County of Moore v. The 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-04184 |
Nature of Suit | 245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Aug 22, 2023 |
Case in other court: | North Carolina Middle, 1:23-cv-00636 |
Last checked: Sunday Feb 18, 2024 4:26 AM EST |
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
The 3M Company
|
|
Defendant
Raytheon Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Defendant
EI Dupont De Nemours & Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
John Doe Defendants 1-49
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma Management LLC
Archroma Management LLC 4000 Monroe Rd.
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
AGC Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
County Of Moore
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 07/09 7:20 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by 3M Company, The.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Bulger, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Friday, May 17, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 05/17 8:53 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Kathleen Borland, City of Eau Claire, City of Scottsdale, City of Coral Springs, City of Plant City, City of South Gate, City of Monroe, City of Ruston, City of Natchitoches, County Of Moore, City of Prescott, Sewerage and Water Board of New Orleans, California Water Service Company, City of Shreveport, Connecticut Water Company, South Adams County Water and Sanitation District, City of San Jose California, City of Benwood, City of Lake Charles, City of Burbank, City of Adelanto, City of Plantation, County of San Joaquin, City of Watertown, City of Mansfield, Town of Prescott Valley, City of Loxley, Immokalee Water & Sewer District, Sacramento County, City of Fairborn, Alameda County Water District, City of Lathrop, City of Zephyrhills, City of Pompano Beach, City of Clovis, Howard County Maryland, Pasco County, City of Toledo.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Summy, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope A | ||
Wednesday, August 30, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
service
Summons Issued
Wed 08/30 3:44 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
Wednesday, August 23, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Wed 08/23 4:12 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: North Carolina Middle (associated as of 8/22/2023), 1:23-cv-00636, County of Moore v. The 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-04184-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
13 | 13
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Wed 08/23 4:02 PM
Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Middle; Case Number 1:23-cv-00636. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Monday, August 21, 2023 | ||
12 | 12 MDL TRANSFER LETTER to individual court and counsel of record re: Conditional Transfer Order transferring this action to District of South Carolina. (Monroe, Brooke) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 8/23/2023.] | |
11 | 11 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-147) Re: MDL 2873 transferring this action to the District of South Carolina for the reasons stated in the order of December 7, 2018. Received and filed on August 21, 2023. (Monroe, Brooke) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 8/23/2023.] | |
Monday, August 14, 2023 | ||
10 | 10 ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 08/14/2023, that the Consent Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint [Doc. #9 ] is hereby GRANTED, and that if this action is transferred to the In re Aqueous Film-Forming Foam Products multidistrict litigation ("AFFF MDL"), then the deadlines for all Defendants to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint shall be in accordance with the established rules and procedures in the AFFF MDL. Should the Judicial Panel on the Multidistrict Litigation ("JPML") decline to transfer this action to the AFFF MDL, Defendants shall have through and including the 28th day after such disposition by the JPML to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint. (Monroe, Brooke) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 8/23/2023.] | |
Wednesday, August 09, 2023 | ||
Motion Submitted to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR., re:9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re5 Complaint. (Daniel, J) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 8/23/2023.] | ||
Motions No Longer Submitted to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR., re:9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re5 Complaint. (Daniel, J) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 8/23/2023.] | ||
Motion Referred MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE re:9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re5 Complaint. (Daniel, J) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 8/23/2023.] | ||
Monday, August 07, 2023 | ||
9 | 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re5 Complaint by CHEMGUARD, INC., TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP.(BLAKE, CHRISTOPHER) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 8/23/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, August 02, 2023 | ||
8 | 8 Notice of Right to Consent.(Bowers, Alexis) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 8/23/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Consent Form | ||
Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Bowers, Alexis) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 8/23/2023.] | ||
Tuesday, August 01, 2023 | ||
6 | 6 Summons Issued as to TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP. (State Court document originally filed in Moore County Superior Court, case number 23CVS892, issued 6/22/2023, filed at Exhibit A to1 Petition for Removal) (Garland, Leah) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 8/23/2023.] | |
5 | 5 COMPLAINT and JURY DEMAND against All Defendants, filed by COUNTY OF MOORE. (State Court document original filed in Moore Count Superior Court, case number 23CVS892, filed at Exhibit A to1 Petition for Removal) (Garland, Leah) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 8/23/2023.] | |
Monday, July 31, 2023 | ||
4 | 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent JOHNSON CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL PLC for TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP.. (BLAKE, CHRISTOPHER) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 8/23/2023.] | |
3 | 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent JOHNSON CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL PLC for CHEMGUARD, INC... (BLAKE, CHRISTOPHER) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 8/23/2023.] | |
2 | 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney CHRISTOPHER J. BLAKE on behalf of Defendants CHEMGUARD, INC., TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP (BLAKE, CHRISTOPHER) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 8/23/2023.] | |
1 | 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL against COUNTY OF MOORE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCMDC-3619294.), filed by TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP, CHEMGUARD, INC..(BLAKE, CHRISTOPHER) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 8/23/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Moore County 23-CVS-892, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |