California Central District Court
Judge:Cynthia Valenzuela
Referred: David T Bristow
Case #: 5:23-cv-01396
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jul 17, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Jan 13, 2024 12:52 AM PST
Counter Claimant
Matrix Service Inc.
Represented By
David E. Finck
Vorys Sater Seymour And Pease LLP
contact info
Adam S. Hamburg
Vorys Sater Seymour And Pease LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
5E Boron Americas, LLC
Represented By
Nikki Sara Khorram
Winston And Strawn LLP
contact info
Denise U. Scofield
Winston And Strawn, LLP
contact info
Caitlin E. Gernert
Winston And Strawn LLP
contact info
Paul Benedict Salvaty
Winston And Strawn LLP
contact info
Defendant
Matrix Service Inc.
Represented By
Shane Thomas Micheil
Vorys Sater Seymour And Pease LLP
contact info
David E. Finck
Vorys Sater Seymour And Pease LLP
contact info
Adam S. Hamburg
Vorys Sater Seymour And Pease LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
5E Boron Americas, LLC
Represented By
Nikki Sara Khorram
Winston And Strawn LLP
contact info
Denise U. Scofield
Winston And Strawn, LLP
contact info
Caitlin E. Gernert
Winston And Strawn LLP
contact info
Paul Benedict Salvaty
Winston And Strawn LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/27/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
64 64 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Thu 03/06 7:52 PM
ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL AND ALL ASSOCIATED DATES AND DEADLINES by Judge Cynthia Valenzuela: The parties' Stipulation63 is GRANTED. The Court's Order Re: Jury/Court Trial (Doc No. 31) is hereby amended. Jury Trial set for 2/2/2026 08:30 AM before Judge Cynthia Valenzuela. Final Pretrial Conference to be reset by Court. Non-Expert Discovery cut-off 6/19/2025. Private Mediation Deadline 7/25/2025. See document for further details. (gk)
Related: [-]