Washington Western District Court
Judge:Marsha J Pechman
Case #: 2:23-cv-01239
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(b) - Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Aug 14, 2023
Terminated:Jun 03, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Feb 10, 2024 12:58 AM PST
Defendant
James Boulding-Bridges
Represented By
Howard Ramsey Morrill
contact info
Defendant
Haley Campbell
Represented By
Howard Ramsey Morrill
contact info
Defendant
Sadler-Bridges Wellness Group PLLC
Represented By
Howard Ramsey Morrill
contact info
Plaintiff
Traverse Therapy Services PLLC
Represented By
Daniel J Spurgeon
Davis Grimm Payne & Marra
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/27/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
107 107 appeal Time Schedule Order Appeal Number from USCA Wed 06/26 2:03 PM
TIME SCHEDULE ORDER/USCA CASE NUMBER 24-3931 as to106 Notice of Appeal, filed by Traverse Therapy Services PLLC. (RE)
Related: [-]
106 106 appeal Notice of Appeal to Circuit Wed 06/26 10:26 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to Ninth Circuit 24-3931 re72 Order on Motion to Compel,91 Order on Motion for Discovery,104 Order on Motion for Relief, Order on Motion for Reconsideration,86 Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment,105 Judgment by Court, by Plaintiff Traverse Therapy Services PLLC. $605, receipt number AWAWDC-8521641 (cc: USCA) (Spurgeon, Daniel) Modified on 6/26/2024 to add CCA#. (RE)
Related: [-]