Utah District Court
Case #: 4:23-cr-00057
Case Filed:Jul 11, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Aug 10, 2023 1:22 AM MDT
Defendant
Abel Benitez-Santoyo (1)
Represented By
Paul D. Riddle
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Robert K. Hunt
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Defendant
Claudia Coronado-Sanchez (2)
Represented By
Matt A. Munson
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Brady Wilson
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/10/2023 1:59 AM MDT
Tuesday, July 11, 2023
1 1 SEALED INDICTMENT as to Abel Benitez-Santoyo (1) count(s) 1, 2, Claudia Coronado-Sanchez (2) count(s) 1, 2. Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (bmr)
Related: [-]
4 4 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF HOLDING COURT in St. George by USA as to Abel Benitez-Santoyo, Claudia Coronado-Sanchez (bmr)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER SETTING HEARING as to Abel Benitez-Santoyo, Claudia Coronado-Sanchez Initial Appearance set for 7/13/2023 at 10:00 AM in Room 2B 206 (St George) before Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 7/11/2023.(jlh)
Related: [-]