City of Coral Springs v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-04185 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Aug 22, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Florida Southern, 0:23-cv-61371 |
Last checked: Sunday Feb 18, 2024 4:27 AM EST |
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Fire Products GP Holding LLC
|
|
Defendant
John Doe Defendants 1-49
|
|
Defendant
Johnson Controls International plc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Raytheon Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals Incorporated
Agent Schok K. Moza 12321 Hatcherville
Baytown, TX 77520 |
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Central Sprinkler LLC
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma Management LLC
Archroma Management LLC 4000 Monroe Rd.
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Angus International Safety Group LTD
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Plaintiff
City of Coral Springs
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 07/09 7:20 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by 3M Company, The.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Bulger, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Friday, May 17, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 05/17 8:53 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Kathleen Borland, City of Eau Claire, City of Scottsdale, City of Coral Springs, City of Plant City, City of South Gate, City of Monroe, City of Ruston, City of Natchitoches, County Of Moore, City of Prescott, Sewerage and Water Board of New Orleans, California Water Service Company, City of Shreveport, Connecticut Water Company, South Adams County Water and Sanitation District, City of San Jose California, City of Benwood, City of Lake Charles, City of Burbank, City of Adelanto, City of Plantation, County of San Joaquin, City of Watertown, City of Mansfield, Town of Prescott Valley, City of Loxley, Immokalee Water & Sewer District, Sacramento County, City of Fairborn, Alameda County Water District, City of Lathrop, City of Zephyrhills, City of Pompano Beach, City of Clovis, Howard County Maryland, Pasco County, City of Toledo.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Summy, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope A | ||
Wednesday, August 30, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
service
Summons Issued
Wed 08/30 4:10 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
Thursday, August 24, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 08/24 1:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Cary L McDougal on behalf of City of Coral Springs Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-04185-RMG(McDougal, Cary) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 08/24 1:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Carla Burke Pickrel on behalf of City of Coral Springs Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-04185-RMG(Burke Pickrel, Carla) |
|
Wednesday, August 23, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Wed 08/23 4:34 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Florida Southern (associated as of 8/22/2023), 0:23-cv-61371, City of Coral Springs v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-04185-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
11 | 11
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Wed 08/23 4:30 PM
Case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 0:23-cv-61371. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Monday, August 21, 2023 | ||
10 | 10 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-146) transferring case to the District of South Carolina re: MDL 18-mn-2873 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Richard M. Gergel. (Signed by Tiffaney D. Pete). (jas) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/23/2023.] | |
9 | 9 Courtesy copy of CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-146) transferring case to the District of South Carolina re: MDL 18-mn-2873 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Richard M. Gergel. (Signed by Tiffaney D. Pete). (Awaiting certified copy from the transferee court). (jas) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/23/2023.] | |
8 | 8 Courtesy copy of CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-146) transferring case to the District of South Carolina re: MDL 18-mn-2873 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Richard M. Gergel. (Signed by Tiffaney D. Pete). (Awaiting certified copy from the transferee court). (jas) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/23/2023.] | |
Civil Case Closed per DE#10 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-146) transferring case to the District of South Carolina re: MDL 18-mn-2873 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Richard M. Gergel. (jas) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/23/2023.] | ||
Monday, July 31, 2023 | ||
7 | 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part and denying in part5 Defendants Tyco Fire Products LP and Chemguard, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendants Tyco Fire Products LP and Chemguard, Inc. shall file a response to the Complaint by August 31, 2023 . Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 7/31/2023. (cbn) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/23/2023.] | |
Tuesday, July 25, 2023 | ||
6 | 6 Clerk's Notice to Filer re5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint re1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),. Filer Selected the Wrong Motion Relief(s) ; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/23/2023.] | |
Monday, July 24, 2023 | ||
5 | 5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP. Responses due by 8/7/2023 (Sloan, Michael) Modified Relief on 7/25/2023 (ls).[Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/23/2023.] | |
4 | 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls International PLC for Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP(Sloan, Michael) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/23/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Friday, July 21, 2023 | ||
3 | 3 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, Certificates of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statements. Joint Scheduling Report due by 8/25/2023. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 7/21/2023. See attached document for full details. (ls) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/23/2023.] | |
Tuesday, July 18, 2023 | ||
2 | 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (pc) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/23/2023.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Plaintiff's Original Complaint) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16773710, filed by Tyco Fire Products LP, Chemguard, Inc..(Sloan, Michael) (Complaint see Exh. 1, No Answer/Motion to Dismiss filed) Modified text on 7/19/2023 (pc). [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/23/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit State Court Documents, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet |