New York Southern District Court
Judge:Lewis J Liman
Case #: 1:23-cv-07111
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Aug 11, 2023
Terminated:Feb 21, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 07, 2024 5:22 AM EST
Defendant
Mavis Tire Supply LLC
Represented By
Alexander Scott Dahle
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Jonathan Marc Kozak
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Sean Mahase
Represented By
C.K. Lee
Lee Litigation Group, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 42 minutes ago
Monday, March 11, 2024
24 24 misc Satisfaction of Judgment Mon 03/11 9:28 AM
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT re:22 Judgment, entered In favor of Sean Mahase Against Mavis Tire Supply LLC in the amount of $7500. Judgment satisfied on 3/8/2024. Document filed by Mavis Tire Supply LLC..(nd)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
23 23 misc Proposed Satisfaction of Judgment Fri 03/08 4:35 PM
PROPOSED FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT. Satisfaction of Judgment to be Mailed by the Court. Document filed by Sean Mahase..(Lee, C.K.) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
22 22 order Judgment Wed 02/21 1:05 PM
RULE 68 JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED, that judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiff SEAN MAHASE, in the sum of $7,500.00, in accordance with the terms and conditions of Defendant's Rule 68 Offer of Judgment dated February 7, 2024 and filed as Exhibit A to Docket Number 20. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 2/21/2024) (va)
Related: [-]
utility Case Stay Lifted Wed 02/21 1:05 PM
Case Stay Lifted. (va)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
misc Notice to Court Regarding Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment Tue 02/20 10:41 AM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE WITH OFFER OF JUDGMENT. Document No. 20 Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Court Regarding Proposed Order Tue 02/20 10:42 AM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document No. 21 Proposed Judgment was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 19, 2024
21 21 misc Proposed Judgment Mon 02/19 4:58 PM
PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Re: Document No.20 Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment. Document filed by Sean Mahase..(Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment Mon 02/19 4:56 PM
NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE WITH OFFER OF JUDGMENT . Document filed by Sean Mahase..(Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A Offer of Judgment
Monday, February 12, 2024
19 19 1 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Mon 02/12 12:25 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/15/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. Parties are directed to dial into the Court's teleconference number at 888-251-2909, Access Code 2123101, and follow the necessary prompts. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 2/12/2024) (vfr)
Related: [-]
18 18 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Mon 02/12 12:23 PM
ORDER denying17 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. Motion denied. The initial pretrial conference will be scheduled for early March. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 2/12/2024) (vfr)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
17 17 motion Extension of Time to File Document Fri 02/09 1:52 PM
JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Update the Court on Status of Settlement and of Stay and Tolling addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from C.K. Lee dated February 9, 2024. Document filed by Sean Mahase..(Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 27, 2024
16 16 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Sat 01/27 6:05 AM
ORDER granting15 Letter Motion for Extension of Time Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/20/2024. Status Report due by 2/9/2024. The parties are to submit a proposed case management plan by February 20, 2024. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (Liman, Lewis)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
15 15 motion Extension of Time Fri 01/26 3:28 PM
JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Update the Court on Status of Settlement and of Stay and Tolling addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from C.K. Lee. Document filed by Sean Mahase..(Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2023
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/27 3:16 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander Scott Dahle on behalf of Mavis Tire Supply LLC..(Dahle, Alexander)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/27 3:14 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Marc Kozak on behalf of Mavis Tire Supply LLC..(Kozak, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 10/27 2:45 PM
ORDER granting9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re9 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Jonathan M. Kozak dated 10/27/2023.. All Defendants (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (Liman, Lewis)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 10/27 11:16 AM
FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Jonathan M. Kozak dated 10/27/2023. Document filed by Mavis Tire Supply LLC..(Kozak, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Stipulation to Extend
Friday, September 01, 2023
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 09/01 12:24 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Mavis Tire Supply LLC waiver sent on 8/30/2023, answer due 10/30/2023. Document filed by Sean Mahase..(Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 16, 2023
utility Case Declined as Not Related Wed 08/16 12:01 PM
CASE DECLINED AS NOT RELATED. Case referred as related to 1:22-cv-10999-PGG-JLC and declined by Judge Paul G. Gardephe and returned to wheel for assignment. (vba)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment Wed 08/16 12:20 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 08/16 12:22 PM
Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vba)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 11, 2023
5 5 misc Statement of Relatedness Fri 08/11 2:52 PM
STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 22-cv-10999-PGG-JLC. Document filed by Sean Mahase..(Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Consent to Sue Fri 08/11 2:49 PM
CONSENT TO SUE UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Sean Mahase..(Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 08/11 2:48 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mavis Tire Supply LLC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Sean Mahase..(Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 08/11 2:46 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/11 2:45 PM
COMPLAINT against Mavis Tire Supply LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28137520)Document filed by Sean Mahase..(Lee, C.K.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E