Carroll Electric Cooperative v. Alltel Corporation
Original Case: 3:23-cv-03017
Eighth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:23-cv-02770 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Aug 03, 2023 |
Last checked: Friday Aug 04, 2023 3:23 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Alltel Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Carroll Electric Cooperative Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 08/04/2023 3:23 AM CDT |
Thursday, August 03, 2023 | ||
4 pgs Civil case docketed. [5302572] 23-2770 (CAH) | ||
14 pgs Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, opinion and order 7/24/23. [5302576] 23-2770 (CAH) | ||
2
pgs
CONSOLIDATED BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 09/12/2023. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Carroll Electric Cooperative Corporation due 09/12/2023. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5302585] 23-2579 23-2770 (CAH) |