New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jessica G L Clarke
Case #: 1:23-cv-06418
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332pi Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Jul 25, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Jan 21, 2024 3:51 AM EST
Defendant
Leon Black
Represented By
Jennifer J. Barrett
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP
contact info
Susan Rachel Estrich
Estrich Goldin LLP
contact info
Peter Anthony Gwynne
E. Danya Perry Pllc Dba Perry Law
contact info
E. Danya Perry
E. Danya Perry Pllc Dba Perry Law
contact info
Michael Barry Carlinsky
Quinn Emanuel
contact info
Plaintiff
Jane Doe
Represented By
Meredith Anne Firetog
Wigdor LLP
contact info
Jeanne-Marie Bates Christensen
Wigdor LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
254 254 service Certificate of Service Other Fri 04/25 7:35 PM
***SELECTED PARTIES***CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of ECF 252, ECF 253 served on Plaintiff on April 25, 2025. Service was made by regular and electronic mail. Document filed by Non-Party, Leon Black, Jane Doe.Motion or Order to File Under Seal:209 .(Christensen, Jeanne-Marie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit ECF 252,
Att: 2 Exhibit ECF 253
253 253 misc Letter Fri 04/25 3:23 PM
***SELECTED PARTIES*** LETTER addressed to Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke from Jeanne M. Christensen dated April 25, 2025 Document filed by Leon Black, Jane Doe, Non-Party.Motion or Order to File Under Seal:209 .(Christensen, Jeanne-Marie)
Related: [-]
252 252 misc Letter Fri 04/25 2:53 PM
***SELECTED PARTIES*** LETTER addressed to Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke from Susan Estrich dated April 25, 2025 re: Response to Dkt. No. 249. Document filed by Leon Black, Jane Doe.Motion or Order to File Under Seal:209 .(Estrich, Susan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
251 251 service Certificate of Service Other Thu 04/24 7:13 PM
***SELECTED PARTIES***CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of ECF 250 served on Plaintiff on April 24, 2025. Service was made by regular and electronic mail. Document filed by Non-Party, Leon Black, Jane Doe.Motion or Order to File Under Seal:209 .(Christensen, Jeanne-Marie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit ECF 250
250 250 misc Letter Thu 04/24 6:43 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke from Jeanne M. Christensen dated April 24, 2025 Document filed by Non-Party..(Christensen, Jeanne-Marie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
249 249 misc Letter Thu 04/24 11:27 AM
LETTER addressed to Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke from Jane Doe Pro Se Plaintiff dated 4/23/2025 re: I am the pro se Plaintiff in the above-captioned matter. I respectfully write to raise serious concerns regarding the conduct of my former counsel, Wigdor LLP; to request relief necessary to protect my rights and the integrity of these proceedings; and to ask the Court for a temporary stay of proceedings, or an extension of time to oppose Defendants motion to dismiss, which is currently due on May 23, 2025. Document filed by Jane Doe.(tg)
Related: [-]
order Order Wed 04/23 11:41 AM
ORDER By order dated January 16, 2025, this Court stayed discovery of this action, for good cause shown, pending resolution of Defendant's sanctions motion. ECF No.205 . This stay order applied to future scheduled conferences before this Court, and so for the avoidance of doubt, the Court makes clear that the May 1, 2025 case management conference contemplated by the case management order (ECF No.155 ) is ADJOURNED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke) (Text Only Order) (Clarke, Jessica)
Related: [-]