Ray Kappel v. 3M Company, The et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-04407 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Dec 06, 2022 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 30, 2023 4:21 AM EDT |
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Co.
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corp
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
3M Company, The
|
|
Plaintiff
Ray Kappel
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, July 28, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Fri 07/28 10:42 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed) (associated as of 12/6/2022), Ray Kappel v. 3M Company, The et al, as DSC case 2:22-cv-04407-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Northern Illinois (sshe, ) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 07/28 10:40 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Service due by 10/26/2023 (sshe, ) |
|
2 | 2
order
Order
Fri 07/28 10:38 AM
TEXT ORDER For good cause shown, the service deadline shall be calculated from the issuance of the summons. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 7/28/2023. (sshe, ) |
|
Tuesday, December 06, 2022 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-10833801.), filed by Ray Kappel.(sshe, ) |