Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Joel H Slomsky
Case #: 2:23-cv-02646
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Case Filed:Jul 11, 2023
Terminated:Aug 20, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jan 07, 2024 5:10 AM EST
Defendant
Richard Leahn McDonald
7 Crown Point Drive., #27
Dover, NH 03820
Represented By
ROBERT W. SHAW, III
Mintzer, Sarowitz, Zeris, Ledva & Meyers LLP
contact info
Defendant
Rapid Fast LLC
5424 Page Blvd.
Saint Louis, MO 63112
Represented By
ROBERT W. SHAW, III
Mintzer, Sarowitz, Zeris, Ledva & Meyers LLP
contact info
Defendant
Demetrius H. Roach
5424 Page Blvd.
Saint Louis, MO 36112
Represented By
ROBERT W. SHAW, III
Mintzer, Sarowitz, Zeris, Ledva & Meyers LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Carolyn Kantor
220 Shawmont Ave.
Philadelphia, PA 19128
Represented By
JOSEPH F. SCHWARTZ
Silver & Silver
contact info
Plaintiff
Gregory Shugar
(H/W) 220 Shawmont Ave.
Philadelphia, PA 19128
Represented By
JOSEPH F. SCHWARTZ
Silver & Silver
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
46 46 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case - 41(b) Wed 08/21 8:15 AM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 08/20/2024. 08/21/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nd)
Related: [-]
45 45 minutes Jury Trial - Completed Tue 08/20 12:30 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE JOEL H. SLOMSKY in Courtroom 13A. Jury Trial - Day 2 held on 8/20/24. Court Reporter: ESR. (mbh)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
44 44 minutes Jury Trial - Begun Tue 08/20 8:57 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE JOEL H. SLOMSKY in Courtroom 13A. Jury Trial - Day 1 held on 8/19/24. Court Reporter: ESR. (mbh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
43 43 trial Proposed Voir Dire Wed 08/14 4:34 PM
Proposed Voir Dire by Carolyn Kantor, Gregory Shugar. (SCHWARTZ, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
42 42 trial Proposed Verdict Sheet Wed 08/14 4:33 PM
Proposed Verdict Sheet by Carolyn Kantor, Gregory Shugar.. (SCHWARTZ, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
41 41 trial Proposed Jury Instructions Wed 08/14 4:32 PM
Proposed Jury Instructions by Carolyn Kantor, Gregory Shugar. (SCHWARTZ, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
40 40 trial Proposed Jury Interrogatories Wed 08/14 4:31 PM
Proposed Jury Interrogatories by Carolyn Kantor, Gregory Shugar. (SCHWARTZ, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
39 39 2 pgs order Order on Motion in Limine Tue 08/13 11:47 AM
DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE LOSS OF FUTURE EARNINGS (DOC. NO. 25) IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE ANY REFERENCE AT TRIAL TO WORKERS COMPENSATION BENEFITS (DOC. NO. 26) IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE ANY REFERENCE REGARDING CONTRIBUTORY NEGLIGENCE (DOC. NO. 27) IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE ANY REFERENCE TO PLAINTIFF'S LAWSUIT RELATING TO A 1993 AUTO ACCIDENT IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 8/12/24.8/13/24 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
38 38 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 08/05 9:00 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re25 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Loss of Future Earnings filed by Carolyn Kantor, Gregory Shugar.(SCHWARTZ, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Exhibit,
Att: 9 Exhibit,
Att: 10 Exhibit,
Att: 11 Exhibit
37 37 trial Proposed Jury Interrogatories Mon 08/05 8:41 PM
Proposed Jury Interrogatories by Carolyn Kantor, Gregory Shugar. (SCHWARTZ, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
36 36 trial Proposed Verdict Sheet Mon 08/05 8:39 PM
Proposed Verdict Sheet by Carolyn Kantor, Gregory Shugar.. (SCHWARTZ, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
35 35 trial Proposed Jury Instructions Mon 08/05 8:39 PM
Proposed Jury Instructions by Carolyn Kantor, Gregory Shugar. (SCHWARTZ, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
34 34 trial Proposed Jury Instructions Mon 08/05 8:38 PM
Proposed Jury Instructions by Carolyn Kantor, Gregory Shugar. (SCHWARTZ, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
33 33 trial Proposed Jury Instructions Mon 08/05 3:30 PM
Proposed Jury Instructions by Richard Leahn McDonald, Rapid Fast LLC, Demetrius H. Roach. (SHAW, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
32 32 trial Proposed Jury Instructions Mon 08/05 3:29 PM
Proposed Jury Instructions by Richard Leahn McDonald, Rapid Fast LLC, Demetrius H. Roach. (SHAW, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
31 31 trial Proposed Verdict Sheet Mon 08/05 2:56 PM
Proposed Verdict Sheet by Richard Leahn McDonald, Rapid Fast LLC, Demetrius H. Roach.. (SHAW, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
30 30 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 08/05 11:35 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re27 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Any Reference or Argument at Trial Regarding Plaintiffs Contributory Negligence filed by Richard Leahn McDonald, Rapid Fast LLC, Demetrius H. Roach.(SHAW, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
29 29 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 08/05 11:31 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re28 MOTION in Limine to any reference at trial to Plaintiffs lawsuit relating to her 1993 auto accident filed by Richard Leahn McDonald, Rapid Fast LLC, Demetrius H. Roach. (SHAW, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
28 28 motion In Limine Mon 07/29 4:43 PM
MOTION in Limine to any reference at trial to Plaintiffs lawsuit relating to her 1993 auto accident filed by Carolyn Kantor, Gregory Shugar.Memorandum, Brief, COS.(SCHWARTZ, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
27 27 motion In Limine Mon 07/29 4:42 PM
MOTION in Limine to Preclude Any Reference or Argument at Trial Regarding Plaintiffs Contributory Negligence filed by Carolyn Kantor, Gregory Shugar.Memorandum, Brief, COS.(SCHWARTZ, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
26 26 motion In Limine Mon 07/29 4:41 PM
MOTION in Limine to Preclude Any Reference at Trial to Workers Compensation Benefits and/or Other Benefits Paid to Plaintiff filed by Carolyn Kantor, Gregory Shugar.Memorandum, Brief, COS.(SCHWARTZ, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
25 25 motion In Limine Mon 07/29 12:50 PM
MOTION in Limine to Preclude Loss of Future Earnings filed by Richard Leahn McDonald, Rapid Fast LLC, Demetrius H. Roach.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(SHAW, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits
Friday, July 26, 2024
24 24 minutes Settlement Conference Fri 07/26 2:07 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE SCOTT W. REID. Settlement Conference held on 7/26/24. (mbh)
Related: [-]
23 23 minutes Settlement Conference Fri 07/26 1:43 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE SCOTT W. REID Settlement Conference held on 07/25/2024. (nd)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
22 22 misc Pretrial Memorandum Mon 07/15 12:16 PM
PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by Richard Leahn McDonald, Rapid Fast LLC, Demetrius H. Roach Certificate of Service. (SHAW, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Pretrial Memorandum Mon 07/15 11:49 AM
PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by Carolyn Kantor. (SCHWARTZ, JOSEPH) (Main Document 21 replaced on 7/15/2024 as per Chambers) (va). Modified on 7/15/2024 (va)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
20 20 minutes Settlement Conference Thu 06/27 3:58 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE SCOTT W. REID. Settlement Conference held on 6/27/24. (mbh)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
19 19 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 05/13 2:36 PM
ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 6/27/2024 AT 10:00 AM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE SCOTT W. REID, THE CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD VIRTUALLY THROUGH THE USE OF ZOOM. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE SCOTT W. REID ON 5/13/24. 5/13/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
18 18 minutes Settlement Conference Mon 05/06 2:45 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE SCOTT W. REID Settlement Conference held on 5/6/24. (JL)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
17 17 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 03/15 10:40 AM
ORDER THAT THE ORDER DATED 3/14/24 IS AMENDED. THE TELEPHONE CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 4/3/2024 AT 10:00 AM BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE JOEL H. SLOMSKY. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 3/15/24. 3/15/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 03/14 3:07 PM
ORDER THAT A TELEPHONE CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 3/25/2024 AT 10:00 AM BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE JOEL H. SLOMSKY. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 3/13/24. 3/14/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
15 15 misc Letter Fri 03/08 8:42 AM
Letter addressed to Judge Slomsky dated 3/7/24. (mbh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
14 14 order Scheduling Order Thu 02/01 2:35 PM
FIRST AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: ALL FACT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 3/25/24. ALL MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DAUBERT MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED BY 6/17/24. NO LATER THAN 7/15/24 THE PARTIES SHALL FILE THEIR PRETRIAL MEMORANDA. ALL MOTIONS IN LIMINE AND OTHER PRETRIAL MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED BY 7/29/24. A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 8/12/24 AT 2:30 PM IN CHAMBERS. THIS CASE WILL BE LISTED FOR TRIAL ON 8/19/24 AT 9:30 AM IN COURTROOM 13A. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 2/1/24. 2/1/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines Thu 02/01 2:41 PM
Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 8/12/2024 02:30 PM IN CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY. (mbh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
13 13 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 01/31 9:57 AM
ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 5/6/2024 AT 10:00 AM IN COURTROOM 3C BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE SCOTT W. REID. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE SCOTT W. REID ON 1/30/24. 1/31/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Letter Tue 01/30 4:47 PM
Letter addressed to The Hon. Joel H. Slomsky dated 1/18/24. (mbh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
11 11 minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Wed 11/01 9:56 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY. Telephone Pretrial Conference held on 10/27/23. (mbh)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2023
10 10 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge-Settlement Mon 10/30 9:16 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: THE PARTIES SHALL APPEAR FOR MEDIATION BEFORE U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE SCOTT W. REID ON 2/27/24 AT 10:00 AM. ALL FACT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 3/25/24. ALL MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DAUBERT MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED BY 6/17/24. NO LATER THAN 7/15/24 THE PARTIES SHALL FILE THEIR PRETRIAL MEMORANDA. ALL MOTIONS IN LIMINE AND OTHER PRETRIAL MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED BY 7/29/24. A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 8/12/24 AT 2:30 PM IN CHAMBERS. THIS CASE WILL BE LISTED FOR TRIAL ON 8/19/24 AT 9:30 AM IN COURTROOM 13A. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 10/27/23. 10/30/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2023
9 9 misc Status Report Mon 10/23 4:05 PM
STATUS REPORT Report of Rule 26(f) Meeting Joint Report by Richard Leahn McDonald, Rapid Fast LLC, Demetrius H. Roach. (SHAW, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
8 8 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 09/28 2:56 PM
ORDER THAT A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD 10/27/2023 AT 4:00 PM VIA TELEPHONE CONFERRENCE BEFORE HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 9/28/23. 9/28/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (mbh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 09/13 11:45 AM
Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by Richard Leahn McDonald, Rapid Fast LLC, Demetrius H. Roach.(SHAW, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 08/30 11:14 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT W. SHAW, III on behalf of Richard Leahn McDonald with Jury Demand(SHAW, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 28, 2023
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 08/28 12:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT W. SHAW, III on behalf of Rapid Fast LLC, Demetrius H. Roach with Jury Demand(SHAW, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 25, 2023
4 4 service Affidavit of Service Tue 07/25 4:08 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Adam Elliott re: served Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Designation Form, Case Management Track Form, First Amended Complaint upon Demetrius H. Roach by Personal/Individual on 07/18/2023 (SCHWARTZ, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Affidavit of Service Tue 07/25 4:05 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Adam Elliott re: served Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Designation Form, Case Management Track Form, First Amended Complaint upon Rapid Fast, LLC by Authorized on 07/18/2023 (SCHWARTZ, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 12, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 07/12 11:28 AM
Summons Issued as to Richard Leahn McDonald, Rapid Fast LLC, Demetrius H. Roach. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 7/12/23 (bw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 11, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Tue 07/11 2:03 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16804450.), filed by Carolyn Kantor, Gregory Shugar.(SCHWARTZ, JOSEPH) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/11/2023) (sbt). (Attachment 2 replaced on 7/11/2023) (sbt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form,
Att: 3 Case Management Track Form