Lewis et al v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-03307 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1442 Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Jul 11, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Alabama Northern, 2:23-cv-00784 |
Last checked: Sunday Jan 07, 2024 4:43 AM EST |
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
Allstar Fire Equipment
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corp
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Fire-Dex LLC
780 Progress Dr.
Medina, OH 44256 |
|
Defendant
Globe Manufacturing Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Honeywell Safety Products USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC
|
|
Defendant
Lion Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
Mallory Safety and Supply LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Municipal Emergency Services Inc
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
PBI Performance Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Southern Mills Inc
|
|
Defendant
Stedfast USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
as successor-in-interest to The Ansul Company One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
W L Gore & Associates Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
Patrick Joseph Jessee
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fidel Jimenez, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dave Herbert Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Johnson
#26503-018 FCI Edgefield PO Box 725
Edgefield, SC 29824 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fred Allen Johnson, Sr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Wayne Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Kevin Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tyrone Johnson
02948-000 Federal Medical Center - Devens Post Office Box 879
Ayers, MA 01432 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Curtis Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jenni L Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Clarence Jones, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephen Craig Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wayne Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Niels Jorgensen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kumash Joshi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ira Marion Judge
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vicki Jill Jung
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Francis Kania
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Raymond Stephen Kappel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Paul Kapral
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew Karmann
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Allen Karnes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Kelleher
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Randy Kelley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Kelly
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Talphineta Kelly
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Michael Kennedy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kelly Lee Kennedy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Anthony Kent, Sr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roy L Kent
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael George Kerby
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John M Kershaw
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bernard Jess Kimber
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Garrett Kenneth Kimmell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jamie Dean Kincaid
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Edward King
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eric King
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Dennis King
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joe Kinsey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ben A Kirkpatrick
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edward Klein
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Francis M Knight, II
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rudolph C Knight, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Earl Knox
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Arthur J Koch, Sr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gordon Koenig
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Joseph Kosek
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Benjamin Arthur Kough, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Kovel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Kown
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Orton Krause
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leon David Krebs, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary Kujak
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Devin Kurty
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fidel Labeaga
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Lachut
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gerald Joel Lack
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Randy Lackey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael David Lamar
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James V Lamb
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shawn Lambe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rex Charles Lambert
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Jack Lambert, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Temele Lane
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Barton R Lang
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Randy Langley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alfred Isaac Lara
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nathan Lauer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Philip Laumann
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Foster William Law
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Wayne Law, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Buck C Leavins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Allen Lees
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Johnnie Leggett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Leivas, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Clovile Calvin Lemieux
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Joseph Lemons, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patrick Steven Leon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David W Lester
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott Letavious
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Billy James Lewis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eric Lewis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Licata, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bocidar Licina
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Alfred Lien
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carl G Liepmann
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fred Lincoln
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Erik Lippincott
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Allen Lively
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Allan Lloyd
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephen M Lobley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul Lockitski
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eric Logiudice
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Terran Walley Lohman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Rafael Lopez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lloyd Randal Lowe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trenton Gene Lubbers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Larry Keith Lufcy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brandon Lyles
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Johnny Arcie Lynch
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patrick Lyons
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Maas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Douglas MacArthur MacMahon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Madden
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Henry R Mailhot, II
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nathan Main
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edward Fred Malanda
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Noel Manheimer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Deen Marchio
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Marquez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Walter Marsh
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sherman Marshall
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ken Marston
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Martel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elmer Martin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eric Douglas Martin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Odell Martin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kevin James Martin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alonzo Martinez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jimmy Nelson Martinez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ruben Isaac Martinez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Glenn Martone
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roger Mason
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ricardo M Mattier
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Matzker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Morris Ray Mays
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James A Mazzella
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
David Kerr
Terminated: 10/11/2023
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Edward Liming
Terminated: 10/19/2023
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Chrispin Mabra
Terminated: 08/14/2023
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, September 04, 2024 | ||
46 | 46
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 09/04 11:13 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Fred Allen Johnson, Sr, Lloyd Randal Lowe, Stephen Walter Miller, Gregory Mark Mullaley, Elijah James Oliver, Janice Winchester, Eric Firdaus Weilenman, Charles Carlyle Whitmore, Jr, Philip Miles Peacock, Charles Garry Penhale, Abel Perez, Robert Elroy Richards, Jr, Sean Craig Ronsen, Sr, Steven Allen Ross, William Louis Schaff, Jr, Michael Paul Sexton, Charles Edward Shannon, Joe Lynn Wooley, Robert Duane Colt, John Rico Cortest, Richard Andrew Couvillon, Jr, Gregory John Crispo, John Charles Fields, Johnnie Winston Busby, Teriko J Adams, Carlie Adams Mosley, Maria Quintans Godfrey, Betty Louise Thomas, Esther Lynn Gomes, Edward J Fitzgerald, Willie James Allen, Demetris Batts, Patrick James Baumgard, John Keith Berry, James P Smith, Leonard Vaughn Steving, Fred B. Stewart, Gerard Sullivan, Dennis Albert O'Key, Mundo Valez Olford, Cynthia Carner, Wesley Scott Bitner, Gary Dean Brabant, Gary Paul Broughton, Harold Gregory Brown, Sr, David Quinn Davis, Larry Darnell Dickerson, Robert Raymond Ducharme, Sandra Conley, Robert Cott Cook Of Particular Personal Injury Claims WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
45 | 45
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 09/03 10:51 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Milton Ray Brees, Richard Eric Burks, Edward James Butler, John Robert Cahill, Paul W Callahan, William Cardinal, Stanley William Goglia, Jr, Jose Miguel Gonzalez, Craig Michael Gotham, Ronald James Hawley, George Loushe Hayes, Michael Ivy, John Bryan Keegan, Larry Michael Lisowski, Joseph Arthur Gutierrez, Knud Andres Knudson, Delas Joseph Lancelin, Kevin McGavock, Jan Stewart Goldberg, David Daniel Ackman, Michael Bongerz, Walter Marsh, Michael Paul Harnett, Lawrence Gilmore Hutchinson, Roger Lee Kile, Jeffrey Lynn King, Sr, Richard Dale Kohl, Jr, Andrew Anderson Et al., Bryan Keith Hinson, William W James, Jr, Richard Martinez, Gerald Halli, Joseph George Hudeck, Jr, Lorenzo Hutchins, Phillip A Johnston, Micah Kroll, Nick L McAlpine, Leon W Henderson, James Ivy Johnson, Gregory Kevin Martin, Ronald Charles Green, Michael Joseph, Robert Kinsey, Ronnie Lanthrip, Timothy James Massaro Michael Monroe Carver as to Anderson, et al; Julian Favela, Jr. as to Anderson, et al; Gregory Djuan Jones as to Anderson, et al; Paul Anthony Kresta as to Anderson, et al; Michael Lynn Owens as to Anderson, et al; Stephen Richardson as to Anderson, et al; Of Particular Personal Injury Claims WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
44 | 44
misc
Status Report
Tue 08/27 11:51 PM
STATUS REPORT - General Denial and Statement of Affirmative Defenses by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
43 | 43
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 08/27 10:26 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent MSA Safety Inc. for Globe Manufacturing Company LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
42 | 42
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/27 8:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige) |
|
41 | 41
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/27 5:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Thursday, August 15, 2024 | ||
40 | 40
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 08/15 10:23 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by James Ingram, III, Heyward Jackson, Gary Lingle, Richard Lytle, GREGORY LOGAN, AUSTIN MILLER, Billy James Lewis, Jimmy Nelson Martinez, Glenn Martone, Roger Mason, Michael Mortimore, Herald Ortegon, John Palcsey, Justin Pfaltzgraff, Donn Rafferty, Anthony Savicki, William Scott, William Shetterly, Charles William Shipp, Larry Slater, George Smith, Janine Spears, William Watson, Norman Young, Larry Beemer Et al., Ricky Edward Anderson, John Bockerich, Larry Buck, James Buss, Bennie Ciccarello, Thomas Crowell, Jim Deming, RALPH CASTOR, JR, Earl Evans, ROBERT FAIELLA Antonio Hampton Lewis, Sr. as to Beemer, et al; WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
39 | 39
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 08/15 9:11 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Paul Beale, Joseph M Berkery, Pamela Allison Bishop, William J Bisignano, III, Ronald Leon Booth, Jr, Pedro Antonio Botello, Neal David Brasfield, Jeffery Bridges, Samuel Antonio Brown, Webb Brown, Peter J Burgert, Douglas Wayne McCann, Bryan Craig McClurg, Jerome Kenneth McInnes, Jr, James Murray Merryman, Sr, Fredrick Eugene Miggins, Mitchell Louis Miklus, Sr, Lawrence Minitrez, Carl David Mowry, Leroy Francis Myas, Robert W Nelson, James Jan Nolan, Girard Owens, Herbert O Phillips, III, Samuel Ponzio, Sr, David Orton Krause, Fidel Labeaga, Randy Langley, Johnnie Leggett, Gabriel D Quintana, Dennis Paul Rampe, Carlos Robledo, Blair Roethel, John Scheetz, Steven Schora, Barry Alan Searles, Randall Everett Sides, Alan James Simmons, Kevin Joel Sliter, Leon Smith, Matthew W Collins, II, Richard G Cooper, Gregory Dale Cordle, Edmund Delesline, John Joseph Donohue, Charles R Doster, Joseph Doyle, Jr, Roger Durham, Eric Daniel Eastlund, Michael George Eckart WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
38 | 38
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 07/29 11:02 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Islaam Amin, Robert Anthony, Willie R Braxton, John P Brinkley, Jr, Herbert Lawrence Broughton, Jr, Dean Bruch, Bradley Buhr, Salvatore A D Burrello, James Burris, Keith Bursey, Clarence Bynes, Jr, William Campbell, Richard Acosta, John Adams, Steven Aliseo, Dale Andrea, Andrew Arce, Robert Arnold, Andrew S Ashby, Guadalupe Z Azocar, Edward L Barnes, Wayne Batts, John Beavers, David Berlanga, Tim Bettendorf, Duane R Bires, Charles Blalock, James Braun, Kenneth Britt, Thomas Johnson, John M Kershaw, Joseph Earl Knox, Gordon Koenig, Kevin Kovel, Devin Kurty, Temele Lane, Bocidar Licina, Carl G Liepmann, Fred Lincoln, Erik Lippincott, Stephen M Lobley, Brandon Lyles, Patrick Lyons, Brian Maas, Joseph Madden, John Marquez, Ken Marston, John Martel, Elmer Martin, Ricardo M Mattier WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03304-RMG, 2:23-cv-03307-RMG, 2:23-cv-04190-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
37 | 37
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 07/19 8:52 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Richard Aughe, Isaac Bailey, Jr, Gerardo Cantu, Kenneth Frederickson, Davis Holbert, Sean Hoskin, Scott Letavious, Eric Lewis, Paul Lockitski, Sherman Marshall, Ronald Russell, Todd Sites, Leon Smith, Michael Strehlow, Jason Swiger, Joshua Vercruysse, Theodore Williams, Andrew Anderson Et al., Burnell J McIntyre, Shannon Morley, K Samuel Neilson, Larry German Et al., Alan B Chatters, Thomas L Derby, David Fleming Richard Anderson as to Anderson, et al; Steve Barnes as to Anderson, et al; James David Carman as to Anderson, et al; John Henry Cook as to Anderson, et al; Walter Brown Davis, III as to Anderson et al; Donald Lee Doser as to Anderson, et al; William Joseph Fidler as to Anderson, et al; James Hiram Gipson as to Anderson, et al; Patrick Leon Hall as to Anderson, et al; Ronald Lee Haynes as to Anderson, et al; Michael Jay Holzman as to Anderson, et al; Don R. Jones, Sr. as to Anderson, et al; Philip Dean Kincaid as to Anderson, et al; Alan K. Kulak as to Anderson, et al; Grant Keith Lewis as to Anderson, et al; Donald Jake Linhart as to Anderson, et al; Kenneth Wayne Maxson as to Anderson, et al; John McLain as to Anderson, et al; Aureo Felix Parrilla as to Anderson, et al; LeRoy Robinson as to Anderson, et al; Arthur Watson as to Anderson, et al; Jefferey Scott Willis as to Anderson, et al; Willis George Wilson, III as to Anderson, et al; Robert Allen Beck as to German, et al; Harold Vincent Burke as to German, et al; Donald Ray Davis as to German, et al; Billy Everett as to German, et al; WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
36 | 36
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 07/18 9:16 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ROBERT JENNEY, PETER KROM, Don Knight, TONY LUCAS, Richard Legg, JOHN MCPOLIN, James Antley, James Cline, Dennis Cox, Xavier Dehoyos, Michael George Kerby, Rex Charles Lambert, Ronald Jack Lambert, Jr, David W Lester, Noel Manheimer, Kevin James Martin, Raymond Vadeboncoeur, Richard Wagner, William O Warnock, II, Gary Hanna Et al., James O'Donnell, Gregory Paxton, Richard M Reass, William Joseph Rios, Richard James Savidge, Scott Schroeder, Robert Leon Seago, Thomas Martin Et al., ROGER L. FULTZ, DAVID GREGURICH, Robert George, GREGORY HOLMES, Larry German Et al. Alton Brown as to German, et al; Anthony Dukes as to German, et al; Charles Wayne Fletcher as to German, et al; William Wesley Hagins as to German, et al; Charles David Hickman as to German, et al; Dana Hubbard as to German, et al; Daniel Johnson as to German, et al; Chil Ledford as to German, et al; Ronald Charles Maupin as to German, et al; James McTaggert as to German, et al; Louis H. Pauly as to German, et al; Jesse Randal Rodriguez as to German, et al; Walter Gerard Saverse as to German, et al; Scott Joseph Sweeney as to German, et al; Richard Wood as to German, et al; David Ray Yeager as to German, et al; Bernard Joseph Zielinski, Jr. as to German, et al; Gary Hanna as to Hanna, et al; Quarri A Anderson as to Martin, et al; Michael Bednorz, Jr. as to Martin, et al; WITHOUT PREJUDICEITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
35 | 35
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 07/18 8:47 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Joseph Braswell, David Broussard, Ronald Freeman, James Green, Frank Herman, David Heyrman, Michael W. Hill, Kenneth Allen Karnes, George R Raby, Robert J Riegel, Matthew Roman, William Scott, Carl William Smith, Jr, Richard Sprano, Greg Stelter, Edward Vreeland, Daniel J Waddick, Andrew Anderson Et al., Donald McFadden, David Eugene Mills, Anthony Pedraza, Donald Poole, Clinton Cole, Charlie Dardenne, Jr, Joseph Dillon Roy Timothy Brockaway as to Anderson, et al; Gary Chetelat as to Anderson, et al; Leo Ray Devigil as to Anderson, et al; Anthony Harbor, Sr. as to Anderson, et al; Gary Bruce Humphrey as to Anderson, et al; John Johnson as to Anderson, et al; Paul Anthony Jones as to Anderson, et al; David Juarez as to Anderson, et al; Gregory Michael Lampman as to Anderson, et al; Michael Wallis Landstreet as to Anderson, et al; Harvey Butler Marshall as to Anderson, et al; Marc Cyril Maxwell as to Anderson, et al; Roger McCurley as to Anderson, et al; Gerald Ray Mitchem as to Anderson, et al; Philip Ottman as to Anderson, et al; Christian Gedge Pendleton as to Anderson, et al; Edward D. Phillips as to Anderson, et al; David Lane Rairdan as to Anderson, et al; Patrick Kevin Remis as to Anderson, et al; Todd Robert Shippee as to Anderson, et al; Henry Phil Updike as to Anderson, et al; George Henry Van Gieson as to Anderson, et al; James Dickerson Vaughan as to Anderson, et al; Carlton Detrick Ward as to Anderson, et al; Norman Eugene Washington as to Anderson, et al; David Ybanez as to Anderson, et al; WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
34 | 34
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 07/17 10:33 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Neal Almand, William Rene Arnold, Loyd N Belgarde, Eric Mitchell Campbell, JAMES LEIGHTON KNICKERBOCKER, BRIAN KUTA, James Kilgore, NORVEL LAUHON, RICHARD LAWLESS, DENNIS A. LOUSHE, William Long, PAUL MAGANA, JOE MOREINO, Michael McNeil, Daniel Bonkowski, James Burns, Dougs Cassidy, Burtis Caudill, Tyrone Johnson, Wayne Jones, Edward Klein, Patrick Steven Leon, Alonzo Martinez, Thomas Spalding, Jr, William Stalvey, Reginald Maurice Thomas, Alvin Dwain Washington, Sr, Herbert R Weston, James Joseph Quirk, Joseph Gerard Rizzo, Beryl S Roberts, Jr, Paul Rosenbaum, William Mason Rush, Donald Williams Sabo, Jr, Daniel Pichardo, Casey Porter, Christopher Nathaniel Riley, Ronald Saferite, EDWARD FRENCH, ROBERT GERTH, STANLEY GILLCASH, Robert Gallo, David Gamble, GREGORY HAGANS, James Hammock, Terry Raymond McCall, Rashad McNulty, David Ronald Palumbo, Christopher David Posante, Jay Foster Dill WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 07/16 11:55 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kenneth Charles Shaw Et al., Ira Marion Judge, Charles Anthony Kent, Sr, Roy L Kent, Charles Edward King, Michael Kown, Gerald Joel Lack, Clovile Calvin Lemieux, William Joseph Lemons, Jr, Michael Allen Lively, Eric Logiudice, Michael Rafael Lopez, Edward Fred Malanda, Christopher Burris Et al., Christopher Allen Barnes Et al., Larry Beemer Et al., Stewart Acosta, KENNETH RAY HEBERT, Thomas Martin Et al., Larry German Et al. Notice of Voluntary dismissal by Larry German Et al as to Willard Fredrick Alabran, Esequiel Marez Campos III, Roger Brian Drake, Jimmy Britt Freeman, Douglas Howard Snyder, John Stevens, Bruce A. WIlliams; Notice of Voluntary dismissal by Thomas Martin Et al as to Francis Joseph Bock, Paul Brodowsky, Robert Russell Evans Jr., William Otis Fears, Isaac Henry Fillyaw Jr., Michael Dominick Vanacore; Notice of Voluntary dismissal by Kenneth Charles Shaw Et al as to Jeffrey Michael Byrne, Frederick Espy, Gregory Keith Fluckey, Charles Quentin Fluharty, Willie Mitchell, Kenneth Charles Shaw, Jeffrey Wayne Switzer, Arthur Watson, Steven Lee Wintersteen, Gene Frank Youderian; Notice of Voluntary dismissal by Christopher Allen Barnes Et al as to David Arthur DeBee, Joseph Dextor Peirce V, George David Tamburello; Notice of Voluntary dismissal by Larry Beemer Et al as to Wendell Callaway, Jeremiah Mullins Sr., Robert Watson, Mark Allen Williams; Notice of Voluntary dismissal by Christopher Burris Et al as to Otis Wade Byrd II, Charles Cruver, Thomas Donald Gaertner, Charles Rasico, Charles John Rizzo, Maurice Glen Sutton; WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
32 | 32
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 07/16 10:43 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kelvin Donnell Battle, Sr, Timothy Jon Bendekovic, Willaim Paul Bentley, James Felix Binkowski, Mark Michael Bonsanti, Jonathan Hogg, Kenneth Wayne Johnson, Jenni L Jones, Patrick Psarras, John Rossetti, Craig Mark Sanders, Alton Norman Shook, Ronald Jay Toxey, George Godfrey Watkins, Jr, Robert Allen Young, Richard Mosely, Daniel Murphy, William Owen Nuss, Charles Daniel O'Neil, Gus Wilson, Willie L Thomas, James Rickey Thompson, David Willingham, Paul E Wilson, Jr, Jimmy Smith, Kevin James Smith, Michael Alan Stetler, Thomas Calvin Stoudt, Craig Allen Strauss, Timothy Allen Tanno, Sr, Destiny McCowen, Fredrick Arthur Perdue, John Logan Petrey, Dan Russell Platt, Charles A Richardson, Demitricus Torres Coleman, Eduardo Del Valle, David Johnathan Edwards, Douglas Michael Rosell, John Schoen, Paul L. Simonson, Charles Edwin Sledge, Jose Cruz Espinoza, Jr, John M Fahrer, Larry Ray Farrah, Franklin Gerald Ferguson, Sr, Edward William Floyd, Clifton E Gaddie, Thomas Heinz Gibbs Notice of Voluntary dismissal by Derrick Tamar Thompson Et al as to James Nicholas Ungren; WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 07/15 11:28 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Michael James Alspaugh, William Ted Avelallemant, Pierre Edward Baker, Darrell Lavren Baldwin, Michael Sean Barrett, Robert Dean Bartolomei, Paul Joseph Basic, Sr, Jennifer Bearcub, Bruce Craig Bevington, Robert Bogdan, Larence Gary Bounty, Claude Jarvis Brehon, Mark Oscar Breitkreutz, George L Brzeczek, Michael Burdych, Gary Ervin Burriss, Larry Muryl Byrge, George R Caldwell, Jr, Stephen J Callahan, Edwin J Carazo, Jr, Kenneth Charles Shaw Et al., Brian James Rizner Et al., Fidel Jimenez, Jr, David Johnson, Stephen Craig Jones, Niels Jorgensen, John Paul Kapral, James Randy Kelley, Bernard Jess Kimber, Garrett Kenneth Kimmell, Benjamin Arthur Kough, Jr, Michael David Lamar, Terran Walley Lohman, Trenton Gene Lubbers, Morris Ray Mays, Christopher Burris Et al., Daniel S Ridler, Jr, Lyle D Scandrett, Robert Kamaki Schlemmer, Aden William Scott, III, Robert Broek Sedgwick, Harry Dale Smith, Robert Lewis Smith, Jr, Christopher Allen Barnes Et al., Larry Beemer Et al., Larry W New, Thomas Martin Et al. Franklin Anderson as to Martin, et al; Stanley Farone as to Martin, et al; Gerald George as to Shaw, et al; Gregory Potier as to Shaw, et al; David Gill as to Barnes, et al; James Wilson as to Barnes, et al; Paul Russer as to Beemer, et al; Samuel Alsander as to Beemer, et al; Wayne Schuler as to Rizner, et al; WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Thursday, June 27, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 06/27 8:25 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Joe Kinsey, Ben A Kirkpatrick, Francis M Knight, II, Arthur J Koch, Sr, Daniel Joseph Kosek, Barton R Lang, Alfred Isaac Lara, Daniel Philip Laumann, Foster William Law, Robert Wayne Law, Jr, James Allen Lees, Charles Licata, Jr, Christopher Alfred Lien, Kevin Allan Lloyd, Douglas MacArthur MacMahon, Michael Deen Marchio, Eric Douglas Martin, Michael Troy Glover, Michael William Graves, Mark Allan Griffin, Roger Allison Grimsrud, Donald L Grubb, David Joseph Guitard, Carlos J Halder, Roy Lee Hannah, Douglas Demoirea Harris, Robert Elias Haskell, Edwin Keith Headrick, Bill Henry, Stephen Thomas Hierro, Michael James Higgins, Alan Paul Hilker, II, Allen Reianhart Hoffer, Donald W Hogue, Russell Littleton Holland, Karyn Lynn Holt, George Vance Hooper, David Bruce Huffman, Jeffery Lyn Huffman, David Humphrey, Douglas Ray Hundley, Timothy Rae Hungerford, Elzarus Legrande Hunsaker, Mark Hubert Hutchinson, Gerald Albert Iadicicco, James Jachcik, John Janakas, Webb Francis Jenkel Robert Hodge as to Longo, et al, WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-01744-RMG, 2:23-cv-03307-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Wednesday, June 26, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 06/26 10:58 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Dennis Wade Holmes, Sr, John Francis Hunter, Earl Joseph Hutz, Jr, Denis Donald Imler, Brian Gerard Jackson, Gleason Forte James, Austin Jinks, Louis Peter John, Jayson Arthur Johnson, William Anthony Johnson, Jimmy Charles Jones, Robert Earl Jones, Russell Jones, Jesse Leon Kelly, Paul Vincent Kelly, Erwin Donald Kenney, Robert Preston Kerr, Daniel Joe Kessinger, William H Kinsey, Stephen Lee Knickrehm, Steve Knowles, Jr, William Henry Krauss, Frank John Krawczyk, Russell Jeffrey Kroum, Ralph George LaFontaine, Lawrence S Lamey, Willard Joseph Landry, John Henry Laskowski, Robert Jean-Bollinger Lattimar, Robert A Leak, Michael J Lesnewsky, Dwight Duane Lienemann, Anthony Charles Lonon, Sr, Gerald Richard Luna, Calvin Elmer Malone, James Patrick Maloney, Jr, Bruce Charles Mandell, Salvatore Enrico Marfia, Federico Ancheta Mariano, Kenneth D McCoy, Donald John McCullough, Roger Dale McInish, Eddie McNeil, William Earl Meyer, Patrick Joseph Jessee, Michael Kevin Johnson, Robert Clarence Jones, Jr, Vicki Jill Jung, James Michael Kennedy, Kelly Lee Kennedy WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-01472-RMG, 2:23-cv-03307-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Thursday, June 06, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 06/06 3:56 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney James L. Stengel and Paige Pavone and to substitute in their place Joseph C. Orlet, Paul A. Calfo, and Dominique Savinelli by Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC. Response to Motion due by 6/20/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Tuesday, May 21, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 05/21 10:41 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by August J Matteis, Jr on behalf of Rex Charles Lambert (Matteis, August) |
|
Tuesday, March 12, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 03/12 12:09 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company identifying Corporate Parent Sag Main Holding, LLC, Other Affiliate R&Q Insurance Holdings Ltd., Other Affiliate Obra Capital, Inc. for Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
25 | 25
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 03/12 11:06 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Global Manufacturing Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent MSA Safety Inc. for Global Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Monday, March 11, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 03/11 6:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 03/11 5:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Global Manufacturing Company LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Wednesday, February 28, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 02/28 12:28 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by John Lachut WITHOUT PREJUDICE Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03307-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Friday, February 09, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 02/09 10:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige) |
|
Monday, February 05, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 02/05 6:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Global Manufacturing Company LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige) |
|
Thursday, October 19, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 10/19 12:42 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Mark Edward Liming WITHOUT PREJUDICE Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03307-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Friday, October 13, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
Fri 10/13 6:34 PM
TEXT ORDER This Order Relates to Case Nos. et al. (as listed in the motion). The motion to substitute counsel of record (Dkt. No. 3719 in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.) is denied without prejudice. Counsel therein is not in fact attempting to "substitute" existing counsel in any given action for new counsel. Rather it appears counsel is attempting to make an appearance in various actions currently consolidated for pretrial proceedings before this Court. Counsel is directed to CMO 1 (Dkt. No. 3 at 3) (noting that counsel who appeared in the transferor district court prior to transfer need not enter a separate appearance or apply to proceed pro hac vice). To the extent counsel desires to file a notice of appearance related to the matters for which it seeks "substitution," it may do so. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 10/13/2023.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
|
Wednesday, October 11, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 10/11 1:14 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by David Kerr WITHOUT PREJUDICE Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03307-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Friday, September 22, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Substitute Attorney
Fri 09/22 1:56 AM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney by PBI Performance Products Inc. Response to Motion due by 10/6/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Van Zandt, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Substitution of Attorney | ||
Monday, August 14, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 08/14 4:44 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Thomas Chrispin Mabra WITHOUT PREJUDICE Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03307-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Tuesday, July 11, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Tue 07/11 4:27 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Alabama Northern (associated as of 7/11/2023), 2:23-cv-00784, Lewis et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-03307-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
8 | 8
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Tue 07/11 4:24 PM
Case transferred in from District of Alabama Northern; Case Number 2:23-cv-00784. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 07/11 2:39 PM
ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO MDL : ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of South Carolina for inclusion in MDL No. 2873; certified copy of docket entries and documents requested by transferee clerk sent electronically to Clerk of Court in District of South Carolina. (CTF) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2023 | ||
6 | 6 TEXT ORDER : The plaintiffs and defendant 3M Company have filed a joint motion seeking an extension of time for all defendants to respond to the complaint. (Doc.4 ). The parties request that to the extent this action is not transferred to the In re Aqueous Film-Forming Products Liability multi-district litigation (the "AFFF MDL"), the defendants be afforded 28 days after the AFFF MDL court's decision denying a request to transfer within which to file a responsive pleading in this action. The motion is GRANTED to the extent the court STAYS the deadline for the defendants to respond to the complaint pending a decision by the AFFF MDL court whether to transfer this case to the AFFF MDL. 3M SHALL notify this court promptly if the AFFF MDL court denies its request to transfer this case to the AFFF MDL, at which time this court will set a new deadline for responsive pleadings in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 6/16/2023. (KSS) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 7/11/2023.] | |
Thursday, June 15, 2023 | ||
4 | 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Notice of Removal Motion is RIPE 6/15/2023 . Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion. Filed by 3M Company. (Radney, W) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 7/11/2023.] | |
3 | 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of a case to a U. S. magistrate judge for trial. (CTF) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 7/11/2023.] | |
Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number AALNDC-4364581, B-5863, related document1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M Company from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 01-CV-2023-901662.00, filed by 3M Company.(CTF). (Radney, W) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 7/11/2023.] | ||
Wednesday, June 14, 2023 | ||
5 | 5 State Court Complaint deemed filed in Circuit Court of Jefferson County, AL on May 16, 2023. Defendant, 3M Company, deemed served in state court on May 23, 2023. (CTF) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 7/11/2023.] | |
2 | 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by 3M Company (CTF) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 7/11/2023.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M Company from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 01-CV-2023-901662.00, filed by 3M Company.(CTF) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 7/11/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State Case File |