Holmes et al v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-03377 |
Nature of Suit | 245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Jul 14, 2023 |
Case in other court: | North Carolina Middle, 1:23-cv-00513 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 10, 2024 4:33 AM EST |
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
The Ansul Company
141 Junny Road
Angier, NC 27501 |
|
Defendant
Raytheon Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
John 1-49 Doe Defendants
|
|
Defendant
E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company
974 Centre Road
Wilmington, DE 19805 |
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma Management LLC
Archroma Management LLC 4000 Monroe Rd.
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Angus Fire
|
|
Defendant
AGC Inc
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Plaintiff
Brittany Wrenn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elizabeth Young
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Diane Stevio
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shannon Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gail Simmons
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Danny Phillip Simmons
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Susan Morrow
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rodney Morrow
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sherrie Mcwhorter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carla Mcnabb
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lisa Mahaffey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Curtis Mahaffey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donna Lo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Lo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Emily Leonard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Leonard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tim Jessup
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brittney Holmes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Harville
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Faye Harville
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew Davis
00270-131 Federal Correctional Institution Duke Unit Post Office Box 1000
Butner, NC 27509 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 08/14 6:12 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Carla Mcnabb Without Prejudice Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03377-RMG(Summy, Scott) |
|
Thursday, August 03, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
service
Summons Issued
Thu 08/03 11:51 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Mon 07/17 11:32 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: North Carolina Middle (associated as of 7/14/2023), 1:23-cv-00513, Holmes et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-03377-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
13 | 13
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Mon 07/17 11:22 AM
Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Middle; Case Number 1:23-cv-00513. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Friday, July 14, 2023 | ||
12 | 12 MDL TRANSFER LETTER to individual courts and counsel of record re: Conditional Order (CTO-142) transferring this action the District of South Carolina. (Bowers, Alexis) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 7/17/2023.] | |
11 | 11 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 142) re: MDL 2873 transferring this action to the District of South Carolina for the reasons stated in the order of December 7, 2018. Received and filed on July, 14, 2023. (Bowers, Alexis) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 7/17/2023.] | |
Monday, July 10, 2023 | ||
Motion Referred to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE re:10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re5 Complaint. (Daniel, J) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 7/17/2023.] | ||
Thursday, July 06, 2023 | ||
10 | 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re5 Complaint,, by CHEMGUARD, INC., TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP.(BLAKE, CHRISTOPHER) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 7/17/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, July 03, 2023 | ||
Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR. and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Hicks, Samantha) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 7/17/2023.] | ||
Friday, June 30, 2023 | ||
9 | 9 ***Filed in Error*** STIPULATION re5 Complaint,, (extending time to answer or otherwise respond) by CHEMGUARD, INC., TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP. (BLAKE, CHRISTOPHER) Modified on 7/5/2023 to mark filed in error (Bowers, Alexis). [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 7/17/2023.] | |
8 | 8 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Bowers, Alexis) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 7/17/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Consent Form | ||
Tuesday, June 27, 2023 | ||
6 | 6 Summons Issued as to TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP. (State Court document originally filed in Guilford County Superior Court, case number 23cvs5255, issued on 05/19/2023, listed as Exhibit A-1 to the1 Petition for Removal) (Bowers, Alexis) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 7/17/2023.] | |
5 | 5 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by CURTIS MAHAFFEY, TIM JESSUP, ELIZABETH YOUNG, GAIL SIMMONS, BRITTNEY HOLMES, DANNY PHILLIP SIMMONS, FAYE HARVILLE, SHANNON SMITH, SHERRIE MCWHORTER, EMILY LEONARD, ANTHONY LEONARD, LISA MAHAFFEY, DIANE STEVIO, SUSAN MORROW, DONNA LO, BRITTANY WRENN, MATTHEW DAVIS, ROBERT HARVILLE, CARLA MCNABB, DANIEL LO, WILLIAM SMITH, RODNEY MORROW. (State Court document originally filed in Guilford County Superior Court, case number 23cvs5255, listed as Exhibit A-2 to the1 Petition for Removal)(Bowers, Alexis) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 7/17/2023.] | |
Monday, June 26, 2023 | ||
4 | 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent JOHNSON CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL PLC for TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP.. (BLAKE, CHRISTOPHER) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 7/17/2023.] | |
3 | 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent JOHNSON CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL PLC for CHEMGUARD, INC... (BLAKE, CHRISTOPHER) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 7/17/2023.] | |
2 | 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney CHRISTOPHER J. BLAKE on behalf of Defendants CHEMGUARD, INC., TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP (BLAKE, CHRISTOPHER) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 7/17/2023.] | |
1 | 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Guilford County Superior Court, case number 23cvs5255 against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCMDC-3594244.), filed by TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP, CHEMGUARD, INC..(BLAKE, CHRISTOPHER) Modified on 6/27/2023 to add State court information. (Bowers, Alexis) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 7/17/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Guilford County filings, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A-1 Civil Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A-2 Complaint, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet |