USA v. LICHTENSTEIN et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Case #: | 1:23-cr-00239 |
Case Filed: | Jul 20, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 19, 2023 3:42 AM EDT |
Defendant
ILYA LICHTENSTEIN (1)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
HEATHER RHIANNON MORGAN (2)
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
USA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/16/2025 12:01 PM EDT |
Monday, February 07, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
4 | 4
![]() |
|
Tuesday, February 08, 2022 | ||
Arrest of ILYA LICHTENSTEIN in New York. (zstd) [1:22-mj-00022-RMM] | ||
Case unsealed as to ILYA LICHTENSTEIN, HEATHER RHIANNON MORGAN (zstd) [1:22-mj-00022-RMM] | ||
Arrest of HEATHER RHIANNON MORGAN in New York. (zstd) [1:22-mj-00022-RMM] | ||
5 | 5
![]() |
|
6 | 6
![]() |
|
7 | 7
![]() |
|
8 | 8
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
9 | 9
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
10 | 10
![]() |
|
11 | 11 MOTION to Review of Release Order by USA as to ILYA LICHTENSTEIN, HEATHER RHIANNON MORGAN. ( See docket entry8 to view document.) (zstd) [1:22-mj-00022-RMM] | |
Wednesday, February 09, 2022 | ||
MINUTE ORDER (paperless), as to ILYA LICHTENSTEIN and HEATHER RHIANNON MORGAN, DIRECTING that (1) defendants submit by 5:00 PM on February 9, 2022, any opposition to the Government's8 Motion for Review of Release Order and (2) the government submit any reply in support of its motion by 2:00 PM on February 10, 2022; and FURTHER DIRECTING the parties to appear for a Motion Hearing on the government's8 MOTION for Review of Release Order at 2:00 PM on February 11, 2022, via videoconference before Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. A videoconference link will be provided by the deputy clerk. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on February 9, 2022. (lcbah1) [1:22-mj-00022-RMM] | ||
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to ILYA LICHTENSTEIN, HEATHER RHIANNON MORGAN: defendants' opposition to8 Motion for Review of Release Order due by 5:00 PM on 2/9/2022; government's reply due by 2:00 PM on 2/10/2022; Motion Hearing scheduled for 2/11/2022; at 2:00 PM via videoconference before Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (ztg) [1:22-mj-00022-RMM] | ||
MINUTE ORDER (paperless), as to ILYA LICHTENSTEIN and HEATHER RHIANNON MORGAN, granting defendants'12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Samson Enzer. Mr. Enzer may enter an appearance pro hac vice for the purpose of representing defendants in this action. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCrR 44.5(a). Click for Instructions . Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on February 9, 2022. (lcbah1) [1:22-mj-00022-RMM] | ||
MINUTE ORDER (paperless), as to ILYA LICHTENSTEIN and HEATHER RHIANNON MORGAN, granting defendants'13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Anirudh Bansal. Mr. Bansal may enter an appearance pro hac vice for the purpose of representing defendants in this action. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCrR 44.5(a). Click for Instructions . Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on February 9, 2022. (lcbah1) [1:22-mj-00022-RMM] | ||
MINUTE ORDER (paperless), as to ILYA LICHTENSTEIN and HEATHER RHIANNON MORGAN, granting defendants'14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Nola B. Heller. Ms. Heller may enter an appearance pro hac vice for the purpose of representing defendants in this action. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCrR 44.5(a). Click for Instructions . Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on February 9, 2022. (lcbah1) [1:22-mj-00022-RMM] | ||
NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: as to ILYA LICHTENSTEIN, HEATHER RHIANNON MORGAN re15 Response to motion, was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading. The document is a letter and needs to be filed using the Event Notices (Other) and the letter as the attachment. (zstd) [1:22-mj-00022-RMM] | ||
12 | 12
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
13 | 13
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
14 | 14
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
15 | 15
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Thursday, February 10, 2022 | ||
NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: as to ILYA LICHTENSTEIN, HEATHER RHIANNON MORGAN re19 MOTION to allow legal visit with Mr. Lichtenstein was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading. The document is not a motion and the court caption has to be on the document. (zstd) [1:22-mj-00022-RMM] | ||
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell: Telephone Conference as to ILYA LICHTENSTEIN, HEATHER RHIANNON MORGAN held on 2/10/2022 with counsel of record. Motion Hearing rescheduled to Monday, February 14, 2022, at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 22A- In Person before Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. Medical/Mental Health Alert will be issued to the Department of Corrections Medical Unit as to HEATHER RHIANNON MORGAN. Transport Order entered by the Court. Bond Status of Defendants: Defendants committed. Present telephonically: Defense Attorney: Anirudh Bansal; US Attorney: Christopher B. Brown, Katherine Pelker, and Jessica Peck. Court Reporter: Elizabeth Saint-Loth. (ztg) [1:22-mj-00022-RMM] | ||
16 | 16
![]() |
|
17 | 17
![]() |
|
18 | 18
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
19 | 19
![]() |
|
20 | 20
![]() |
|
Friday, February 11, 2022 | ||
21 | 21
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
22 | 22
![]() |
|
Sunday, February 13, 2022 | ||
23 | 23
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, February 14, 2022 | ||
MINUTE ORDER as to ILYA LICHTENSTEIN, HEATHER RHIANNON MORGAN, RESCHEDULING until 2:30 PM due to defense counsel's train delay, the Motion Hearing scheduled for today, February 14, 2022, before Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell; defense counsel is hereby authorized to appear via videoconference from his offices in New York. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on 2/14/2022. (ztg) [1:22-mj-00022-RMM] | ||
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell: Motion Hearing as to ILYA LICHTENSTEIN, HEATHER RHIANNON MORGAN held on 2/14/2022. Government's8 MOTION for Review of Release Order, heard and granted in part and denied in part. Magistrate Judge's Release Order AFFIRMED as to Defendant HEATHER RHIANNON MORGAN and OVERRULED as to Defendant ILYA LICHTENSTEIN. Defendant Heather Rhiannon Morgan shall continue to be detained pending the posting of a $3,000,000.00 secured bond; Defendant Ilya Lichtenstein shall be held without bond pending trial. Bond Status of Defendants: Defendants committed/commitments issued. Present: Defense Attorneys: #1 and #2 Samson Enzer and Nola B. Heller; US Attorneys: Christopher B. Brown, Katherine Pelker, and Jessica Peck; Pretrial Officer: Christine Schuck. Court Reporter: Elizabeth Saint-Loth. (ztg) Modified amount of bond on 2/15/2022 (ztg). [1:22-mj-00022-RMM] | ||
24 | 24
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
26 | 26
![]() |
|
28 | 28
![]() |
|
Tuesday, February 15, 2022 | ||
25 | 25
![]() |
|
Wednesday, February 16, 2022 | ||
30 | 30
![]() |
|
Thursday, February 17, 2022 | ||
31 | 31
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, February 18, 2022 | ||
32 | 32
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
Att: 11
![]() |
||
Att: 12
![]() |
||
Att: 13
![]() |
||
Att: 14
![]() |
||
33 | 33
![]() |
|
Tuesday, February 22, 2022 | ||
Set/Reset Hearings as to ILYA LICHTENSTEIN (1), HEATHER RHIANNON MORGAN (2): Initial Appearance set for 2/24/2022 at 3:00 PM by Telephonic/VTC before Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather. (ztl) [1:22-mj-00022-RMM] | ||
Wednesday, February 23, 2022 | ||
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Governments Unopposed Motion for Status Hearing and Unopposed Motion to Exclude Time Under the Speedy Trial Act (the Motion) (ECF No.31 ), it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is DENIED as moot. The parties are directed to appear before Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather on February 24, 2022 at 3:00 p.m. for an initial appearance. Any requests, including those made in the Motion, shall be directed to Judge Meriweather during the initial appearance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui on 2/23/2022. (ztl) [1:22-mj-00022-RMM] | ||
Thursday, February 24, 2022 | ||
ORAL MOTION for Speedy Trial Waiver by USA as to ILYA LICHTENSTEIN (1). (zpt) [1:22-mj-00022-RMM] | ||
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather: VTC Initial Appearance as to ILYA LICHTENSTEIN (1) held on 2/24/2022. Oral Motion for Speedy Trial Waiver as to ILYA LICHTENSTEIN (1) Heard and Granted. Time between 2/24/2022 and 3/25/2022 (29 Days) shall be excluded from calculation under the Speedy Trial Act in the interest of justice X-T. Status Hearing set for 3/25/2022 at 03:00 PM in Telephonic/VTC before Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui. Bond Status of Defendant: Defendant Remains Committed; Court Reporter: FTR Gold FTR Time Frame: CTRM 7 [3:13:09-3:30:46]; Defense Attorney: Marshall Miller, Nola Heller, Samson Enzer, Connor O'Fey; US Attorney: Catherine Pelker and Christopher Brown; Pretrial Officer: Dashanta Valentine-Lewis; (zpt) [1:22-mj-00022-RMM] | ||
Friday, February 25, 2022 | ||
Bond Set/Reset as to HEATHER RHIANNON MORGAN - Defendant has posted bond, release issued. (ztg) [1:22-mj-00022-RMM] | ||
34 | 34
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, February 28, 2022 | ||
ORAL MOTION for Speedy Trial Waiver by USA as to HEATHER RHIANNON MORGAN (2). (bb) [1:22-mj-00022-RMM] | ||
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather: VTC Initial Appearance as to HEATHER RHIANNON MORGAN (2) held on 2/28/2022. The Court advised the Government of its due process obligation under Rule 5(f). Oral motion by the Government for Speedy Trial Waiver as to HEATHER RHIANNON MORGAN (2) heard and granted. Time between 2/28/2022 and 3/25/2022 (25 days) shall be excluded from calculation under the Speedy Trial Act in the interest of justice (X-T). Status Hearing set for 3/25/2022 at 03:00 PM in Telephonic/VTC before Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui. Bond Status of Defendant: Defendant remains on personal recognizance; Court Reporter: FTR- Gold FTR Time Frame: CTRM 7 [1:34:06-2:21-10];Defense Attorney: Samson Enzer, Nola Heller, Marshall Miller; US Attorney: Christopher Brown, Catherine Pelker, Jessica Peck; Pretrial Officer: Shay Holman; (bb) [1:22-mj-00022-RMM] | ||
36 | 36
![]() |
|
37 | 37
![]() |
|
Tuesday, March 01, 2022 | ||
38 | 38
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Thursday, March 03, 2022 | ||
39 | 39
![]() |
|
Monday, March 21, 2022 | ||
40 | 40
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, March 22, 2022 | ||
41 | 41
![]() |
|
Thursday, April 07, 2022 | ||
42 | 42
![]() |
|
43 | 43
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, April 08, 2022 | ||
44 | 44
![]() |
|
45 | 45
![]() |
|
Thursday, April 28, 2022 | ||
46 | 46
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, April 29, 2022 | ||
47 | 47
![]() |
|
Tuesday, May 03, 2022 | ||
48 | 48
![]() |
|
Monday, May 30, 2022 | ||
49 | 49
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, June 01, 2022 | ||
51 | 51
![]() |
|
Friday, July 15, 2022 | ||
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) as to HEATHER RHIANNON MORGAN, GRANTING defendant's52 Motion to Clarify. Defendant's Conditions of Release permit defendant HEATHER RHIANNON MORGAN to receive employment income in excess of $10,000 per month. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 15, 2022. (lcbah1) [1:22-mj-00022-RMM] | ||
52 | 52
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, July 29, 2022 | ||
53 | 53
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, August 01, 2022 | ||
56 | 56
![]() |
|
Wednesday, September 07, 2022 | ||
59 | 59
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, September 12, 2022 | ||
60 | 60
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, September 13, 2022 | ||
61 | 61
![]() |
|
Wednesday, September 14, 2022 | ||
Set/Reset Hearings as to ILYA LICHTENSTEIN (1) and HEATHER RHIANNON MORGAN (2): (UPDATING JUDGE ONLY) Status/Preliminary Hearing set for 9/30/2022 at 1:00 PM by Telephonic/VTC before Magistrate Judge Moxila A. Upadhyaya. (zcll) [1:22-mj-00022-RMM] | ||
Thursday, September 15, 2022 | ||
62 | 62
![]() |
|
Monday, September 26, 2022 | ||
63 | 63
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, September 28, 2022 | ||
64 | 64
![]() |
|
Tuesday, October 04, 2022 | ||
65 | 65
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Thursday, November 10, 2022 | ||
66 | 66
![]() |
|
Wednesday, November 16, 2022 | ||
67 | 67
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, November 18, 2022 | ||
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) granting the government's67 Consent Motion for Protective Order as to ILYA LICHTENSTEIN (1), HEATHER RHIANNON MORGAN (2). Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 18, 2022. (lcbah1) [1:22-mj-00022-RMM] | ||
68 | 68
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
69 | 69
![]() |
|
Monday, November 21, 2022 | ||
70 | 70
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, November 22, 2022 | ||
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) as to HEATHER RHIANNON MORGAN, GRANTING Defendant's70 Consent Motion to Modify Conditions of Release and MODIFYING Defendant's conditions of release as follows: Defendant may now have two specific devices with internet connectivity, to include a smartphone in addition to the device previously authorized under Defendant's original conditions of release, both of which will have computer monitoring software installed by Pretrial Services; it is FURTHER ORDERED that all other conditions of release imposed by the Court shall remain unchanged. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 22, 2022. (lcbah1) [1:22-mj-00022-RMM] | ||
Wednesday, November 23, 2022 | ||
71 | 71
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, November 28, 2022 | ||
73 | 73
![]() |
|
Wednesday, December 14, 2022 | ||
74 | 74
![]() |
|
Tuesday, January 17, 2023 | ||
76 | 76
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
77 | 77
![]() |
|
78 | 78
![]() |
|
79 | 79
![]() |
|
Tuesday, January 24, 2023 | ||
80 | 80
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, January 25, 2023 | ||
82 | 82
![]() |
|
Monday, March 27, 2023 | ||
83 | 83
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, March 28, 2023 | ||
84 | 84
![]() |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2023 | ||
85 | 85
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, May 26, 2023 | ||
86 | 86
![]() |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2023 | ||
87 | 87
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
88 | 88
![]() |
|
Thursday, July 20, 2023 | ||
89 | 89
![]() |