Strawberry Hill Acton Realty Trust v. 3M Company, et al.
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-03598 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Jul 26, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Massachusetts, 1:23-cv-11487 |
Last checked: Monday Jan 22, 2024 4:04 AM EST |
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
The Ansul Company
141 Junny Road
Angier, NC 27501 |
|
Defendant
Raytheon Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Defendant
E.I. du Pont de Nemours & Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
John Doe Defendants 1-49
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
AGC Inc
|
|
Defendant
Angus Fire
|
|
Defendant
Archroma Management LLC
Archroma Management LLC 4000 Monroe Rd.
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corp
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Protection Co.
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Plaintiff
STRAWBERRY HILL ACTON REALTY TRUST
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 07/17 3:06 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by The 3M Company, 3M Company, The, 3M Company, 3M Company, 3M Company, 3M Company, 3M Company, 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co.). Associated Cases)Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Bulger, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Thursday, July 27, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
service
Summons Issued
Thu 07/27 4:13 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
12 | 12
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Thu 07/27 1:07 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Massachusetts (associated as of 7/26/2023), 1:23-cv-11487, Strawberry Hill Acton Realty Trust v. 3M Company, et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-03598-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
10 | 10
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Thu 07/27 10:51 AM
Case transferred in from District of Massachusetts; Case Number 1:23-cv-11487. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Wednesday, July 26, 2023 | ||
9 | 9 Case transferred to the District of South Carolina pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order entered by the MDL Panel on 7/21/2023. Case file electronically extracted to the Clerk in that district. (Belpedio, Lisa) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 7/27/2023.] | |
Friday, July 21, 2023 | ||
8 | 8 Certified copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number 143 in MDL Case 2873 received from the District of South Carolina requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Belpedio, Lisa) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 7/27/2023.] | |
Monday, July 10, 2023 | ||
7 | 7 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Complaint by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP. (Gaudet, Jennifer) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 7/27/2023.] | |
Friday, July 07, 2023 | ||
6 | 6 STATE COURT Record. (Polansky, Kevin) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 7/27/2023.] | |
Wednesday, July 05, 2023 | ||
5 | 5 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Complaint by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP.(Polansky, Kevin) Modified on 7/20/2023 to Correct CM/ECF Filing Event (Paine, Matthew). [Transferred from Massachusetts on 7/27/2023.] | |
Friday, June 30, 2023 | ||
4 | 4 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (Danieli, Chris) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 7/27/2023.] | |
3 | 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Danieli, Chris) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 7/27/2023.] | |
2 | 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP. (Polansky, Kevin) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 7/27/2023.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9928788 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid)(Polansky, Kevin) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 7/27/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Category Form |