Brown et al v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-03062 |
Nature of Suit | 245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Tort Action |
Case Filed: | Jun 28, 2023 |
Case in other court: | New York Southern, 1:23-cv-04406 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 25, 2023 4:02 AM EST |
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
Individually and as successor in interest to Sandoz Chemical Corporation 4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
Individually and as successor in interest to The Ansul Company One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
Individually and as successor in interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise 1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Doe Defendants 1-20
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co.)
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Darren Danico
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marc Brown
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donald E. Barker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Irwin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Rocco
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 08/20 9:54 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Eric Broome, Charles Helfrich, Brian Clark, Eugene Rosek, Derrick and Patricia Veanueva, Darren Danico, Billy Cales, George Crockett, Derrick Day, Timothy Hadley, Rob Hibbitt, Richard Monroe, Bryan Reed, Kenneth Winter, Lary Coates Sr., Michael DiGiuro, Norbert Elkey, Oliver Evans, Kimberly Fontenot, Clarence Green, David Harmon, Ken Hayes, Charles Hurd, Beverly Kindred, William Mizett, Malcolm Smith, Donald Stagg, Typhore Stanley, Gregory Thomas, Karen Armstrong, Robert Clawson, Robert Murphy, Oscar Almazan, Carmen Meranza, Mechel Baker, Byron Bradford, Claudia Goldner, Paul Green, Charlie Hill, Carl Hodge, Dennis Joiner, Charles Lee Jr, Billy Mills, Dean Monington, Willie Roberts, Richard Tracy, Christine Triplett, Tom Walsh Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice As to Personal Injury Claims OnlyAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Croner, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Friday, October 13, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
Fri 10/13 6:34 PM
TEXT ORDER This Order Relates to Case Nos. et al. (as listed in the motion). The motion to substitute counsel of record (Dkt. No. 3719 in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.) is denied without prejudice. Counsel therein is not in fact attempting to "substitute" existing counsel in any given action for new counsel. Rather it appears counsel is attempting to make an appearance in various actions currently consolidated for pretrial proceedings before this Court. Counsel is directed to CMO 1 (Dkt. No. 3 at 3) (noting that counsel who appeared in the transferor district court prior to transfer need not enter a separate appearance or apply to proceed pro hac vice). To the extent counsel desires to file a notice of appearance related to the matters for which it seeks "substitution," it may do so. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 10/13/2023.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
|
Friday, September 22, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Substitute Attorney
Fri 09/22 1:56 AM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney by PBI Performance Products Inc. Response to Motion due by 10/6/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Van Zandt, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Substitution of Attorney | ||
Thursday, July 06, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Thu 07/06 2:27 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Southern (associated as of 6/28/2023), 1:23-cv-04406, Brown et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-03062-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
4 | 4
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Thu 07/06 2:25 PM
Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:23-cv-04406. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Tuesday, June 27, 2023 | ||
CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina. (Signed by MDL Panel on 6/26/2023) (vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2023.] | ||
Monday, June 26, 2023 | ||
MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina.(vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2023.] | ||
Friday, May 26, 2023 | ||
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2023.] | ||
Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2023.] | ||
Case Designated ECF. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2023.] | ||
Thursday, May 25, 2023 | ||
3 | 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co)..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2023.] | |
2 | 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2023.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 153576/2023. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27791848).Document filed by 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co)..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/6/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint |