EXPERIOR GLOBAL WAREHOUSING, LLC et al v. BTC III HAMILTON DC LLC et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Robert Kirsch |
Referred: | J Brendan Day |
Case #: | 3:23-cv-08472 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Aug 23, 2023 |
Last checked: Monday Feb 19, 2024 5:14 AM EST |
Defendant
ARES MANAGEMENT, LLC
1200 17th Street Suite 2900
Denver, CO 80202 |
|
Defendant
BLACKCREEK GROUP, LLC
301 Route 17 North Suite 206
Rutherford, NJ 07070 |
|
Defendant
BTC III HAMILTON DC LLC
1200 17th Street Suite 2900
Denver, CO 80202 |
Represented By
|
Notice Only
PHV DONALD W. DEVITT
|
|
Notice Only
PHV ANDREW F. MARQUIS
|
|
Plaintiff
EXPERIOR GLOBAL WAREHOUSING, LLC
12161 S. Central Avenue
Alsip, IL 60803 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LYNX HOLDINGS, LLC
12161 S. Central Avenue Suite A
Alsip, IL 60803 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/15/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
79 | 79
order
Text Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Tue 08/20 11:17 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a telephone status conference on 9/23/2024 at 3:30 p.m.; dial-in information will be provided to counsel. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day on 8/20/2024. (cry) |
|
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
minutes
Status Conference
Tue 08/20 11:14 AM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day: Status Conference held on 8/19/2024. (cry) |