USA v. Leung
California Northern District Court | |
Case #: | 3:23-cr-00183 |
Case Filed: | Jun 13, 2023 |
Last checked: Thursday Jul 13, 2023 12:18 AM PDT |
Defendant
Elliot Leung (1)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Christina Nguyen (2)
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
USA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 07/13/2023 1:08 AM PDT |
Tuesday, June 13, 2023 | ||
1 | 1 7 pgs INDICTMENT as to Elliot Leung (1) count(s) 1, 2, Christina Nguyen (2) count(s) 2. (lsk, COURT STAFF) | |
2 | 2 2 pgs Motion to seal as to Elliot Leung and Christina Nguyen (lsk, COURT STAFF) | |
3 | 3 1 pgs Sealing ORDER as to Elliot Leung, Christina Nguyen re 2 Application filed by Christina Nguyen, Elliot Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 6/13/2023. (lsk, COURT STAFF) |