USA v. Lin et al
Oklahoma Western District Court | |
Case #: | 5:23-cr-00278 |
Case Filed: | Jul 05, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 08, 2023 2:39 AM CDT |
Defendant
Terrance Jamahl Allen (10)
|
|
Defendant
Chang-Hui Chen (5)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ahmed Salim Harrold (11)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Luis Rafael Larios-Benites (12)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Brandon Lin (15)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dong Lin (4)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Naigang Lin (1)
|
|
Defendant
Naiqing Lin (13)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Naiyang Lin (2)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Juan Lyu (14)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Barry Stadler (8)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Daniel Walsh (9)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Meiyan Xiao (6)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Fei Xie (7)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Li Jin Yang (3)
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 08/19/2024 4:52 PM CDT |
Tuesday, May 02, 2023 | ||
1 | 1 SEALED COMPLAINT as to Naigang Lin (1), Brandon Lin (2), Naiqing Lin (3), Juan Lyu (4), David Arman Smith (5). (ac) [5:23-mj-00276-STE] | |
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet Naigang Lin, | ||
Att: 2 Criminal Cover Sheet Brandon Lin, | ||
Att: 3 Criminal Cover Sheet Naiqing Lin, | ||
Att: 4 Criminal Cover Sheet Juan Lin, | ||
Att: 5 Criminal Cover Sheet David Smith | ||
1 | 1 SEALED COMPLAINT as to Naigang Lin (1), Naiyang Lin (2), Li Jin Yang (3), Dong Lin (4), Chang-Hui Chen (5), Meiyan Xiao (6), Barry Stadler (7), Daniel P Walsh (8), Terrance Jamahl Allen (9), Fei Xie (10), Ahmed Salim Harrold (11), Luis Rafael Larios-Benites (12). (ac) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet Naigang Lin, | ||
Att: 2 Criminal Cover Sheet Naiyang Lin, | ||
Att: 3 Criminal Cover Sheet Lin Jin Yang, | ||
Att: 4 Criminal Cover Sheet Dong Lin, | ||
Att: 5 Criminal Cover Sheet Chang-Hui Chen, | ||
Att: 6 Criminal Cover Sheet Meiyan Xiao, | ||
Att: 7 Criminal Cover Sheet Barry Stadler, | ||
Att: 8 Criminal Cover Sheet Daniel Walsh, | ||
Att: 9 Criminal Cover Sheet Terrance Allen, | ||
Att: 10 1 pgs Criminal Cover Sheet Fei Xie, | ||
Att: 11 Criminal Cover Sheet Ahmend Harrold, | ||
Att: 12 1 pgs Criminal Cover Sheet Luis Larios Benites | ||
7 | 7 MOTION to Seal Case by United States of America as to Naigang Lin, Brandon Lin, Naiqing Lin, Juan Lyu, David Arman Smith. (ac) [5:23-mj-00276-STE] | |
8 | 8 ORDER granting7 Motion to Seal Case as to Naigang Lin (1), Brandon Lin (2), Naiqing Lin (3), Juan Lyu (4), David Arman Smith (5). Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 5/2/2023. (ac) [5:23-mj-00276-STE] | |
14 | 14 MOTION to Seal Case by United States of America as to Naigang Lin, Naiyang Lin, Li Jin Yang, Dong Lin, Chang-Hui Chen, Meiyan Xiao, Barry Stadler, Daniel Walsh, Terrance Jamahl Allen, Fei Xie, Ahmed Salim Harrold, Luis Rafael Larios-Benites. (ac)[5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
15 | 15 ORDER granting14 Motion to Seal Case as to Naigang Lin (1), Naiyang Lin (2), Li Jin Yang (3), Dong Lin (4), Chang-Hui Chen (5), Meiyan Xiao (6), Barry Stadler (7), Daniel Walsh (8), Terrance Jamahl Allen (9), Fei Xie (10), Ahmed Salim Harrold (11), Luis Rafael Larios-Benites (12). Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 5/2/2023. (ac) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
Wednesday, May 10, 2023 | ||
9 | 9 MOTION to Unseal Complaint by United States of America as to Naigang Lin, Brandon Lin, Naiqing Lin, Juan Lyu, David Arman Smith. (lb) [5:23-mj-00276-STE] | |
10 | 10 ORDER granting9 Motion to Unseal Complaint as to Naigang Lin (1), Brandon Lin (2), Naiqing Lin (3), Juan Lyu (4), David Arman Smith (5). Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 5/10/23. (lb) [5:23-mj-00276-STE] | |
16 | 16 MOTION to Unseal Complaint by United States of America as to Naigang Lin, Naiyang Lin, Li Jin Yang, Dong Lin, Chang-Hui Chen, Meiyan Xiao, Barry Stadler, Daniel Walsh, Terrance Jamahl Allen, Fei Xie, Ahmed Salim Harrold, Luis Rafael Larios-Benites. (lb) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
17 | 17 ORDER granting16 Motion to Unseal Complaint as to Naigang Lin (1), Naiyang Lin (2), Li Jin Yang (3), Dong Lin (4), Chang-Hui Chen (5), Meiyan Xiao (6), Barry Stadler (7), Daniel Walsh (8), Terrance Jamahl Allen (9), Fei Xie (10), Ahmed Salim Harrold (11), Luis Rafael Larios-Benites (12). Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 5/10/23. (lb) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
18 | 18 1 pgs ARREST WARRANT Returned Executed on 05/10/2023 in case as to Fei Xie. (naa) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
Thursday, May 11, 2023 | ||
11 | 11 Arrest WARRANT Returned Executed on 5/10/2023 in case as to Juan Lyu. (ac) [5:23-mj-00276-STE] | |
13 | 13 Arrest WARRANT Returned Executed on 5/10/2023 in case as to Brandon Lin. (ac) [5:23-mj-00276-STE] | |
19 | 19 Arrest WARRANT Returned Executed on 5/10/2023 in case as to Naiyang Lin. (ac) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
20 | 20 Arrest WARRANT Returned Executed on 5/10/2023 in case as to Chang-Hui Chen. (ac) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
21 | 21 Arrest WARRANT Returned Executed on 5/10/2023 in case as to Dong Lin. (ac) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
22 | 22 Arrest WARRANT Returned Executed on 5/10/2023 in case as to Ahmed Salim Harrold. (ac) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
23 | 23 Arrest WARRANT Returned Executed on 5/10/2023 in case as to Barry Stadler. (ac) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
24 | 24 Arrest WARRANT Returned Executed on 5/10/2023 in case as to Daniel Walsh. (ac) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
26 | 26 ** SEALED DOCUMENT ** CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Naiyang Lin (lb) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
27 | 27 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL James Patrick Quillian for Naiyang Lin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 5/11/23. (lb) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
28 | 28 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell: Initial Appearance as to Naiyang Lin held on 5/11/2023, Preliminary Hearing as to Naiyang Lin waived on 5/11/2023, Detention Hearing set for 5/12/2023 at 4:00 PM in Courtroom 103 before Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin. (lb) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
29 | 29 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Naiyang Lin (lb) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
30 | 30 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Naiyang Lin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 5/11/23. (lb) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
31 | 31 DPPA-ORDER as to Naiyang Lin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 5/11/23. (lb) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
32 | 32 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Naiyang Lin. Detention Hearing set for 5/12/2023 at 4:00 PM in Courtroom 103 before Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin. (lb) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
Friday, May 12, 2023 | ||
15 | 15 NOTICE OF CONSULAR NOTIFICATION(Coffey, Nicholas) [5:23-mj-00276-STE] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Consular Notification | ||
18 | 18 RULE 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Brandon Lin (ac) [5:23-mj-00276-STE] | |
19 | 19 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Brandon Lin Initial Appearance set for 5/19/2023 03:00 PM in Courtroom 103 before Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin. (ac) [5:23-mj-00276-STE] | |
20 | 20 ** SEALED DOCUMENT ** CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Juan Lyu (ac) [5:23-mj-00276-STE] | |
21 | 21 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER Kyle E Wackenheim for Juan Lyu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 5/12/2023. (ac) [5:23-mj-00276-STE] | |
22 | 22 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin:Initial Appearance as to Juan Lyu held on 5/12/2023. Defendant remanded to custody of USMS. (ac) [5:23-mj-00276-STE] | |
23 | 23 ORDER that Vivan Josh is appointed as interpreter for dft Juan Lyu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 5/12/2023. (ac) [5:23-mj-00276-STE] | |
24 | 24 WRITTEN OATH of Interpreter Vivan Josh as to dft Juan Lyu (ac) [5:23-mj-00276-STE] | |
25 | 25 WAIVER Of Detention Hearing & Consent to Order of Detention with an Order of Detention pending further proceedings as to Juan Lyu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 5/12/2023. (ac) [5:23-mj-00276-STE] | |
26 | 26 DPPA-ORDER as to Juan Lyu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 5/12/2023. (ac) [5:23-mj-00276-STE] | |
27 | 27 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Juan Lyu Detention Hearing set for 5/16/2023 01:00 PM in Courtroom 103 before Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin. Preliminary Hearing set for 5/16/2023 01:00 PM in Courtroom 103 before Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin (ac) (Main Document 27 replaced on 5/12/2023) (ac). [5:23-mj-00276-STE] | |
34 | 34 NOTICE OF CONSULAR NOTIFICATION(Coffey, Nicholas) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Consular Notification | ||
35 | 35 ** SEALED DOCUMENT ** CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Dong Lin (ac) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
36 | 36 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Jeffery D Trevillion, Jr for Dong Lin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 5/12/2023. (ac) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
37 | 37 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin:Initial Appearance as to Dong Lin held on 5/12/2023. Preliminary Examination as to Dong Lin waived on 5/12/2023. (ac) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
38 | 38 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Dong Lin (ac) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
39 | 39 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Dong Lin (4) 5000. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 5/12/2023. (ac) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
40 | 40 Appearance Bond as to Dong Lin (4) 5000. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 5/12/2023. (ac) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
41 | 41 ORDER that Vivan Josh is appointed as interpreter for dft Dong Lin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 5/12/2023. (ac) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
42 | 42 ORDER that Vivan Josh is appointed as out of court interpreter for dft Dong Lin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 5/12/2023. (ac) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
43 | 43 WRITTEN OATH of Interpreter Vivan Josh as to dft Dong Lin (ac) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
44 | 44 DPPA-ORDER as to Dong Lin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 5/12/2023. (ac) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
45 | 45 RULE 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Barry Stadler (ac) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
46 | 46 RULE 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Daniel Walsh (ac) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
47 | 47 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Daniel Walsh Initial Appearance set for 5/19/2023 03:00 PM in Courtroom 103 before Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin. (ac) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
48 | 48 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin:Detention Hearing as to Naiyang Lin waived on 5/12/2023. Defendant remanded to custody of USMS. (ac) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
49 | 49 WAIVER Of Detention Hearing & Consent to Order of Detention with an Order of Detention pending further proceedings as to Naiyang Lin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 5/12/2023. (ac) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
50 | 50 ** SEALED DOCUMENT ** CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Chang-Hui Chen (ac) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
51 | 51 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Thomas M Wright for Chang-Hui Chen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 5/12/2023. (ac) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
52 | 52 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin:Initial Appearance as to Chang-Hui Chen held on 5/12/2023. Defendant remanded to custody of USMS. (ac) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
53 | 53 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Chang-Hui Chen Detention Hearing set for 5/17/2023 11:00 AM in Courtroom 103 before Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 5/12/2023. (ac) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
54 | 54 ORDER that Vivan Josh is appointed as interpreter for dft Chang-Hui Chen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 5/12/2023. (ac) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
55 | 55 ORDER that Vivan Josh is appointed as out of court interpreter for dft Chang-Hui Chen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 5/12/2023. (ac) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
56 | 56 WRITTEN OATH of Interpreter Vivan Josh as to dft Chang-Hui Chen (ac) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
57 | 57 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Chang-Hui Chen Detention Hearing set for 5/17/2023 11:00 AM in Courtroom 103 before Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin. Preliminary Hearing set for 5/17/2023 11:00 AM in Courtroom 103 before Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin. (ac) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
58 | 58 DPPA-ORDER as to Chang-Hui Chen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 5/12/2023. (ac) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
Monday, May 15, 2023 | ||
28 | 28 ENTRY OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Kyle E Wackenheim appearing for Juan Lyu (Wackenheim, Kyle) [5:23-mj-00276-STE] | |
29 | 29 RULE 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Naiqing Lin from the Eastern District of New York (ac) [5:23-mj-00276-STE] | |
30 | 30 ENTER ORDER provisionally appointing attorney Alyssa D Farrell for Naiqing Lin.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 5/15/2023. (ac) [5:23-mj-00276-STE] | |
59 | 59 ENTRY OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Thomas M Wright appearing for Chang-Hui Chen (Wright, Thomas) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
60 | 60 RULE 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Li Jin Yang from Eastern District of New York (ac) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
Tuesday, May 16, 2023 | ||
31 | 31 ENTRY OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Christine M Cave appearing for Brandon Lin (Cave, Christine) [5:23-mj-00276-STE] | |
32 | 32 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin:Preliminary Hearing as to Juan Lyu held on 5/16/2023. Detention Hearing as to Juan Lyu held on 5/16/2023. Defendant remanded to custody of USMS. (ac) [5:23-mj-00276-STE] | |
33 | 33 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Juan Lyu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 5/16/2023. (ac) [5:23-mj-00276-STE] | |
62 | 62 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Ahmed Salim Harrold Initial Appearance set for 5/19/2023 03:00 PM in Courtroom 103 before Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin. (ac) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
63 | 63 ENTRY OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jeffery D Trevillion, Jr appearing for Dong Lin (Trevillion, Jeffery) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
Wednesday, May 17, 2023 | ||
64 | 64 ENTRY OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: J Patrick Quillian appearing for Naiyang Lin (Quillian, J) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
65 | 65 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Hearing Re: Detention by Naiyang Lin. (Quillian, J) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
66 | 66 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin:Preliminary Hearing as to Chang-Hui Chen waived on 5/17/2023. Detention Hearing as to Chang-Hui Chen held on 5/17/2023. (ac) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
67 | 67 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Chang-Hui Chen (ac) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
68 | 68 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Chang-Hui Chen (5) $50,000. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 5/17/2023. (ac) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
69 | 69 Appearance Bond as to Chang-Hui Chen (5) 50,000. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 5/17/2023. (ac) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
70 | 70 ORDER granting65 Motion for Hearing as to Naiyang Lin (2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 5/17/2023. (ac) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
71 | 71 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Naiyang Lin Detention Hearing set for 5/18/2023 01:00 PM in Courtroom 103 before Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin. (ac) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
Thursday, May 18, 2023 | ||
Secured Bond Entered as to Naiyang Lin in amount of $75,000, Receipt #500002103. (ac) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | ||
34 | 34 ENTRY OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Alyssa D Farrell appearing for Naiqing Lin (Farrell, Alyssa) [5:23-mj-00276-STE] | |
72 | 72 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Li Jin Yang. Arraignment set for 5/26/2023 03:00 PM in Courtroom 103 before Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green. (rb) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
73 | 73 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin:Detention Hearing as to Naiyang Lin held on 5/18/2023 (ac) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
74 | 74 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Naiyang Lin (2) 75,000. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 5/18/2023. (ac) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
75 | 75 Appearance Bond as to Naiyang Lin (2) $75,000 Secured. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 5/18/2023. (ac) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
76 | 76 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Fei Xie. Initial Appearance set for 5/26/2023 03:00 PM in Courtroom 103 before Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green. (rb) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
Friday, May 19, 2023 | ||
37 | 37 ** SEALED DOCUMENT ** CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Brandon Lin (ac) [5:23-mj-00276-STE] | |
38 | 38 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Christine M Cave for Brandon Lin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 5/19/2023. (ac) [5:23-mj-00276-STE] | |
39 | 39 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin:Initial Appearance as to Brandon Lin held on 5/19/2023 (ac) [5:23-mj-00276-STE] | |
40 | 40 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Brandon Lin (2) 5000. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 5/19/2023. (ac) [5:23-mj-00276-STE] | |
41 | 41 Appearance Bond as to Brandon Lin (2) 5000. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 5/19/2023. (ac) [5:23-mj-00276-STE] | |
42 | 42 DPPA-ORDER as to Brandon Lin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 5/19/2023. (ac) [5:23-mj-00276-STE] | |
79 | 79 ** SEALED DOCUMENT ** CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Ahmed Salim Harrold (ac) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
80 | 80 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Craig M Hoehns for Ahmed Salim Harrold. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 5/19/2023. (ac) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
81 | 81 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin:Initial Appearance as to Ahmed Salim Harrold held on 5/19/2023. Preliminary Hearing as to Ahmed Salim Harrold waived on 5/19/2023. (ac) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
82 | 82 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Ahmed Salim Harrold (ac) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
83 | 83 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Ahmed Salim Harrold (11) 5000.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 5/19/2023. (ac) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
84 | 84 Appearance Bond as to Ahmed Salim Harrold (11) 5000. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 5/19/2023. (ac) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
85 | 85 DPPA-ORDER as to Ahmed Salim Harrold. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 5/19/2023. (ac) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
Monday, May 22, 2023 | ||
50 | 50 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Brandon Lin. Preliminary Hearing set for 5/26/2023 11:00 AM in Courtroom 103 before Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green. (rb) [5:23-mj-00276-STE] | |
86 | 86 ** SEALED DOCUMENT ** CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Daniel Walsh (rb) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
87 | 87 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Robert S Jackson for Daniel Walsh. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 5/22/2023. (rb) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
88 | 88 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green:Initial Appearance as to Daniel Walsh held on 5/22/2023. Defendant released on bond and conditions. (rb) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
89 | 89 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 5/22/2023. (rb) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
90 | 90 Appearance Bond as to Daniel Walsh (8) $25,000.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 5/22/2023. (rb) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
91 | 91 DPPA-ORDER as to Daniel Walsh. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 5/22/2023. (rb) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
Tuesday, May 23, 2023 | ||
51 | 51 ENTRY OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Cesar A Armenta appearing for Naiqing Lin (Armenta, Cesar) [5:23-mj-00276-STE] | |
52 | 52 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Alyssa Donovan Farrell. by Naiqing Lin. (Farrell, Alyssa) [5:23-mj-00276-STE] | |
92 | 92 ENTRY OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Craig M Hoehns appearing for Ahmed Salim Harrold (Hoehns, Craig) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
93 | 93 ENTRY OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Tyler C Box appearing for Fei Xie (Box, Tyler) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
94 | 94 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney: Robert Gamburg. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AOKWDC-4166023. by Fei Xie.(Box, Tyler) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
Att: 1 Attachment, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment | ||
95 | 95 ENTRY OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Robert S Jackson appearing for Daniel Walsh (Jackson, Robert) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
Wednesday, May 24, 2023 | ||
53 | 53 ORDER granting52 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. as to Naiqing Lin (3). Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 5/24/2023. (rb) [5:23-mj-00276-STE] | |
96 | 96 ENTRY OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Benjamin L Munda, IV appearing for Fei Xie (Munda, Benjamin) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
97 | 97 ENTRY OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Joshua C Smith appearing for Meiyan Xiao (Smith, Joshua) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
98 | 98 FIRST MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney: Joshua C. Smith. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AOKWDC-4167150. by Meiyan Xiao.(Smith, Joshua) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
Att: 1 Attachment Request For Admission, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment Certificate Of Good Standing | ||
Thursday, May 25, 2023 | ||
54 | 54 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Naiqing Lin. Initial Appearance set for 6/1/2023 03:00 PM in Courtroom 101 before Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green. (rb) [5:23-mj-00276-STE] | |
99 | 99 AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING as to Fei Xie. Initial Appearance set for 6/1/2023 03:00 PM in Courtroom 101 before Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green. (rb) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
Friday, May 26, 2023 | ||
55 | 55 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green:Preliminary Hearing as to Brandon Lin held on 5/26/2023. (rb) [5:23-mj-00276-STE] | |
101 | 101 ** SEALED DOCUMENT ** CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Li Jin Yang (rb) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
102 | 102 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Robert D. Gifford, II for Li Jin Yang. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 5/26/2023. (rb) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
103 | 103 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green:Initial Appearance as to Li Jin Yang held on 5/26/2023. Preliminary Hearing set for 6/7/2023 01:30 PM in Courtroom 101 before Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green. Defendant released on bond and conditions. (rb) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
104 | 104 ORDER that Vivan Josh is appointed as interpreter for dft Li Jin Yang. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 5/26/2023. (rb) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
105 | 105 ORDER that Vivan Josh is appointed as out of court interpreter for dft Li Jin Yang. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 5/26/2023. (rb) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
106 | 106 WRITTEN OATH of Interpreter Vivan Josh as to dft Li Jin Yang (rb) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
107 | 107 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 5/26/2023. (rb) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
108 | 108 Appearance Bond as to Li Jin Yang (3) $5,000.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 5/26/2023. (rb) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
109 | 109 DPPA-ORDER as to Li Jin Yang. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 5/26/2023. (rb) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
110 | 110 ENTRY OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Robert D. Gifford, II appearing for Li Jin Yang (Gifford, Robert) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
Wednesday, May 31, 2023 | ||
56 | 56 MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict by United States of America as to Naigang Lin, Brandon Lin, Naiqing Lin, Juan Lyu, David Arman Smith. (Coffey, Nicholas) [5:23-mj-00276-STE] | |
57 | 57 ORDER granting56 Motion for Extension of Time to Indictment as to Naigang Lin (1), Brandon Lin (2), Naiqing Lin (3), Juan Lyu (4), David Arman Smith (5). Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 5/31/2023. (rb) [5:23-mj-00276-STE] | |
111 | 111 12 pgs MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict by United States of America as to Naigang Lin, Naiyang Lin, Li Jin Yang, Dong Lin, Chang-Hui Chen, Meiyan Xiao, Barry Stadler, Daniel Walsh, Terrance Jamahl Allen, Fei Xie, Ahmed Salim Harrold, Luis Rafael Larios-Benites. (Coffey, Nicholas) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
112 | 112 2 pgs ORDER granting111 Motion for Extension of Time to Indict as to Naigang Lin (1), Naiyang Lin (2), Li Jin Yang (3), Dong Lin (4), Chang-Hui Chen (5), Meiyan Xiao (6), Barry Stadler (7), Daniel Walsh (8), Terrance Jamahl Allen (9), Fei Xie (10), Ahmed Salim Harrold (11), Luis Rafael Larios-Benites (12). Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 5/31/2023. (rb) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
Thursday, June 01, 2023 | ||
58 | 58 ARREST WARRANT Returned Executed on 06/01/2023 in case as to Naiqing Lin. (kb) [5:23-mj-00276-STE] | |
60 | 60 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green:Initial Appearance as to Naiqing Lin held on 6/1/2023. Preliminary Hearing as to Naiqing Lin waived on 6/1/2023. Defendant released on bond and conditions. (rb) [5:23-mj-00276-STE] | |
61 | 61 ORDER that Vivan Josh is appointed as interpreter for dft Naiqing Lin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 6/1/2023. (rb) [5:23-mj-00276-STE] | |
62 | 62 WRITTEN OATH of Interpreter Vivan Josh as to dft Naiqing Lin (rb) [5:23-mj-00276-STE] | |
63 | 63 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Naiqing Lin (rb) [5:23-mj-00276-STE] | |
64 | 64 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 6/1/2023. (rb) [5:23-mj-00276-STE] | |
65 | 65 Appearance Bond as to Naiqing Lin (3) $200,000.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 6/1/2023. (rb) [5:23-mj-00276-STE] | |
66 | 66 DPPA-ORDER as to Naiqing Lin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 6/1/2023. (rb) [5:23-mj-00276-STE] | |
114 | 114 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green:Initial Appearance as to Fei Xie held on 6/1/2023. Preliminary Hearing as to Fei Xie waived on 6/1/2023. Defendant released on bond and conditions. (rb) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
115 | 115 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Fei Xie (rb) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
116 | 116 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 6/1/2023. (rb) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
117 | 117 Appearance Bond as to Fei Xie (10) $50,000.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 6/1/2023. (rb) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
118 | 118 DPPA-ORDER as to Fei Xie. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 6/1/2023. (rb) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
Friday, June 02, 2023 | ||
119 | 119 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Meiyan Xiao. Initial Appearance set for 6/6/2023 01:30 PM in Courtroom 101 before Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green. (rb) (Main Document 119 replaced on 6/2/2023) (rb). [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
120 | 120 AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING as to Li Jin Yang. Preliminary Hearing set for 6/6/2023 02:00 PM in Courtroom 101 before Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green. (rb) (Main Document 120 replaced on 6/2/2023) (rb). [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
121 | 121 ** SEALED DOCUMENT ** CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Barry Stadler (rb) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
122 | 122 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Lance B Phillips for Barry Stadler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 6/2/2023. (rb) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
123 | 123 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green:Initial Appearance as to Barry Stadler held on 6/2/2023. Detention Hearing set for 6/9/2023 11:00 AM in Courtroom 101 before Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green. Preliminary Hearing set for 6/9/2023 11:00 AM in Courtroom 101 before Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green. (rb) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
124 | 124 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Barry Stadler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 6/2/2023. (rb) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
125 | 125 DPPA-ORDER as to Barry Stadler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 6/2/2023. (rb) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
127 | 127 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Barry Stadler. Detention Hearing set for 6/9/2023 11:00 AM in Courtroom 101 before Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green. Preliminary Hearing set for 6/9/2023 11:00 AM in Courtroom 101 before Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green. [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
Tuesday, June 06, 2023 | ||
128 | 128 ORDER granting98 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Meiyan Xiao (6). Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 6/6/2023. (rb) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
129 | 129 ENTRY OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Joshua C Smith appearing for Meiyan Xiao (Smith, Joshua) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
131 | 131 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green:Initial Appearance as to Meiyan Xiao held on 6/6/2023. Preliminary Hearing as to Meiyan Xiao waived on 6/6/2023. Defendant released on bond and conditions. (rb) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
132 | 132 ORDER that Vivan Josh is appointed as interpreter for dft Meiyan Xiao. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 6/6/2023. (rb) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
133 | 133 WRITTEN OATH of Interpreter Vivan Josh as to dft Meiyan Xiao (rb) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
134 | 134 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 6/6/2023. (rb) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
135 | 135 Appearance Bond as to Meiyan Xiao (6) $5,000.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 6/6/2023. (rb) (Main Document 135 replaced on 6/6/2023) (rb). [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
136 | 136 DPPA-ORDER as to Meiyan Xiao. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 6/6/2023. (rb) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
137 | 137 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green:Preliminary Hearing as to Li Jin Yang held on 6/6/2023. (rb) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
Thursday, June 08, 2023 | ||
138 | 138 ENTRY OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Lance B Phillips appearing for Barry Stadler (Phillips, Lance) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
Friday, June 09, 2023 | ||
139 | 139 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green:Preliminary Hearing as to Barry Stadler waived on 6/9/2023. Detention Hearing as to Barry Stadler waived on 6/9/2023. (rb) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
140 | 140 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Barry Stadler (rb) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
141 | 141 WAIVER Of Detention Hearing & Consent to Order of Detention with an Order of Detention pending further proceedings as to Barry Stadler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 6/9/2023. (rb) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
Friday, June 16, 2023 | ||
143 | 143 ** SEALED DOCUMENT ** CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Luis Rafael Larios-Benites (lb) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
144 | 144 1 pgs ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Henry A Meyer, III for Luis Rafael Larios-Benites. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 6/16/23. (lb) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
145 | 145 1 pgs MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell: Initial Appearance as to Luis Rafael Larios-Benites held on 6/16/2023, Detention Hearing set for 6/21/2023 at Noon in Courtroom 102 before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. Preliminary Hearing set for 6/21/2023 at Noon in Courtroom 102 before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. Defendant remanded to custody of USMS. (lb) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
146 | 146 1 pgs ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Luis Rafael Larios-Benites. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 6/16/23. (lb) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
147 | 147 2 pgs DPPA-ORDER as to Luis Rafael Larios-Benites. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 6/16/23. (lb) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
148 | 148 1 pgs NOTICE OF HEARING as to Luis Rafael Larios-Benites. Detention Hearing set for 6/21/2023 at Noon in Courtroom 102 before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. Preliminary Hearing set for 6/21/2023 at Noon in Courtroom 102 before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. (lb) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
149 | 149 1 pgs ENTRY OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Henry A Meyer, III appearing for Luis Rafael Larios-Benites (Meyer, Henry) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
Tuesday, June 20, 2023 | ||
150 | 150 1 pgs ARREST WARRANT Returned Executed on 06/16/2023 in case as to Luis Rafael Larios-Benites. (kb) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
Wednesday, June 21, 2023 | ||
151 | 151 1 pgs MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell: Preliminary Hearing as to Luis Rafael Larios-Benites waived on 6/21/2023, Detention Hearing as to Luis Rafael Larios-Benites not held on 6/21/2023; Government withdrew request for detention. Defendant released on unsecured bond with conditions of release. (lb) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
152 | 152 1 pgs WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Luis Rafael Larios-Benites (lb) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
153 | 153 4 pgs ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Luis Rafael Larios-Benites. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 6/21/23. (lb) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
154 | 154 2 pgs Appearance Bond as to Luis Rafael Larios-Benites (12) $5,000.00 Unsecured. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 6/21/23. (lb) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
Thursday, June 29, 2023 | ||
155 | 155 PETITION for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release as to Daniel Walsh and Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 6/29/23. (lb) [5:23-mj-00277-STE] | |
Att: 1 Consent to Modify Conditions of Release | ||
Wednesday, July 05, 2023 | ||
157 | 157 41 pgs INDICTMENT as to Naigang Lin (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 6, 8-11, 14, 16, 17-21, 22-24, 46-47, and criminal forfeiture, Naiyang Lin (2) count(s) 1, 8, 12, 13, 14, 28-45, and criminal forfeiture, Li Jin Yang (3) count(s) 1, 12, 14, 15, and criminal forfeiture, Dong Lin (4) count(s) 1, 12, and criminal forfeiture, Chang-Hui Chen (5) count(s) 1, 6, 8-11, and criminal forfeiture, Meiyan Xiao (6) count(s) 1, 3, 6, 8-11, and criminal forfeiture, Fei Xie (7) count(s) 1, and criminal forfeiture, Barry Stadler (8) count(s) 1, and criminal forfeiture, Daniel Walsh (9) count(s) 1, 2, 14, 22-24, 25-27, and criminal forfeiture, Terrance Jamahl Allen (10) count(s) 1, 7, 14, and criminal forfeiture, Ahmed Salim Harrold (11) count(s) 1, 14, and criminal forfeiture, Luis Rafael Larios-Benites (12) count(s) 1, 4, 5, and criminal forfeiture, Naiqing Lin (13) count(s) 14, and criminal forfeiture, Juan Lyu (14) count(s) 14, 15-16, and criminal forfeiture, Brandon Lin (15) count(s) 14, and criminal forfeiture. (ekw) | |
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet 1 - Naigang Lin, | ||
Att: 2 Criminal Cover Sheet 2 - Naiyang Lin, | ||
Att: 3 Criminal Cover Sheet 3 - Li Jin Yang, | ||
Att: 4 Criminal Cover Sheet 4 - Dong Lin, | ||
Att: 5 Criminal Cover Sheet 5 - Chang-Hui Chen, | ||
Att: 6 Criminal Cover Sheet 6 - Meiyan Xiao, | ||
Att: 7 1 pgs Criminal Cover Sheet 7 - Fei Xie, | ||
Att: 8 Criminal Cover Sheet 8 - Barry Stadler, | ||
Att: 9 Criminal Cover Sheet 9 - Daniel Walsh, | ||
Att: 10 Criminal Cover Sheet 10 - Terrance Jamahl Allen, | ||
Att: 11 Criminal Cover Sheet 11 - Ahmed Salim Harrold, | ||
Att: 12 1 pgs Criminal Cover Sheet 12 - Luis Rafael Larios-Benites, | ||
Att: 13 Criminal Cover Sheet 13 - Naiqing Lin, | ||
Att: 14 Criminal Cover Sheet 14 - Juan Lyu, | ||
Att: 15 Criminal Cover Sheet 15 - Brandon Lin |