Stephens v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-03746 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Aug 01, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Florida Middle, 3:23-cv-00819 |
Last checked: Monday Jan 29, 2024 4:24 AM EST |
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
Raytheon Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Defendant
Johnson Controls International plc
|
|
Defendant
John Doe Defendants 1-49
|
|
Defendant
Fire Products GP Holding LLC
|
|
Defendant
E I Dupont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
AGC Inc
|
|
Defendant
Angus International Safety Group, Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Archroma Management LLC
Archroma Management LLC 4000 Monroe Rd.
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Archroma U.S., lnc.
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire, Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Central Sprinkler LLC
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chemicals Incorporated
Agent Schok K. Moza 12321 Hatcherville
Baytown, TX 77520 |
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
|
|
Plaintiff
John Stephens
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 08/14 5:27 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by John Stephens Without Prejudice Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03746-RMG(Summy, Scott) |
|
Tuesday, August 08, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
service
Summons Issued
Tue 08/08 9:44 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
Thursday, August 03, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Thu 08/03 12:52 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Florida Middle (associated as of 8/1/2023), 3:23-cv-00819, Stephens v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-03746-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
11 | 11
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Thu 08/03 12:45 PM
Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 3:23-cv-00819. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Tuesday, August 01, 2023 | ||
10 | 10 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: District of South Carolina Transferee court case number: 2:18-mn-2873-RMG MDL case number: 2873 (MDC) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 8/3/2023.] | |
Monday, July 24, 2023 | ||
9 | 9 ENDORSED ORDER granting 6 the unopposed motion for an extension of time. Tyco Fire Products LP and Chemguard, Inc., need not respond to the complaint until the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation decides whether to transfer the action. If the action is not transferred, Tyco and Chemguard must respond to the complaint within twenty-eight days after the decision not to transfer or by the deadline under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(a), whichever is later. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 7/24/2023. (VNG) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 8/3/2023.] | |
Wednesday, July 19, 2023 | ||
8 | 8 Case Reassigned to Judge Brian J. Davis. New case number: 3:23-cv-819-BJD-PDB. Judge Timothy J. Corrigan no longer assigned to the case. (MDC) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 8/3/2023.] | |
Tuesday, July 18, 2023 | ||
7 | 7 ORDER of recusal, directing the Clerk to reassign the case to another district judge. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 7/18/2023. (SRW) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 8/3/2023.] | |
Monday, July 17, 2023 | ||
6 | 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File response to Complaint by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products L.P.. (Sloan, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 8/3/2023.] | |
5 | 5 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products L.P. identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls International plc for Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products L.P...(Sloan, Michael) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 8/3/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
3 | 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Philip F. Cossich, Jr., Scott Summy, Carla Burke Pickrel, and Brett Land of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (KME) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 8/3/2023.] | |
Friday, July 14, 2023 | ||
2 | 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:23-cv-819-TJC-PDB. (AM) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 8/3/2023.] | |
Thursday, July 13, 2023 | ||
4 | 4 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by John Stephens. Filed in state court on 5/23/2023.(KME) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 8/3/2023.] | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from the 4th Judicial Circuit In and For Duval County, Florida, case number 16-2023-CA-008891-XXXX-MA filed in State Court on 5/23/2023. Filing fee $402, receipt number AFLMDC-21039420 filed by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products L.P.(Sloan, Michael) Modified text on 7/17/2023 (KME). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 8/3/2023.] | |
Att: 1 State Court COMPLAINT, | ||
Att: 2 State Court Docket Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 State Court Other Documents, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet |