Benson et al v. The 3M Company
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-03265 |
Nature of Suit | 385 Torts - Personal Property - Property Damage Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship) |
Case Filed: | Jul 10, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Wisconsin Eastern, 1:23-cv-00845 |
Last checked: Saturday Jan 06, 2024 4:33 AM EST |
Defendant
The 3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Lebick
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lori Seymour
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George Seymour
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Debra Powers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cynthia Powers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Mollus
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kathleen Magnin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gerald Madsen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Arlene Madsen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gertrude Larson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Kotecki
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vernon J Heusinger
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kathleen Heusinger
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dustin Dreifuerst
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Livia Benson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James H Benson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amelia Benson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 08/20 2:00 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Paul Albinger, Linda Anderson, Dominic Bazile, Jim Beckett, Warren Blackwell, Larry Bradshaw, James Collman, Alphonse Dellert, Glenn Downs, John Falk, Brian Ferrier, David Floyd, Gibson Glenn, Pete Gonzales, TF Greeson III, Claude Hampton, Donald Handy, Kenneth Hansen, Roy Heskett, John Kerwan Jr, Rusty Keyes, James Lazzeri, Jackie Lewis, Jerry Miller, Dewey Morgan, Jeffery Morrill, McCracken Paul, David Pegg, Michael Peters, Michael Plato, Donald Raasch, Dennis Rice, Lee Rt, Cecil Salley, Kenneth Savage, David Scolum, Clark Sherman, Glenn Smith, Fabina Stephen, Amelia Benson, James H Benson, Livia Benson, Dustin Dreifuerst, Kathleen Heusinger, Kathleen Magnin Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice As to Personal Injury Claims OnlyAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03265-RMG, 2:23-cv-03526-RMG(Croner, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 08/12 5:19 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Allen Clark without prejudice, as to plaintiffs Clark, Allen; Cobb, Maureen; Craft, Ezell; Emblom, David; Green, Michael; Linkes, Michael M.; Mcfeley, Harry; Sexton, Thomas; Sloan, Scott; Smith, Lamont; Tedder, William; West, Terry; Chitwood, Harold; Holloway, Victoria; Blair, Devonna; Brown, Wilmore; Macklin, Fania M; McNealey, Garlin; Morrow, William; Heusinger, Vernon J; Kotecki, Richard; Larson, Gertrude; Lebick, Robert; Madsen, Arlene; Powers, Cynthia; Powers, Debra; Seymour, George; Seymour, LoriAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Mindicino, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Friday, September 08, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued
Sat 09/09 2:42 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
Tuesday, July 11, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Tue 07/11 11:30 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Wisconsin Eastern (associated as of 7/10/2023), 1:23-cv-00845, Benson et al v. The 3M Company, as DSC case 2:23-cv-03265-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
7 | 7
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Tue 07/11 10:51 AM
Case transferred in from District of Wisconsin Eastern; Case Number 1:23-cv-00845. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Monday, July 10, 2023 | ||
6 | 6 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-139) transferring this action to the USDC for the District of South Carolina for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1407. (cc: all counsel)(lh) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 7/11/2023.] | |
Thursday, July 06, 2023 | ||
5 | 5 FILING ERROR. WRONG CASE> LETTER from the clerk to Rodney Jett re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Dries and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (lh) Modified as filing error on 7/6/2023 (lh). [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 7/11/2023.] | |
Monday, June 26, 2023 | ||
Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: One or more party names have been modified - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. ; Please refer to the[LINK:attorney case opening instructions] , the[LINK:summons instructions] and the[LINK:party name guidelines found in the user manual] for further guidance (jmk) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 7/11/2023.] | ||
Friday, June 23, 2023 | ||
4 | 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan E Lovern on behalf of 3M Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Susan Lovern (Lovern, Susan) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 7/11/2023.] | |
3 | 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek J Waterstreet on behalf of 3M Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Derek Waterstreet (Waterstreet, Derek) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 7/11/2023.] | |
2 | 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by 3M Company. (Waterstreet, Derek) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 7/11/2023.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M Company from Marinette County, Case Number: 23-CV-114 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-4433164)(Waterstreet, Derek) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 7/11/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Benson Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service | ||
NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available[LINK:here.] (vkb) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 7/11/2023.] |