Grafton Water District v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-03768 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Aug 02, 2023 |
Last checked: Monday Jan 29, 2024 4:25 AM EST |
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Co.
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company LLC, The
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
John Doe Defendants 1-49
|
|
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
E. I. Du Pont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
successor-in-interest to the Ansul Co. One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Plaintiff
Grafton Water District
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, May 24, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 05/24 1:54 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice of Claims by Plaintiffs on Exhibit A against Defendants The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, DuPont de Nemours, Inc., Corteva, Inc., and E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company n/k/a EIDP, Inc. (collectively, the "DuPont Defendants") by Plaintiffs.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Sansone, Kenneth) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Cases 85-113 | ||
Friday, August 04, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Fri 08/04 2:59 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed) (associated as of 8/2/2023), Grafton Water District v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-03768-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Massachusetts (sshe, ) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Fri 08/04 12:37 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (cper, ) |
|
Wednesday, August 02, 2023 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 08/04 12:36 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-11242816), filed by Grafton Water District. Service due by 10/31/2023(cper, ) |