Rawlins v. 3M Company Inc
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-03070 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jun 28, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jul 23, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Alabama Northern, 2:23-cv-00729 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 25, 2023 4:03 AM EST |
Defendant
3M Company Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
Steve Rawlins
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 07/23 9:01 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Rule 41(A)(1)(a)(i) by Steve Rawlins (Daniel, Jeffrey) QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE Clerk refiled in lead and spread to member case as of original filing date as per CMO No. 1 Filing instructions. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03070-RMG(sshe, ) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Thu 07/06 3:28 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Alabama Northern (associated as of 6/28/2023), 2:23-cv-00729, Rawlins v. 3M Company Inc, as DSC case 2:23-cv-03070-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
6 | 6
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Thu 07/06 3:25 PM
Case transferred in from District of Alabama Northern; Case Number 2:23-cv-00729. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Wednesday, June 28, 2023 | ||
5 | 5 ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of South Carolina for inclusion in MDL; record electronically transferred to Clerk of Court in District of South Carolina. (KAM) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 7/6/2023.] | |
4 | 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steve Rawlins. 3M Company Inc served on 6/22/2023, answer due 7/13/2023. (AKD) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 7/6/2023.] | |
Tuesday, June 20, 2023 | ||
3 | 3 Summons Issued as to 3M Company Inc. Mailed certified mail. (AKD) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 7/6/2023.] | |
Monday, June 05, 2023 | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE OF CONSENT to a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AKD) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 7/6/2023.] | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against 3M Company Inc, filed by Steve Rawlins.(AKD) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 7/6/2023.] | |
Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number AALNDC-4356672 (ALND receipt# B-5664). related document1 COMPLAINT against 3M Company Inc, filed by Steve Rawlins.(AKD). (Daniel, Jeffrey) Modified on 6/6/2023 (AKD). [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 7/6/2023.] |