Busby et al v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-03304 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 11, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Alabama Northern, 2:23-cv-00782 |
Last checked: Sunday Jan 07, 2024 4:43 AM EST |
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
Allstar Fire Equipment
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corp
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Fire-Dex LLC
780 Progress Dr.
Medina, OH 44256 |
|
Defendant
Globe Manufacturing Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Honeywell Safety Products USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC
|
|
Defendant
Lion Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
Mallory Safety and Supply LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Municipal Emergency Services Inc
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
PBI Performance Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Southern Mills Inc
|
|
Defendant
Stedfast USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
as successor in interest to The Ansul Company One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
WI Gore & Associates
|
|
Plaintiff
Gerold A Abbott
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Russell Ackerman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Adlesic
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Allen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James R Almand
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Neal Almand
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael James Alspaugh
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Michael Alvarez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edward Amescua
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Islaam Amin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cody Anderson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fred Anderson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Victor T Anderson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Anthony
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bradford Arbogast
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Arena, III
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ron Armstrong
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Arnold
213039 Turbeville Correctional Institution PO Box 252
Turbeville, SC 29162 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas John Arnold
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Rene Arnold
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Francisco Arriola
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephen Franklin Atterton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Atwell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Aughe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Wayne Avanzato
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Ted Avelallemant
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Avis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Luis Ayala
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Isaac Bailey, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Clifford Herbert Baker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Darrell Baker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pierre Edward Baker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Darrell Lavren Baldwin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony L Ballain
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Sean Barrett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Raymond Barron
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ryan Carr Bartlett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Dean Bartolomei
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul Joseph Basic, Sr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Harold Bates
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kelvin Donnell Battle, Sr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Clay Bays
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul Beale
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert E Beals
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jennifer Bearcub
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott H Behm, Sr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Loyd N Belgarde
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Bellanich
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Timothy Jon Bendekovic
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Allen Bennett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John S Bennett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Russell Scott Bennett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephen M Bennett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Willaim Paul Bentley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Clifford J Bergen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph M Berkery
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Quill Charles Berry, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Allen Bertram
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark E Best, III
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bruce Craig Bevington
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Felix Binkowski
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pamela Allison Bishop
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William J Bisignano, III
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Douglas Paul Black
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chris David Blackburn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard F Blackford
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lori Kathleen Blackshear
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marshaun Jerome Blake, Sr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alzina Marie Blanchard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Bogdan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Don Bonal
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Michael Bonsanti
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Leon Booth, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pedro Antonio Botello
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Larence Gary Bounty
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Harvard Bourque
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Lee Bowling
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Durell Brann
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mary Brannon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Neal David Brasfield
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Braswell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Willie R Braxton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Michael Breeden, Sr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Milton Ray Brees
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Claude Jarvis Brehon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Oscar Breitkreutz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffery Bridges
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael James Briglia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John P Brinkley, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott Brookes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joshua Broome
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Herbert Lawrence Broughton, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Broussard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Curtis Brown
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Floyd Brown
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jason Brown
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jerome Brown
175377 Ridgeland Correctional Institution PO Box 2039
Ridgeland, SC 29936 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Johnnie Lee Brown
187755 Allendale Correctional Institution PO Box 1151
Fairfax, SC 29827 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Samuel Antonio Brown
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Timothy J Brown
76618 Charleston County Detention Center 3841 Leeds Avenue
Charleston, SC 29405 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vincent Paul Brown
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Webb Brown
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dean Bruch
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George L Brzeczek
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rafael Eugene Bueno
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bradley Buhr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Burdych
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Peter J Burgert
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Eric Burks
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Salvatore A D Burrello
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Burris
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary Ervin Burriss
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Keith Bursey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Johnnie Winston Busby
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew W Buss
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edward James Butler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Clarence Bynes, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Larry Muryl Byrge
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Robert Cahill
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George R Caldwell, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul W Callahan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephen J Callahan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eric Mitchell Campbell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael W Campbell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Terrance D Campbell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dr. William Campbell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gerardo Cantu
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lee Forrest Cappis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edwin J Carazo, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Cardinal
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Douglas Carlson
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
Frank William Boyd
Terminated: 09/21/2023
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, September 04, 2024 | ||
35 | 35
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 09/04 12:03 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Dominick Frazia, Kevin O. Goins, Steven James Hart, Issac Hatton, Roger Ralph Reed, Richard Bryan Shearin, Michael Sherman, James Smith, Michael E Smith, Desi D Wade, Robert Thomas Welch, Lawrence Edward Wells, Frank Edward White, Sr, Michael William Stockton, David A Wrightson, Raymond Roger Ramsey, William Edward Carr, James Ray Carwile, Neil Colosi, Frank Sefl, Jr, Ildebarando Boby Francone, Thomas Joseph Futterer, Russell Ackerman, Richard F Blackford, Ralph Charles Alario, II, Kenneth Aman, Jose Pabalan Bautista, Gene Spencer, John Joseph Sweeney, Lee Richard Tague, Gary Martin Blasingame, Senator Madison Brunson, Nelson Blaine Burk, Mitchell Clay McDonald, Jr, Stephen Brad McLaughlin, Jeffrey D Meddin, Greg Miller, Lawrence Mitchell Moore, Bruce Lester Morgan, William Niefer, John N Peterson, Michael Patrick Donovan, Joe Louis Duster, Michael Alan Chance, Anthony Creen, Brently Ian Dorsey, Michael Doust, Rajah Echols, Anthony D Elzy, Perry Jerome Fields Of Particular Personal Injury Claims WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
34 | 34
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 09/04 11:13 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Fred Allen Johnson, Sr, Lloyd Randal Lowe, Stephen Walter Miller, Gregory Mark Mullaley, Elijah James Oliver, Janice Winchester, Eric Firdaus Weilenman, Charles Carlyle Whitmore, Jr, Philip Miles Peacock, Charles Garry Penhale, Abel Perez, Robert Elroy Richards, Jr, Sean Craig Ronsen, Sr, Steven Allen Ross, William Louis Schaff, Jr, Michael Paul Sexton, Charles Edward Shannon, Joe Lynn Wooley, Robert Duane Colt, John Rico Cortest, Richard Andrew Couvillon, Jr, Gregory John Crispo, John Charles Fields, Johnnie Winston Busby, Teriko J Adams, Carlie Adams Mosley, Maria Quintans Godfrey, Betty Louise Thomas, Esther Lynn Gomes, Edward J Fitzgerald, Willie James Allen, Demetris Batts, Patrick James Baumgard, John Keith Berry, James P Smith, Leonard Vaughn Steving, Fred B. Stewart, Gerard Sullivan, Dennis Albert O'Key, Mundo Valez Olford, Cynthia Carner, Wesley Scott Bitner, Gary Dean Brabant, Gary Paul Broughton, Harold Gregory Brown, Sr, David Quinn Davis, Larry Darnell Dickerson, Robert Raymond Ducharme, Sandra Conley, Robert Cott Cook Of Particular Personal Injury Claims WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 09/03 10:51 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Milton Ray Brees, Richard Eric Burks, Edward James Butler, John Robert Cahill, Paul W Callahan, William Cardinal, Stanley William Goglia, Jr, Jose Miguel Gonzalez, Craig Michael Gotham, Ronald James Hawley, George Loushe Hayes, Michael Ivy, John Bryan Keegan, Larry Michael Lisowski, Joseph Arthur Gutierrez, Knud Andres Knudson, Delas Joseph Lancelin, Kevin McGavock, Jan Stewart Goldberg, David Daniel Ackman, Michael Bongerz, Walter Marsh, Michael Paul Harnett, Lawrence Gilmore Hutchinson, Roger Lee Kile, Jeffrey Lynn King, Sr, Richard Dale Kohl, Jr, Andrew Anderson Et al., Bryan Keith Hinson, William W James, Jr, Richard Martinez, Gerald Halli, Joseph George Hudeck, Jr, Lorenzo Hutchins, Phillip A Johnston, Micah Kroll, Nick L McAlpine, Leon W Henderson, James Ivy Johnson, Gregory Kevin Martin, Ronald Charles Green, Michael Joseph, Robert Kinsey, Ronnie Lanthrip, Timothy James Massaro Michael Monroe Carver as to Anderson, et al; Julian Favela, Jr. as to Anderson, et al; Gregory Djuan Jones as to Anderson, et al; Paul Anthony Kresta as to Anderson, et al; Michael Lynn Owens as to Anderson, et al; Stephen Richardson as to Anderson, et al; Of Particular Personal Injury Claims WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Status Report
Tue 08/27 11:51 PM
STATUS REPORT - General Denial and Statement of Affirmative Defenses by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
31 | 31
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 08/27 10:26 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent MSA Safety Inc. for Globe Manufacturing Company LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
30 | 30
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/27 8:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige) |
|
29 | 29
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/27 5:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Thursday, August 15, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 08/15 9:11 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Paul Beale, Joseph M Berkery, Pamela Allison Bishop, William J Bisignano, III, Ronald Leon Booth, Jr, Pedro Antonio Botello, Neal David Brasfield, Jeffery Bridges, Samuel Antonio Brown, Webb Brown, Peter J Burgert, Douglas Wayne McCann, Bryan Craig McClurg, Jerome Kenneth McInnes, Jr, James Murray Merryman, Sr, Fredrick Eugene Miggins, Mitchell Louis Miklus, Sr, Lawrence Minitrez, Carl David Mowry, Leroy Francis Myas, Robert W Nelson, James Jan Nolan, Girard Owens, Herbert O Phillips, III, Samuel Ponzio, Sr, David Orton Krause, Fidel Labeaga, Randy Langley, Johnnie Leggett, Gabriel D Quintana, Dennis Paul Rampe, Carlos Robledo, Blair Roethel, John Scheetz, Steven Schora, Barry Alan Searles, Randall Everett Sides, Alan James Simmons, Kevin Joel Sliter, Leon Smith, Matthew W Collins, II, Richard G Cooper, Gregory Dale Cordle, Edmund Delesline, John Joseph Donohue, Charles R Doster, Joseph Doyle, Jr, Roger Durham, Eric Daniel Eastlund, Michael George Eckart WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 07/29 11:02 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Islaam Amin, Robert Anthony, Willie R Braxton, John P Brinkley, Jr, Herbert Lawrence Broughton, Jr, Dean Bruch, Bradley Buhr, Salvatore A D Burrello, James Burris, Keith Bursey, Clarence Bynes, Jr, William Campbell, Richard Acosta, John Adams, Steven Aliseo, Dale Andrea, Andrew Arce, Robert Arnold, Andrew S Ashby, Guadalupe Z Azocar, Edward L Barnes, Wayne Batts, John Beavers, David Berlanga, Tim Bettendorf, Duane R Bires, Charles Blalock, James Braun, Kenneth Britt, Thomas Johnson, John M Kershaw, Joseph Earl Knox, Gordon Koenig, Kevin Kovel, Devin Kurty, Temele Lane, Bocidar Licina, Carl G Liepmann, Fred Lincoln, Erik Lippincott, Stephen M Lobley, Brandon Lyles, Patrick Lyons, Brian Maas, Joseph Madden, John Marquez, Ken Marston, John Martel, Elmer Martin, Ricardo M Mattier WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03304-RMG, 2:23-cv-03307-RMG, 2:23-cv-04190-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 07/29 10:23 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Gerold A Abbott, Kenneth Allen, Cody Anderson, Fred Anderson, Victor T Anderson, John Arnold, Francisco Arriola, Robert Avis, Darrell Baker, Clay Bays, Robert E Beals, Scott H Behm, Sr, Thomas Bellanich, John S Bennett, Clifford J Bergen, Don Bonal, Melvin Moore, William Henry Morgan, Paul Munson, Michael J Mutoza, Dennis Nason, Larry Neff, Rodney Owens, Truitt Pace, David Padula, Joe Perry, Edward Plankey, Kenneth Potter, Gabriel D Quintana, Robert Ragati, Thomas Raml, Doug Richter, Ronald J Rieber, Bruce Ripley, Bernard Robinson, Carlos Robledo, Michael Rodriguez, Keith Rominski, William Russell, Jr, Kevin Ryan, Thomas E Sanchez, Jr, Rich F Schaufert, James Sciascia, Bernard Scott, Jr, Dale K Shull, Michael Skinner, Gary Smith, James B Smith, Jr, Mark Smith, Jeffrey Smolka WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03302-RMG, 2:23-cv-03303-RMG, 2:23-cv-03304-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 07/19 8:52 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Richard Aughe, Isaac Bailey, Jr, Gerardo Cantu, Kenneth Frederickson, Davis Holbert, Sean Hoskin, Scott Letavious, Eric Lewis, Paul Lockitski, Sherman Marshall, Ronald Russell, Todd Sites, Leon Smith, Michael Strehlow, Jason Swiger, Joshua Vercruysse, Theodore Williams, Andrew Anderson Et al., Burnell J McIntyre, Shannon Morley, K Samuel Neilson, Larry German Et al., Alan B Chatters, Thomas L Derby, David Fleming Richard Anderson as to Anderson, et al; Steve Barnes as to Anderson, et al; James David Carman as to Anderson, et al; John Henry Cook as to Anderson, et al; Walter Brown Davis, III as to Anderson et al; Donald Lee Doser as to Anderson, et al; William Joseph Fidler as to Anderson, et al; James Hiram Gipson as to Anderson, et al; Patrick Leon Hall as to Anderson, et al; Ronald Lee Haynes as to Anderson, et al; Michael Jay Holzman as to Anderson, et al; Don R. Jones, Sr. as to Anderson, et al; Philip Dean Kincaid as to Anderson, et al; Alan K. Kulak as to Anderson, et al; Grant Keith Lewis as to Anderson, et al; Donald Jake Linhart as to Anderson, et al; Kenneth Wayne Maxson as to Anderson, et al; John McLain as to Anderson, et al; Aureo Felix Parrilla as to Anderson, et al; LeRoy Robinson as to Anderson, et al; Arthur Watson as to Anderson, et al; Jefferey Scott Willis as to Anderson, et al; Willis George Wilson, III as to Anderson, et al; Robert Allen Beck as to German, et al; Harold Vincent Burke as to German, et al; Donald Ray Davis as to German, et al; Billy Everett as to German, et al; WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 07/18 8:47 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Joseph Braswell, David Broussard, Ronald Freeman, James Green, Frank Herman, David Heyrman, Michael W. Hill, Kenneth Allen Karnes, George R Raby, Robert J Riegel, Matthew Roman, William Scott, Carl William Smith, Jr, Richard Sprano, Greg Stelter, Edward Vreeland, Daniel J Waddick, Andrew Anderson Et al., Donald McFadden, David Eugene Mills, Anthony Pedraza, Donald Poole, Clinton Cole, Charlie Dardenne, Jr, Joseph Dillon Roy Timothy Brockaway as to Anderson, et al; Gary Chetelat as to Anderson, et al; Leo Ray Devigil as to Anderson, et al; Anthony Harbor, Sr. as to Anderson, et al; Gary Bruce Humphrey as to Anderson, et al; John Johnson as to Anderson, et al; Paul Anthony Jones as to Anderson, et al; David Juarez as to Anderson, et al; Gregory Michael Lampman as to Anderson, et al; Michael Wallis Landstreet as to Anderson, et al; Harvey Butler Marshall as to Anderson, et al; Marc Cyril Maxwell as to Anderson, et al; Roger McCurley as to Anderson, et al; Gerald Ray Mitchem as to Anderson, et al; Philip Ottman as to Anderson, et al; Christian Gedge Pendleton as to Anderson, et al; Edward D. Phillips as to Anderson, et al; David Lane Rairdan as to Anderson, et al; Patrick Kevin Remis as to Anderson, et al; Todd Robert Shippee as to Anderson, et al; Henry Phil Updike as to Anderson, et al; George Henry Van Gieson as to Anderson, et al; James Dickerson Vaughan as to Anderson, et al; Carlton Detrick Ward as to Anderson, et al; Norman Eugene Washington as to Anderson, et al; David Ybanez as to Anderson, et al; WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 07/17 10:33 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Neal Almond, William Rene Arnold, Loyd N Belgarde, Eric Mitchell Campbell, JAMES LEIGHTON KNICKERBOCKER, BRIAN KUTA, James Kilgore, NORVEL LAUHON, RICHARD LAWLESS, DENNIS A. LOUSHE, William Long, PAUL MAGANA, JOE MOREINO, Michael McNeil, Daniel Bonkowski, James Burns, Douglas Cassidy, Burtis Caudill, Tyrone Johnson, Wayne Jones, Edward Klein, Patrick Steven Leon, Alonzo Martinez, Thomas Spalding, Jr, William Stalvey, Reginald Maurice Thomas, Alvin Dwain Washington, Sr, Herbert R Weston, James Joseph Quirk, Joseph Gerard Rizzo, Beryl S Roberts, Jr, Paul Rosenbaum, William Mason Rush, Donald Williams Sabo, Jr, Daniel Pichardo, Casey Porter, Christopher Nathaniel Riley, Ronald Saferite, EDWARD FRENCH, ROBERT GERTH, STANLEY GILLCASH, Robert Gallo, David Gamble, GREGORY HAGANS, James Hammock, Terry Raymond McCall, Rashad McNulty, David Ronald Palumbo, Christopher David Posante, Jay Foster Dill WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) Modified to edit docket text (correct party last name Almond, also in 2:23-cv-03304-RMG; first name Douglas Cassidy, also in 2:23-cv-04190-RMG))on 7/17/2024 (sshe, ) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 07/16 10:43 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kelvin Donnell Battle, Sr, Timothy Jon Bendekovic, Willaim Paul Bentley, James Felix Binkowski, Mark Michael Bonsanti, Jonathan Hogg, Kenneth Wayne Johnson, Jenni L Jones, Patrick Psarras, John Rossetti, Craig Mark Sanders, Alton Norman Shook, Ronald Jay Toxey, George Godfrey Watkins, Jr, Robert Allen Young, Richard Mosely, Daniel Murphy, William Owen Nuss, Charles Daniel O'Neil, Gus Wilson, Willie L Thomas, James Rickey Thompson, David Willingham, Paul E Wilson, Jr, Jimmy Smith, Kevin James Smith, Michael Alan Stetler, Thomas Calvin Stoudt, Craig Allen Strauss, Timothy Allen Tanno, Sr, Destiny McCowen, Fredrick Arthur Perdue, John Logan Petrey, Dan Russell Platt, Charles A Richardson, Demitricus Torres Coleman, Eduardo Del Valle, David Johnathan Edwards, Douglas Michael Rosell, John Schoen, Paul L. Simonson, Charles Edwin Sledge, Jose Cruz Espinoza, Jr, John M Fahrer, Larry Ray Farrah, Franklin Gerald Ferguson, Sr, Edward William Floyd, Clifton E Gaddie, Thomas Heinz Gibbs Notice of Voluntary dismissal by Derrick Tamar Thompson Et al as to James Nicholas Ungren; WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 07/15 11:28 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Michael James Alspaugh, William Ted Avelallemant, Pierre Edward Baker, Darrell Lavren Baldwin, Michael Sean Barrett, Robert Dean Bartolomei, Paul Joseph Basic, Sr, Jennifer Bearcub, Bruce Craig Bevington, Robert Bogdan, Larence Gary Bounty, Claude Jarvis Brehon, Mark Oscar Breitkreutz, George L Brzeczek, Michael Burdych, Gary Ervin Burriss, Larry Muryl Byrge, George R Caldwell, Jr, Stephen J Callahan, Edwin J Carazo, Jr, Kenneth Charles Shaw Et al., Brian James Rizner Et al., Fidel Jimenez, Jr, David Johnson, Stephen Craig Jones, Niels Jorgensen, John Paul Kapral, James Randy Kelley, Bernard Jess Kimber, Garrett Kenneth Kimmell, Benjamin Arthur Kough, Jr, Michael David Lamar, Terran Walley Lohman, Trenton Gene Lubbers, Morris Ray Mays, Christopher Burris Et al., Daniel S Ridler, Jr, Lyle D Scandrett, Robert Kamaki Schlemmer, Aden William Scott, III, Robert Broek Sedgwick, Harry Dale Smith, Robert Lewis Smith, Jr, Christopher Allen Barnes Et al., Larry Beemer Et al., Larry W New, Thomas Martin Et al. Franklin Anderson as to Martin, et al; Stanley Farone as to Martin, et al; Gerald George as to Shaw, et al; Gregory Potier as to Shaw, et al; David Gill as to Barnes, et al; James Wilson as to Barnes, et al; Paul Russer as to Beemer, et al; Samuel Alsander as to Beemer, et al; Wayne Schuler as to Rizner, et al; WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Monday, June 24, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 06/24 2:35 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Michael James Briglia, Johnnie Lee Brown, Rafael Eugene Bueno, Lee Forrest Cappis, Christopher Burris Et al., Dennis Joseph Cardoza, Benjamin Franklin Carey, Jr, Francis Merritt Carpenter, Kenneth David Carpenter, Don Charles Carr, Kenneth Nathaniel Carroll, Jr, Harry Hershell Carter, Thomas Daniel Carter, III, William Crandell Carter, Samuel Grover Casey, Johnny Lea Chalk, Wayne Russell Charbonneau, Thomas Stanley Chmielowiec, Sr, Alan Lee Chucci, James Michael Clampitt, Clifford Ronald Clark, Wendell Dwight Clark, Troy Lynn Clark, Andrew Clay, Jr, Stuart Hugh Cohen, William Solomon Cohen, Lance Truett Coleman, Robert Washington Coles, III, Christian Walter Collins, Sr, Clifford Christopher Collins, William Earl Colston, James Clanton Conley, Randy Edward Conroy, Anthony Gerard Conti, Jerry Calvin Cook, Randell Gene Cooper, Robert Alfred Cooper, Michael Ray Cormican, Christopher Randall Cornette, Dennis James Coston, Frederick Ronald Cota, Raymond William Cottini, James Henry Cottrell, Larry Covington, James Bookout Cowden, Harold Eugene Crabtree, Jr, Charles Squire Crane, Steven Bruce Crews, Ronald Gary Cripps Christopher Burris Et al as to Walter Reaves; Chiles et al as to Robert Clark; voluntary dismissal WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-01238-RMG, 2:23-cv-03304-RMG, 2:23-cv-04544-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 06/24 2:20 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by David Michael Alvarez, James Arena, III, Thomas John Arnold, Anthony Wayne Avanzato, Clifford Herbert Baker, Russell Scott Bennett, Stephen M Bennett, Quill Charles Berry, Jr, Robert Allen Bertram, Chris David Blackburn, Lori Kathleen Blackshear, Marshaun Jerome Blake, Sr, Alzina Marie Blanchard, Kevin Lee Bowling, William Michael Breeden, Sr, Gordon Lynn Bonner, James Stephen Boothby, David Michael Boragine, Christopher Mark Boyler, Michael Braddock, Kenneth William Brandes, Marlon L Brandon, William Anthony Branham, Bryan Ray Brewer, David Brigman, Jr, Randy James Brinson, Brady Don Brooke, Donald G Brooks, Cornelus Quintin Brown, David Earl Brown, Sr, Gary Michael Brown, James Gary Brown, Jeffrey Charles Brown, William Bergen Brown, Joseph Alexander Bruce, James Francis Brusco, Wayne Jennings Bryan, Richard Bulacan, Darold Eugene Bunce, Kevin Vance Burgess, William Thomas Burley, Mark Edward Burns, Robert Lee Bushong, Gerald Lawrance Button, LLoyd Carter Byrd, Florencio Villa Caballero, Charles Richard Cable, Joseph Eugene Caffey, Charles John Camarda, III, Orrin L Daniel WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-01240-RMG, 2:23-cv-03304-RMG, 2:23-cv-04190-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Thursday, June 06, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 06/06 3:56 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney James L. Stengel and Paige Pavone and to substitute in their place Joseph C. Orlet, Paul A. Calfo, and Dominique Savinelli by Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC. Response to Motion due by 6/20/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Tuesday, March 12, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 03/12 12:09 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company identifying Corporate Parent Sag Main Holding, LLC, Other Affiliate R&Q Insurance Holdings Ltd., Other Affiliate Obra Capital, Inc. for Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 03/12 11:06 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Global Manufacturing Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent MSA Safety Inc. for Global Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Monday, March 11, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 03/11 6:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 03/11 5:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Global Manufacturing Company LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Friday, February 09, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 02/09 10:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige) |
|
Monday, February 05, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 02/05 6:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Global Manufacturing Company LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige) |
|
Friday, October 13, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
Fri 10/13 6:34 PM
TEXT ORDER This Order Relates to Case Nos. et al. (as listed in the motion). The motion to substitute counsel of record (Dkt. No. 3719 in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.) is denied without prejudice. Counsel therein is not in fact attempting to "substitute" existing counsel in any given action for new counsel. Rather it appears counsel is attempting to make an appearance in various actions currently consolidated for pretrial proceedings before this Court. Counsel is directed to CMO 1 (Dkt. No. 3 at 3) (noting that counsel who appeared in the transferor district court prior to transfer need not enter a separate appearance or apply to proceed pro hac vice). To the extent counsel desires to file a notice of appearance related to the matters for which it seeks "substitution," it may do so. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 10/13/2023.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
|
Friday, September 22, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Substitute Attorney
Fri 09/22 1:56 AM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney by PBI Performance Products Inc. Response to Motion due by 10/6/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Van Zandt, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Substitution of Attorney | ||
Thursday, September 21, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 09/21 11:15 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Frank William Boyd WITHOUT PREJUDICE Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03304-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Tuesday, July 11, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Tue 07/11 4:19 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Alabama Northern (associated as of 7/11/2023), 2:23-cv-00782, Busby et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-03304-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
5 | 5
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Tue 07/11 4:17 PM
Case transferred in from District of Alabama Northern; Case Number 2:23-cv-00782. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 07/11 1:08 PM
ORDER Transferring Case to MDL: ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of South Carolina for inclusion in MDL No. 2873; certified copy of docket entries and documents requested by transferee clerk sent electronically to Clerk of Court in District of South Carolina. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 07/11/2023. (AKD) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2023 | ||
State Court Complaint deemed filed in Circuit Court of Jefferson County, AL on 5/16/2023. (AKD) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 7/11/2023.] | ||
Thursday, June 15, 2023 | ||
3 | 3 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Notice of Removal by 3M Company. (Radney, W) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 7/11/2023.] | |
Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number AALNDC-4364334. ALND receipt number B-5857. related document1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M Company from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 23-1653 , filed by 3M Company.(KAM). (Radney, W) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 7/11/2023.] | ||
Wednesday, June 14, 2023 | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by 3M Company (KAM) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 7/11/2023.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M Company from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 23-1653 , filed by 3M Company.(KAM) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 7/11/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A |