City of Loveland v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-03730 |
Nature of Suit | 245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Aug 01, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Ohio Southern, 1:23-cv-00433 |
Last checked: Monday Jan 29, 2024 4:17 AM EST |
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
DuPont De Nemours Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
EI DuPont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Fire Products GP Holding LLC
|
|
Defendant
John Doe Defendants 1-49
|
|
Defendant
Johnson Controls International plc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Raytheon Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
AGC Inc
|
|
Defendant
Angus International Safety Group LTD
|
|
Defendant
Archroma Management LLC
Archroma Management LLC 4000 Monroe Rd.
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
13995 Pasteur Blvd.
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33418 |
|
Defendant
Central Sprinkler LLC
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chemicals Incorporated
Agent Schok K. Moza 12321 Hatcherville
Baytown, TX 77520 |
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Plaintiff
City of Loveland
120 West Loveland Avenue
Loveland, OH 45140 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 07/09 7:39 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by 3M Company, The.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Bulger, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Monday, August 21, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
service
Summons Issued
Mon 08/21 10:04 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
Tuesday, August 01, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Tue 08/01 4:39 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Ohio Southern (associated as of 8/1/2023), 1:23-cv-00433, City of Loveland v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-03730-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
12 | 12
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Tue 08/01 4:37 PM
Case transferred in from District of Ohio Southern; Case Number 1:23-cv-00433. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
11 | 11
misc
Docket Annotation
Tue 08/01 11:51 AM
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-145): Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on MDL, this action is transferred to the District of South Carolina. Signed by the Clerk of the Panel on 8/1/2023; certified by the Clerk's Office from SCD on 8/1/2023. (er) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Docket Annotation
Tue 08/01 11:46 AM
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-145): This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of South Carolina. Signed by the Clerk of the Panel on 8/1/2023. (er) |
|
Case transferred to District of South Carolina. Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (er) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 8/1/2023.] | ||
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District Not MDL
Tue 08/01 11:54 AM
Case transferred to District of South Carolina. Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (er) |
||
Monday, July 31, 2023 | ||
9 | 9 Mail sent to Ethan R. Ware, Esq. as to re3 Notice by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio Pro Hac vice Rules Returned as Undeliverable. (kh) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 8/1/2023.] | |
Thursday, July 20, 2023 | ||
8 | 8 ORDER granting7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff City of Loveland's Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial. Signed by Judge Jeffery P. Hopkins on 7/20/2023. (zmc) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 8/1/2023.] | |
7 | 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff City of Loveland's Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by Defendants Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP. (Rhinehart, Erin) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 8/1/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order | ||
Friday, July 14, 2023 | ||
6 | 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Tyco Fire Products LP, Johnson Controls International plc identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls International plc for Tyco Fire Products LP.. (Rhinehart, Erin) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 8/1/2023.] | |
5 | 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Chemguard, Inc., Johnson Controls International plc identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls International plc for Chemguard, Inc... (Rhinehart, Erin) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 8/1/2023.] | |
4 | 4 NOTICE by Defendants Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP of Filing Removal Papers in the Clermont County Common Pleas Court (Rhinehart, Erin) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 8/1/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Removal Papers Filed in State Court | ||
3 | 3 Notice by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio of Pro Hac Vice Rules as to Attorneys Brandon J. Taylor, Daniel L. Ring, Tyler Alfermann, Peter Condron, Clifford J. Zatz, Heidi Levine, Melanie Black Dubis, Charles Raynal, Matt Holian, John Wellschlager, Michael L. Carpenter, Jonathan I. Handler, Keith H. Bensten, Jonathan Blakley, John Parker, Oliver Twaddell, Kat Hacker, Kurt D. Weaver, Kirk G. Warner, Clifton L. Brinson, Addie K.S. Ries, David R. Erickson, Brent Dwerlkotte, Ethan R. Ware, and Keith E. Smith (bjc). Modified Docket Text and Replaced Document with Corrected Version on 7/14/2023 (bjc). [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 8/1/2023.] | |
2 | 2 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against 3M Company, AGC Chemicals Americas, Inc., AGC, Inc., Angus International Safety Group, LTD, Archroma Management, LLC, Archroma U.S., Inc., Arkema, Inc., BASF Corporation, Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Carrier Global Corporation, Central Sprinkler, LLC, Chemdesign Products, Inc., Chemguard, Inc., Chemicals Incorporated, Chubb Fire, Ltd., Clariant Corporation, Corteva, Inc., Deepwater Chemicals, Inc., DuPont De NeMours, Inc., Dynax Corporation, E.I. Dupont De NeMours and Company, Fire Products GP Holding, LLC, John Doe Defendants 1-49, Johnson Controls International, PLC, Kidde PLC, Inc., Nation Ford Chemical Company, National Foam, Inc., Raytheon Technologies Corporation, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, Tyco Fire Products LP, UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc., filed by City of Loveland in the Clermnont County Court of Common Pleas case 2023CVB00550 on June 8, 2023. (bjc) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 8/1/2023.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Clermont County Common Pleas, case number 2023CVB00550 ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9506622), filed by Tyco Fire Products LP, Chemguard, Inc.. (Rhinehart, Erin) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 8/1/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State Court Filings and Docket, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet and attachment, | ||
Att: 3 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet and attachment | ||
If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (bjc) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 8/1/2023.] |