James Jenkins Jr. v. Sharon Jiminez et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | John W Holcomb |
Referred: | Douglas F Mccormick |
Case #: | 8:23-cv-01317 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 20, 2023 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 16, 2024 12:43 AM PST |
Defendant
Coldwell Banker Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Sharon Jimenez
|
|
Defendant
Orange County Sheriffs Department Laguna Niguel
|
|
Plaintiff
James Jenkins, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Jenkins, III
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, September 13, 2024 | ||
79 | 79
misc
Statement
Fri 09/13 7:53 AM
STATEMENT RE: PLAINTIFFS FILINGS TO RESHMA KAMATH VIA ECF. The Judge Holcomb has threatened me, Reshma Kamath, with a U.S. Marshall telling me that if I file anything on behalf of African-American Plaintiffs James Jenkins, Jr. and James Jenkins III, that I will be arrested via an arrest warrant. The Judge Holcomb sent the message to a U.S. Marshall who is investigating and has informed me to STOP filings. This even after I had informed the U.S. Marshall that Plaintiffs do not have access to ECF portal and that Plaintiffs have elected me to receive/file court pleadings for them in this case. Appalling this is how White Men such as Holcomb deal with African-American men and non- White, immigrant women, such as Indian-American women. Allegedly the filings in written format are a threat to the White Man, Holcomb. 1White Man, Holcomb doesnt see his demeaning behavior as a threat - such as in engaging a U.S. Marshall to issue an arrest warrant and dismissing an Indian woman attorney from representing African- American male Plaintiffs. Such is the racist and misogynistic California court system I have to deal with including the horrible environment in the United States of America for non-White women. Any pleadings from the court should be sent to RESHMA KAMATH via ECF and/or e-mail (in case the court Holcomb decides to block CACD ECF in its threatening behavior to cripple an attorney from asserting a litigants rights.) This is why I left the United States to protect my life from White Peoples mental insanity. I dont even care if my passport gets taken away. I have left for good. (Nelson Mandela (even if South African), Ahmad Arbory, George Floyd, Emmet Till, and countless others are victims of the White persons insanity). I have atleast four real-time clients, all African-American male clients, who were victims of White peoples c rimes and where the latter walked away scathe-free. RESHMA KAMATH continues to be the AGENT for PLAINTIFFS JAMES JENKINS, JR., a retired disabled sheriff and his son, JAMES JENKINS, III, an entrepreneur. filed by Plaintiffs James Jenkins, Jr, James Jenkins, III (Kamath, Reshma) |
|
Thursday, September 12, 2024 | ||
78 | 78
misc
Objection
Thu 09/12 1:43 PM
OBJECTIONS RE: OBJECTIONS TO BRIAN VOGELS PERJURIOUS STATEMENTS UNDER OATH PERTAINING TO RESHMA KAMATH As usual, BRIAN VOGEL has made perjurious statements in declarations very typical of White attorneys. Any statement about me that BRIAN VOGEL has falsely made such as refusing to provide information is false. BRIAN VOGEL failed to make any attempts to procure Plaintiffs contact information from me. In fact, I very politely wrote this e-mail to him after I read VOGELs perjurious declaration that all White attorneys, and their ass-licker, non-White attorneys/judges should read: Reshma Kamath |
|
77 | 77
misc
Statement
Thu 09/12 1:34 PM
STATEMENT PLAINTIFFS OPT FOR RESHMA KAMATH TO BE AGENT FOR SERVICE OF COURT PLEADINGS AND COMMMUNICATIONS RELATED TO LAWSUIT WHILE PLAINTIFFS WILL BE IN PROPRIA PERSONA. filed by Plaintiffs James Jenkins, Jr, James Jenkins, III RE: PLAINTIFFS OPT FOR RESHMA KAMATH TO BE AGENT FOR SERVICE OF COURT PLEADINGS AND COMMMUNICATIONS RELATED TO LAWSUIT WHILE PLAINTIFFS WILL BE IN PROPRIA PERSONA. Pursuant to discussion with undersigned counsel, PLAINTIFFS JAMES JENKINS JR., AND JAMES JENKINS III will be in propria persona in this case. Plaintiffs have also decided that RESHMA KAMATH will continue to be Plaintiffs agent-for-service of all court pleadings and communications related to the lawsuit while Plaintiffs will be in propria persona. Plaintiffs only had retained RESHMA KAMATH as counsel for this case, and completely trust that RESHMA KAMATH has the best interest of Plaintiffs at the forefront. Plaintiffs never retained a stranger called BRIAN VOGEL and will not communicate with such an individual who is not in the best interest of Plaintiffs. Plaintiffs will put the afore-stated in a notarized declaration shortly. Since Plaintiffs are overseas and because Plaintiff JAMES JENKINS, JR. is in debilitating health, this will take approximately one week. Plaintiffs will file substitution-of-attorney forms to be in propria persona along with the declarations. Sincerely, RESHMA KAMATH, agent for Plaintiffs (Kamath, Reshma) |
|
Wednesday, September 11, 2024 | ||
76 | 76
16
pgs
misc
Declaration
Wed 09/11 7:58 PM
DECLARATION of Brian I. Vogel REGARDING NOTICE TO PLAINTIFFS REGARDING COURTS RULINGS AND FINDINGS FOLLOWING AUGUST 30, 2024 CONFERENCE JAMES JENKINS, JR. AND JAMES JENKINS, III filed by Plaintiff James Jenkins, Jr. (Vogel, Brian) |
|
73 | 73
misc
Statement
Wed 09/11 2:30 AM
STATEMENT DIRTY RACIST TRASH HOLCOMB filed by Plaintiffs James Jenkins, Jr, James Jenkins, III RE: DIRTY WHITE RACIST TRASH HOLCOMBS WHITE MALE ATTORNEY BOYS CLUB AGAINST AFRICAN-AMERICAN MALE PLAINTIFFS. Your dirty White racist trash taking a regular filing and making it deficient. Enjoy your White Boys Club. The falsification of Vogel using MY NAME and that of my LAW FIRM on the court docket you dirty trashy racist HOLCOMB have justified. SHAME ON YOU, DIRTY WHITE RACIST TRASH HOLCOMB. HOLCOMB'S SCATH-FREE letting WHITE MEN and WHITE WOMEN walk out like they did nothing wrong - DISGUSTING. You protect your White people like some kind of innate clan behavior. DIRTY RACIST HOLCOMBS RACIST ORDERS and DISMISSALS wont affect me in anyway. Ill be in this case as counsel for PLAINTIFFS. YOU DIRTY WHITE TRASH - I'll ensure you learn your lesson. This is why I left American for good - if the same behavior is displayed in America from racists and elsewhere, then no point living in America. Sincerely, RESHMA KAMATH,Lead Counsel for Plaintiffs (Kamath, Reshma) |
|
Tuesday, September 10, 2024 | ||
75 | 75
order
Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form
Wed 09/11 1:49 PM
ORDER IN RESPONSE TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: Declaration71 by Judge John W. Holcomb. The document is stricken. (rolm) |
|
74 | 74
order
Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form
Wed 09/11 1:47 PM
ORDER IN RESPONSE TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: Declaration70 by Judge John W. Holcomb. The document is stricken. (rolm) |