Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-10080

Maine Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Michael A Fagone
Case #: 1:23-ap-01008
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
Case Filed:Aug 01, 2023
Terminated:Jun 24, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Sanford D Diday
83 Goose Falls Road
Harborside, ME 04642
Represented By
Sanford D Diday
contact info
Plaintiff
RedChip Companies, Inc.
Represented By
Micah A. Smart, Esq.
Eaton Peabody
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Monday, June 24, 2024
utility Disposition of Adversary Mon 06/24 1:13 PM
Disposition of Adversary Case No. 23-1008 Parties reached agreement. (ljs)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Mon 06/24 1:24 PM
Adversary Case 1:23-ap-1008 has been closed administratively, but not pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 350(a). Additional pleadings, motions and other papers may be filed in this adversary proceeding without filing a motion to re-open. (ljs)
Related: [-]
Saturday, June 22, 2024
33 33 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document**ADI** Sun 06/23 12:27 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+]. Notice Date 06/22/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 30 Order on Document
Friday, June 21, 2024
32 32 court Minutes of Proceedings Fri 06/21 3:36 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Appearances: David C. Johnson, Esq., Micah A. Smart, Esq. Related [+]. Status Conference held and concluded. For reasons stated on the record, Plaintiff's oral motion to dismiss the adversary proceeding without prejudice is granted. /s/ Michael A. Fagone, United States Bankruptcy Judge (kef)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint Filed by Plaintiff RedChip Companies, Inc.
31 31 audio Fri 06/21 11:37 AM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 6/21/2024 9:30:35 AM ]. File Size [ 1579 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:04:23 ]. (courtaudio)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
30 30 1 pgs order Order on Document Thu 06/20 12:18 PM
Order Setting Status Conference Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 6/21/2024 at 09:30 AM at Bankruptcy Courtroom, Room 30600, Bangor. (ljs)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff RedChip Companies, Inc.
29 29 answer Consent Thu 06/20 9:16 AM
Consent Filed by RedChip Companies, Inc. Related [+]. (Smart, Micah)
Related: [-] 28 Document filed by Defendant Sanford D Diday
28 28 misc Document Thu 06/20 8:31 AM
11 USC § 727(a)(10) Waiver of Discharge Filed by Sanford D Diday. (Johnson, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Verified Statement of Sanford Diday
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Monday, June 17, 2024
27 27 misc Exhibit List Mon 06/17 2:09 PM
Joint Exhibit List Filed by Sanford D Diday Related [+]. (Johnson, David)
Related: [-] 19 Scheduling Order
Friday, June 14, 2024
26 26 court Hearing Set - (BK Case) Fri 06/14 8:59 AM
Rescheduled Hearing Set Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 6/21/2024 at 08:30 AM at Bankruptcy Courtroom, Room 30600, Bangor. (ljs)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff RedChip Companies, Inc.
Thursday, June 06, 2024
25 25 court Minutes of Proceedings Fri 06/07 3:58 PM
Minute Entry: Appearances: David C. Johnson, Esq., Micah A. Smart, Esq. Related [+]. Final pretrial conference held and concluded. (ljs)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint Filed by Plaintiff RedChip Companies, Inc.
24 24 audio Thu 06/06 2:17 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 6/6/2024 1:11:46 PM ]. File Size [ 2546 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:07:04 ]. (courtaudio)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
23 23 misc Statement of Facts Tue 06/04 4:25 PM
Parties' Stipulation of Undisputed Material Facts Filed by RedChip Companies, Inc. Related [+]. (Smart, Micah)
Related: [-] Update Other Deadlines (Adv)
Friday, May 24, 2024
22 22 misc Witness List Fri 05/24 10:37 AM
Witness List Filed by RedChip Companies, Inc.. (Smart, Micah)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Witness List Fri 05/24 9:52 AM
Witness List Filed by Sanford D Diday. (Johnson, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document**ADI** Fri 03/15 12:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+]. Notice Date 03/14/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19 Scheduling Order
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
19 19 order Scheduling Order Tue 03/12 9:48 AM
Order Setting Date for Trial and Related Deadlines Related [+] Trial date set for 6/21/2024 at 09:00 AM at Bankruptcy Courtroom, Room 30600, Bangor. Witness and Exhibit Lists due by 5/27/2024. (kef)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff RedChip Companies, Inc.
utility Update Other Deadlines (Adv) Tue 03/12 9:49 AM
Other Deadlines Updated (Adv). Stipulation of Undisputed Material Facts due by 6/5/2024. (kef)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Set - (Adv Case) Tue 03/12 9:51 AM
Hearing Se Related [+]. Final Pre-Trial Conference set for 6/6/2024 at 01:00 PM at Bankruptcy Courtroom, Room 30600, Bangor. (kef)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff RedChip Companies, Inc.
Thursday, March 07, 2024
18 18 court Minutes of Proceedings Fri 03/08 9:26 AM
Minute Entry: Appearances: David C. Johnson, Esq., Micah A. Smart, Esq.. Related [+]. Pretrial conference held and concluded. Order to issue. (kef)
Related: [-] 11 Pre-Trial Scheduling Order.
17 17 audio Thu 03/07 3:37 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 3/7/2024 1:04:27 PM ]. File Size [ 5092 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:14:09 ]. (courtaudio)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
16 16 court Minute Entry Continued Fri 02/02 2:10 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Appearances: Trey R. Milam, Esq., Micah A. Smart, Esq.. Related [+]. On the Court's own initiative and for reasons set forth on the record, the deadline stated in the Pretrial Scheduling Order for the parties to complete discovery on count III of the Complaint is extended to 02/16/2024. No further extensions will be granted absent a request from a party and a showing of good cause. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(4). The further pretrial conference set for 02/01/2024 in the Pretrial Scheduling Order is rescheduled to 03/07/2024 at 1:00 PM at Bankruptcy Courtroom, Room 30600, Bangor. /s/ Michael A. Fagone, United States Bankruptcy Judge (kef)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by RedChip Companies, Inc.,11 Pre-Trial Scheduling Order.
15 15 audio Thu 02/01 2:42 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 2/1/2024 1:50:52 PM ]. File Size [ 1565 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:04:21 ]. (courtaudio)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
14 14 misc Witness List Thu 01/25 2:32 PM
Expert Witness Designation Filed by RedChip Companies, Inc.. (Smart, Micah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Friday, October 27, 2023
13 13 misc Document Fri 10/27 2:58 PM
F.R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures Filed by RedChip Companies, Inc. Related [+]. (Smart, Micah)
Related: [-] 11 Pre-Trial Scheduling Order.
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document**ADI** Thu 10/19 12:22 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+]. Notice Date 10/18/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Pre-Trial Scheduling Order.
Monday, October 16, 2023
11 11 order Pre-Trial Scheduling Order Mon 10/16 3:56 PM
Pretrial Scheduling Order. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 2/1/2024 at 01:00 PM at Bankruptcy Courtroom, Room 30600, Bangor. (kef)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff RedChip Companies, Inc.
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
10 10 misc Document Tue 10/10 1:45 PM
Defendant's Statement under Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 7008 Filed by Sanford D Diday. (Johnson, David)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Document Tue 10/10 10:45 AM
Statement Under Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 7008 Filed by RedChip Companies, Inc.. (Smart, Micah)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
8 8 court Minutes of Proceedings Fri 10/06 4:32 PM
Minute Entry: Appearances: David C. Johnson, Esq., Shawn K. Doil, Esq. Related [+]. Pretrial conference held and concluded. Order to issue. (ljs)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint Filed by Plaintiff RedChip Companies, Inc.
7 7 audio Fri 10/06 2:32 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 10/6/2023 1:20:06 PM ]. File Size [ 14781 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:41:03 ]. (courtaudio)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
6 6 misc Rule 26(f) Report Fri 09/29 3:17 PM
Rule 26(f) Report Filed by RedChip Companies, Inc. Related [+]. (Smart, Micah)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 08/30 11:28 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Sanford D Diday. (Johnson, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 04, 2023
4 4 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Fri 08/04 9:31 AM
Corporate Ownership Statement filed. Filed by RedChip Companies, Inc.. (Smart, Micah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 03, 2023
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 08/03 3:31 PM
Summons Service Executed on Sanford D Diday 8/3/2023 .. (Smart, Micah)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 02, 2023
2 2 court Summons Issued Wed 08/02 9:00 AM
Summons Issued on Sanford D Diday Date Issued 8/2/2023, Answer Due 9/1/2023 Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/6/2023 at 01:00 PM at Bankruptcy Courtroom, Room 30600, Bangor. Rule 26(f) Report due by 9/29/2023. (tll)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff RedChip Companies, Inc.
Tuesday, August 01, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint ** Use Open an AP Case to Open Adversary ** Tue 08/01 4:30 PM
Adversary case 23-01008 Complaint by RedChip Companies, Inc. against Sanford D Diday. Fee Amount $ 350.. (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)),(68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Smart, Micah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Att: 2 Exhibit
Att: 3 Exhibit
Att: 4 Exhibit
Att: 5 Exhibit
Att: 6 Exhibit
Att: 7 Exhibit