New Jersey District Court
Case #: 3:23-cr-00635
Case Filed:Aug 09, 2023
Terminated:Oct 23, 2024
Last checked: Friday Aug 11, 2023 4:08 AM EDT
Defendant
ISRAFIL DAVID DEMIR (1)
Represented By
RIZA ISMAIL DAGLI
Brach Eichler LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
SAMANTHA CHRISTINE FASANELLO
Office Of The U.S. Attorney
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/20/2024 7:18 PM EST
Tuesday, May 25, 2021
1 1 9 pgs COMPLAINT as to ISRAFIL DAVID DEMIR (1). (seb) [2:21-mj-12219-JBC]
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs SEALING ORDER as to ISRAFIL DAVID DEMIR. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 5/25/2021. (seb) [2:21-mj-12219-JBC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 26, 2021
Arrest of ISRAFIL DAVID DEMIR (seb) [2:21-mj-12219-JBC]
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark:Initial Appearance as to ISRAFIL DAVID DEMIR held on 5/26/2021. Defendant advised of rights. Bail set $300,000 (unsecured). (Court Reporter/Recorder Zoom.) (seb) [2:21-mj-12219-JBC]
Related: [-]
5 5 3 pgs ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to ISRAFIL DAVID DEMIR (1) $300,000 (unsecured) (Finance notified). Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 5/26/2021. (seb) [2:21-mj-12219-JBC]
Related: [-]
6 6 Appearance Bond Entered as to ISRAFIL DAVID DEMIR in amount of $ 300,000 (unsecured). (seb) [2:21-mj-12219-JBC]
Related: [-]
7 7 WAIVER of Preliminary Examination or Hearing by ISRAFIL DAVID DEMIR (executed on the record). (seb) [2:21-mj-12219-JBC]
Related: [-]
8 8 BRADY ORDER as to ISRAFIL DAVID DEMIR. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 5/26/2021. (seb) [2:21-mj-12219-JBC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 02, 2021
9 9 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to ISRAFIL DAVID DEMIR Time excluded from 6/2/2021 until 7/31/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 6/2/2021. (seb) [2:21-mj-12219-JBC]
Related: [-]
Monday, June 07, 2021
13 13 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: RIZA ISMAIL DAGLI appearing for ISRAFIL DAVID DEMIR (seb) [2:21-mj-12219-JBC]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 08, 2021
10 10 28 pgs Letter Application requesting permission to travel filed by ISRAFIL DAVID DEMIR. (seb) [2:21-mj-12219-JBC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 09, 2021
11 11 Letter Response from USA re10 Letter Application (seb) [2:21-mj-12219-JBC]
Related: [-]
12 12 2 pgs ORDER denying10 Letter Application filed by ISRAFIL DAVID DEMIR. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 6/9/2021. (seb) [2:21-mj-12219-JBC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 04, 2021
14 14 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to ISRAFIL DAVID DEMIR Time excluded from 8/4/2021 until 9/30/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 8/4/2021. (seb) [2:21-mj-12219-JBC]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 19, 2021
15 15 ORDER Modifying Conditions of Release as to ISRAFIL DAVID DEMIR (1) $300,000 (unsecured) (Finance notified). Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 8/19/2021. (seb) [2:21-mj-12219-JBC]
Related: [-]
Friday, October 01, 2021
16 16 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to ISRAFIL DAVID DEMIR Time excluded from 10/1/2021 until 10/31/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 10/1/2021. (seb) [2:21-mj-12219-JBC]
Related: [-]
Monday, October 04, 2021
17 17 ORDER Modifying Conditions of Release as to ISRAFIL DAVID DEMIR (1) $300,000 (unsecured) (Finance notified). Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 10/4/2021. (seb) [2:21-mj-12219-JBC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 03, 2021
18 18 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to ISRAFIL DAVID DEMIR Time excluded from 11/3/2021 until 12/31/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 11/3/2021. (seb) [2:21-mj-12219-JBC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 29, 2021
19 19 STANDING ORDER 2021-11 (COVID-19) excluding Speedy Trial time, under 18 U.S.C. 3161(h)(7)(A), from December 29, 2021 through January 31, 2022 in all criminal proceedings in this District under the Speedy Trial Act, including those proceedings commenced by complaint and time limits established by the Interstate Agreement of Detainers, etc. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 12/29/2021. (seb) [2:21-mj-12219-JBC]
Related: [-]
Monday, January 31, 2022
20 20 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to ISRAFIL DAVID DEMIR Time excluded from 1/31/2022 until 4/1/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 1/31/2022. (seb) [2:21-mj-12219-JBC]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 01, 2022
21 21 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to ISRAFIL DAVID DEMIR Time excluded from 4/1/2022 until 6/1/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 4/1/2022. (seb) [2:21-mj-12219-JBC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 01, 2022
22 22 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to ISRAFIL DAVID DEMIR Time excluded from 6/1/2022 until 7/31/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 6/1/2022. (seb) [2:21-mj-12219-JBC]
Related: [-]
Friday, July 29, 2022
23 23 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to ISRAFIL DAVID DEMIR Time excluded from 7/29/2022 until 9/30/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 7/29/2022. (seb) [2:21-mj-12219-JBC]
Related: [-]
Friday, September 30, 2022
24 24 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to ISRAFIL DAVID DEMIR Time excluded from 9/30/2022 until 11/30/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 9/30/2022. (seb) [2:21-mj-12219-JBC]
Related: [-]
Friday, December 02, 2022
25 25 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to ISRAFIL DAVID DEMIR Time excluded from 12/2/2022 until 1/31/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 12/2/2022. (seb) [2:21-mj-12219-JBC]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 03, 2023
26 26 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to ISRAFIL DAVID DEMIR Time excluded from 2/3/2023 until 3/31/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 2/3/2023. (seb) [2:21-mj-12219-JBC]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 16, 2023
27 27 CONSENT ORDER Modifying Conditions of Release as to ISRAFIL DAVID DEMIR (1) $300,000 (unsecured) (Finance notified). Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 2/16/2023. (seb) [2:21-mj-12219-JBC]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 31, 2023
29 29 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to ISRAFIL DAVID DEMIR Time excluded from 3/31/2023 until 5/31/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 3/31/2023. (seb) [2:21-mj-12219-JBC]
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 08, 2023
28 28 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to ISRAFIL DAVID DEMIR Time excluded from 6/8/2023 until 7/31/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 6/8/2023. (seb) [2:21-mj-12219-JBC]
Related: [-]
Sunday, July 30, 2023
30 30 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE SAMANTHA CHRISTINE FASANELLO appearing for USA. Attorney ANDREW MARK TROMBLY terminated. (FASANELLO, SAMANTHA) [2:21-mj-12219-JBC]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 31, 2023
31 31 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to ISRAFIL DAVID DEMIR Time excluded from 7/31/2023 until 9/1/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 7/31/2023. (seb) [2:21-mj-12219-JBC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 09, 2023
32 32 INFORMATION as to ISRAFIL DAVID DEMIR (1) count 1. (adi)
Related: [-]
33 33 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by ISRAFIL DAVID DEMIR. (adi)
Related: [-]
34 34 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Georgette Castner:Plea Agreement Hearing as to ISRAFIL DAVID DEMIR held on 8/9/2023, Plea entered Guilty Count 1. Sentencing set for 12/14/2023 at 01:00 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 5E before Judge Georgette Castner. Bail continued as previously set. (Court Reporter/Recorder Kimberly Wilson (609-815-2751).) (adi)
Related: [-]
35 35 APPLICATION for permission to enter Plea of guilty as to ISRAFIL "DAVID" DEMIR. (adi)
Related: [-]
36 36 10 pgs PLEA AGREEMENT as to ISRAFIL "DAVID" DEMIR. (adi)
Related: [-]