Original Case: 3:22-cv-03239

Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cv-02408
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes
Case Filed:Jul 19, 2023
Terminated:Apr 05, 2024
Last checked: Monday Apr 08, 2024 4:39 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
MICHAEL B. HYMAN, Judge
Represented By
Nadine J. Wichern
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
KERRY M. KENNEDY, Judge
Represented By
Nadine J. Wichern
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
MARY ELLEN COGHLAN, Appellate Court Judge
Represented By
Nadine J. Wichern
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
TIMOTHY C. EVANS, Chief Judge
Represented By
Nadine J. Wichern
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
SOPHIA H. HALL, Judge
Represented By
Nadine J. Wichern
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
MICHAEL F. HENRY
Represented By
Michael F. Henry
contact info

GPO Apr 05 2024
Filed Nonprecedential Disposition PER CURIAM. The appeal is DISMISSED. This is not the first time Henry has engaged in frivolous litigation in this court, and we have warned him that further frivolous appeals may result in sanctions. See Henry v. United States, 360 F. App’x 654, 657 (7th Cir. 2010). We order Henry to show cause within 14 days why he should not be subject to sanctions for filing this frivolous appeal despite our warning. See FED. R. APP. P. 38. Any monetary penalty must be paid promptly, or the court will enter an order restricting his future litigation. See Support Sys. Int’l, Inc. v. Mack, 45 F.3d 185 (7th Cir. 1995). Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7022 0410 0003 3396 4783. [7374502-1] [7374502] [23-2408]

Docket last updated: 04/08/2024 4:38 AM CDT
Wednesday, July 19, 2023
1 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee due. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Michael F. Henry by 07/24/2023. Transcript information sheet due by 08/02/2023. Fee or IFP forms due on 08/02/2023 for Appellant Michael F. Henry. [1] [7324502] 23-2408 (MAN) [Entered: 07/20/2023 09:45 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 46 pgs Civil Case
Att: 2 2 pgs Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing
Att: 3 2 pgs Fee Notice
Att: 4 1 pgs Notice to District Court
2 2 THIS CAUSE CONSISTS OF MORE THAN 5 PARTIES FOR EITHER SIDE. The following are those parties to this cause as reflected on the District Court docket, yet are not reflected on the Appellate docket/caption for administrative purposes: APPELLEES: Terrance J Levin, Mary Kathleen McHugh, Thomas W Murphy, Louis Michael Nixon, Aurelia Pucinski, Allen P Walker, E. Kenneth Wright, Jr. and Mary Jane Theis. [2] [7324514] 23-2408 (MAN) [Entered: 07/20/2023 10:00 AM]
Related: [-]