Sapp v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-03069 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Jun 28, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Texas Northern, 3:23-cv-01257 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 25, 2023 4:03 AM EST |
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
Successor-in-interest to The Ansul Company One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
Raytheon Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Defendant
E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals Incorporated
Agent Schok K. Moza 12321 Hatcherville
Baytown, TX 77520 |
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma Management LLC
Archroma Management LLC 4000 Monroe Rd.
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
AGC Inc
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Amercas Inc
|
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Darren Sapp
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, July 07, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued
Fri 07/07 8:41 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Thu 07/06 3:23 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Northern Texas (associated as of 6/28/2023), 3:23-cv-01257, Sapp v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-03069-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
6 | 6
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Thu 07/06 3:17 PM
Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:23-cv-01257. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Monday, June 26, 2023 | ||
5 | 5 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 138): The JPML has issued the attached order in MDL 2873, and that order has now been filed in the District of South Carolina. (ykp) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 7/6/2023.] | |
Monday, June 12, 2023 | ||
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting3 Motion to Extend Time. Defendants' responses to Plaintiff's Complaint are due 28 days following the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation issuing a decision on whether to transfer this case to the In re Aqueous FilmForming Foam Products Liability Litigation, MDL No. 2873 (D.S.C.). (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 6/12/2023) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 7/6/2023.] | |
Friday, June 09, 2023 | ||
3 | 3 MOTION to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleadings to the Complaint filed by 3M Company (Kelley, Charles) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 7/6/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 1 - Removal papers, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, June 05, 2023 | ||
2 | 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (cfk) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 7/6/2023.] | |
Friday, June 02, 2023 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by 3M COMPANY (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co.). (Filing fee $402; receipt number ATXNDC-13787140) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Kelley, Charles) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 7/6/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B, | ||
Att: 3 Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Cover Sheet Supplement, | ||
Att: 5 Additional Page(s) | ||
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Darren Sapp. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF) (See document1 -5. (cfk) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 7/6/2023.] (Entered: 06/05/2023) |