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/22/2016. (tb)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 01, 2016
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 07/01 1:34 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/19/2016. (tb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 30, 2016
29 29 misc Status Report Thu 06/30 2:11 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT IN RESPONSE TO MINUTE ORDER OF JULY 16, 2016 by JASON LEOPOLD.(James, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
order .Order Thu 06/30 2:40 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of29 the parties' joint status report, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall continue to confer and discuss ways to modify, expedite, and/or prioritize the search for and processing of records in this case, and shall file a joint status report by not later than July 19, 2016. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 6/30/2016. (lcjdb2)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 17, 2016
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 06/17 4:25 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/30/2016. (tb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 16, 2016
order .Order Thu 06/16 11:16 AM
MINUTE ORDER: As discussed at today's status conference, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall confer and discuss ways to modify, expedite, and/or prioritize the search for and processing of records in this case, starting with a conference call at 4:00 p.m. (Eastern) today; and it is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report by not later than June 30, 2016. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 6/16/2016. (lcjdb2)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Fri 06/17 3:17 PM
Minute Entry: Status Conference held on 6/16/2016 before Judge John D. Bates: Parties to meet and confer and file joint briefing schedule in weeks from today's hearing. (Court Reporter Bryan Wayne) (tb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 15, 2016
28 28 misc Status Report Wed 06/15 4:58 PM
STATUS REPORT Defendant's Status Report by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Ross, Carl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - 4
Monday, June 13, 2016
utility Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Mon 06/13 10:41 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Defendant's status report due by 5:00 p.m. on 6/15/2016. Status Conference set for 6/16/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 30A before Judge John D. Bates. (tb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 09, 2016
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Thu 06/09 11:37 AM
MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that a status conference in this matter will be held on June 16, 2016, at 10 a.m. (Eastern) in Courtroom 30A. Plaintiff's counsel Ryan James may appear by telephone. It is further ORDERED that defendant shall file its status report by not later than 5:00 p.m. on June 15, 2016. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 6/9/2016. (lcjdb2)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 08, 2016
27 27 misc Status Report Thu 06/09 12:02 AM
STATUS REPORT by JASON LEOPOLD.(James, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex 1 Mar 10 to June 8 emails,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex 2 Mar 8-9 emails,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
26 26 motion Extension of Time to File Document Wed 06/08 4:26 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Status Report by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE(Ross, Carl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, March 14, 2016
order .Order Mon 03/14 9:37 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of25 the parties' joint status report, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall propose a production end date and briefing schedule by not later than June 8, 2016. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 3/14/2016. (lcjdb2)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 03/14 11:43 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed production end date and briefing schedule due by 6/8/2016. (tb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 10, 2016
25 25 misc Status Report Thu 03/10 5:45 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Ross, Carl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 10, 2016
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Wed 02/10 9:47 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of24 defendant's motion for extension of time, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a status report with respect to production and further proceedings by not later than March 10, 2016. This order does not relieve defendant from its existing production obligations; it merely postpones the deadline for submitting the status report required by20 the Court's order of August 10, 2015. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 2/10/2016. (lcjdb2)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 02/10 4:12 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 3/10/2016. (tb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 09, 2016
24 24 motion Extension of Time to File Document Tue 02/09 7:34 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE(Peterson, Benton)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, November 25, 2015
order Order on Motion to Show Cause Order on Motion for Order Wed 11/25 10:04 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of plaintiff's21 motion for an order to show cause and22 motion for an order requiring electronic production;23 defendant's combined opposition, including its assurance that "the Agency has now put policies into place to accommodate Plaintiff's request" for electronic production; and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff's motions are DENIED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 11/25/2015. (lcjdb2, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 24, 2015
23 23 3 pgs respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Tue 11/24 6:06 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re21 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Defendant Should Not Be Held in Contempt ,22 MOTION for Order for Electronic Monthly Productions and Delivery of Producutions On or Before Each Due Date filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Ross, Carl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Attachments to Exhibit 1
Sunday, November 22, 2015
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Sun 11/22 12:54 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Combined response due by 11/24/2015. (tb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 19, 2015
order .Order Thu 11/19 11:48 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of plaintiff's21 motion for an order to show cause and22 motion for an order requiring electronic production and delivery, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that defendant shall file a single, combined response to plaintiff's motions by not later than November 24, 2015. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 11/19/2015. (lcjdb2)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 18, 2015
22 22 motion Motion For Order Wed 11/18 11:51 PM
MOTION for Order for Electronic Monthly Productions and Delivery of Producutions On or Before Each Due Date by JASON LEOPOLD(James, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 5,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit 6,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit 7,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit 8,
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit 9,
Att: 11 Exhibit Exhibit 10,
Att: 12 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Tuesday, November 10, 2015
21 21 motion Show Cause Tue 11/10 11:22 PM
MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Defendant Should Not Be Held in Contempt by JASON LEOPOLD(James, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Show Cause,
Att: 2 Exhibit November 8 email to Defendant's counsel
Tuesday, August 11, 2015
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 08/11 4:03 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties shall submit a Status Report with respect to production and further proceedings by 2/10/2016. (jth)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 10, 2015
20 20 order .Order Mon 08/10 2:02 PM
ORDER establishing search and production schedule. See text of order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 8/10/2015. (lcjdb2)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 07, 2015
19 19 misc Status Report Fri 08/07 5:51 PM
STATUS REPORT Parties' Proposed Production Schedule by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Ross, Carl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 30, 2015
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 07/30 3:33 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Production Schedule due by 8/7/2015. (tb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 29, 2015
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Wed 07/29 10:27 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of18 the defendant's consent motion for an extension of time, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint proposed production schedule by not later than August 7, 2015. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 7/29/15. (lcjdb2)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 28, 2015
18 18 motion Extension of Time to File Document Tue 07/28 6:54 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Production Schedule by DEPARTMENT OF STATE(Ross, Carl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, July 08, 2015
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 07/08 11:10 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Production Schedule due by 8/1/2015. (tb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 01, 2015
17 17 misc Status Report Wed 07/01 1:19 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by JASON LEOPOLD. (James, Ryan)
Related: [-]
order .Order Wed 07/01 3:03 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of17 the parties' joint status report, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint proposed production schedule for request number F-2014-14489 by not later than August 1, 2015; and it is further ORDERED that the production schedule shall address the requirements described in16 the Court's April 1, 2015 Order. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 7/1/15. (lcjdb2)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 04, 2015
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Sat 04/04 3:58 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report and Proposed Production Schedule are due by 7/1/2015. (jth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 01, 2015
16 16 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Wed 04/01 10:36 AM
ORDER denying as moot12 the government's motion for extension of time, setting production schedule, and requiring submission of a joint status report and proposed production schedule by not later than July 1, 2015. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 4/1/15. (lcjdb2)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 27, 2015
15 15 respm Response to (non-motion) Document Fri 03/27 6:26 PM
RESPONSE re14 Meet and Confer Statement filed by DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Ross, Carl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Friday, March 20, 2015
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 03/20 2:37 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 3/27/2015. (tb, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 17, 2015
order .Order Tue 03/17 12:32 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of14 plaintiff's meet and confer statement and proposed production schedule, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the government shall file its response to plaintiff's proposed production schedule by not later than March 27, 2015. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 3/17/15. (lcjdb2)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 16, 2015
14 14 misc Meet and Confer Statement Mon 03/16 11:48 PM
MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT.(James, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Tuesday, February 10, 2015
13 13 respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Tue 02/10 2:34 AM
Memorandum in opposition to re12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Production Schedule filed by JASON LEOPOLD.(James, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Monday, February 09, 2015
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Document Mon 02/09 6:45 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Production Schedule by DEPARTMENT OF STATE(Ross, Carl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 13, 2015
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 01/13 9:07 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 2/12/2015. (tb, )
Related: [-]
Monday, January 12, 2015
11 11 order .Order Mon 01/12 4:33 PM
ORDER directing parties to file a proposed briefing schedule for the filing of dispositive motions by not later than February 12, 2015. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 1/12/15. (lcjdb2)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 01/12 3:48 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Ross, Carl)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 01/12 3:46 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF STATE(Ross, Carl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 01/12 4:03 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of9 the government's unopposed motion for an extension of time to file its answer, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED nunc pro tunc; and it is further ORDERED that the government shall file its answer and/or other response by not later than January 12, 2015. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 1/12/15. (lcjdb2)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 30, 2014
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 12/30 9:42 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of8 the government's consent motion for an extension of time to respond to plaintiff's complaint, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the government shall file its response by not later than January 8, 2015. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 12/30/14. (lcjdb2)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 12/30 9:49 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: The Government's Response to Plaintiff's Complaint is now due by 1/8/2015. (jth)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 29, 2014
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 12/29 4:58 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF STATE(Ross, Carl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, December 11, 2014
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 12/11 12:57 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Steven James on behalf of JASON LEOPOLD (James, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 26, 2014
6 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF STATE(Ross, Carl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of6 the government's motion for extension of time to file its answer, plaintiff's partial consent to the government's motion, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that defendant's answer and/or other response shall be filed by not later than December 29, 2014. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 11/26/14. (lcjdb2)
Related: [-]
Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 12/29/2014. (tb, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 12, 2014
5 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 11/3/2014 (Light, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 03, 2014
4 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/29/2014. (Light, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
3 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/29/2014. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/28/2014. (Light, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 23, 2014
2 2 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(rd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form,
Att: 2 Notice of Consent
1 1 COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-3880509) filed by JASON LEOPOLD.(Light, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons State,
Att: 3 Summons USAO,
Att: 4 Summons USAG
Case Assigned to Judge John D. Bates. (rd)
Related: [-]