The State of Mississippi, Ex Rel. Lynn Fitch Attorney General v. Eli Lilly and Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:23-md-03080
Lead case: 2:23-md-03080
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Brian R Martinotti |
Referred: | Edward S Kiel |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-04364 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Aug 11, 2023 |
Re-opened: | Aug 07, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Mississippi Southern, 3:21-cv-00674 |
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 07, 2024 5:35 AM EST |
Defendant
EXPRESS SCRIPTS PHARMACY INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Optumrx Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MEDCO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Express Scripts Inc.
1 Express Way
St. Louis, MO 63121 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
EXPRESS SCRIPTS ADMINISTRATORS LLC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
EVERNORTH HEALTH INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ESI Mail Pharmacy Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CVS HEALTH CORPORATION
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CAREMARK RX L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CAREMARK PCS HEALTH, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CAREMARK L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
In Re
INSULIN PRICING LITIGATION
|
|
Plaintiff
The State of Mississippi, Ex Rel. Lynn Fitch Attorney General
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Zinc Health Services, LLC
|
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
UnitedHealth Group Inc
Terminated: 08/15/2022
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
OptumInsight Inc.
Terminated: 08/15/2022
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Optum Inc.
Terminated: 08/15/2022
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
OPTUMRX HOLDINGS, LLC
Terminated: 08/15/2022
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CVS PHARMACY INC.
Terminated: 08/29/2022
|
Represented By
|