Carroll Electric Cooperative v. Alltel Corporation
Original Case: 3:23-cv-03017
Eighth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:23-cv-02579 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Jul 06, 2023 |
Last checked: Friday Jul 07, 2023 3:19 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Alltel Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Carroll Electric Cooperative Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 07/07/2023 3:19 AM CDT |
Thursday, July 06, 2023 | ||
4 pgs Civil case docketed. [5292947] 23-2579 (CAH) | ||
13 pgs Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, opinion & order 6/9/23. [5292949] 23-2579 (CAH) | ||
2
pgs
BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 08/15/2023. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Carroll Electric Cooperative Corporation due 08/15/2023. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5292953] 23-2579 (CAH) |