Mississippi Southern District Court
Case #: 1:23-mj-00581
Case Filed:Jul 05, 2023
Last checked: Friday Jul 07, 2023 2:25 AM CDT
Defendant
Alex Rosen (1)
Represented By
Lauren Hillery - FPD
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Lee Smith - Federal Gov
U. S. Department Of Justice - Gulfport
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/07/2023 2:43 AM CDT
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
Arrest (Rule 32) of Alex Rosen. (SR)
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Alex Rosen: Initial Appearance - Rule 32 set for 7/5/2023 09:30 AM in Courtroom 881 (Gulfport) before Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers Jr. (SR)
Related: [-]
Remark: Docket Report and documents sent via email to Clerk, Eastern District of Louisiana. (SR)
Related: [-]
1 1 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr: Initial Appearance in Rule 32 Proceedings as to Alex Rosen held on 7/5/2023 Tape Number: 7/5/2023. (SR)
Related: [-]
2 2 *RESTRICTED* CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Alex Rosen. (SR)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Alex Rosen. Lauren Hillery - FPD for Alex Rosen appointed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on 7/5/2023 (SR)
Related: [-]
4 4 WAIVER of Rule 32 Hearing by Alex Rosen. (SR)
Related: [-]
5 5 COMMITMENT TO ANOTHER DISTRICT as to Alex Rosen. Defendant committed to Eastern District of Louisiana. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on 7/5/2023 (SR)
Related: [-]