State of New Mexico, ex rel. et al v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-04187 |
Nature of Suit | 240 Real Property - Torts to Land |
Cause | 28:1442 Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Aug 22, 2023 |
Case in other court: | New Mexico, 1:23-cv-00623 |
Last checked: Sunday Feb 18, 2024 4:27 AM EST |
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Defendant
EIDP Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Fire & Security Americas Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
ABC Corporations 1-10
|
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
New Mexico Environment Department
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of New Mexico, ex rel.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Raul Torrez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, August 15, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 08/15 4:24 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by State of New Mexico, ex rel. as to Amerex Corporation Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-04187-RMG(Barks, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, September 29, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 09/29 2:52 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie D. Biehl on behalf of State of New Mexico, ex rel. (Biehl, Stephanie) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 09/29 2:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley B Campbell on behalf of State of New Mexico, ex rel. (Campbell, Ashley) |
|
Thursday, September 07, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
service
Certificate of Service
Thu 09/07 11:35 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State of New Mexico, ex rel.(Barks, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, August 23, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Wed 08/23 5:23 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New Mexico (associated as of 8/22/2023), 1:23-cv-00623, State of New Mexico, ex rel. et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-04187-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
10 | 10
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Wed 08/23 5:21 PM
Case transferred in from District of New Mexico; Case Number 1:23-cv-00623. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Monday, August 21, 2023 | ||
9 | 9 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-146) by JPML (certified copy) transferring this matter to the United States District Court for the District of South Carolina for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1407; assigned to the Honorable Richard M. Gergel (MDL 2873). (kg) [Transferred from New Mexico on 8/23/2023.] | |
Friday, August 04, 2023 | ||
8 | 8 ORDER FINDING GOOD CAUSE TO DELAY ENTRY OF SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(b)(2), the Court FINDS good cause to delay entering a scheduling order at this time in light of Defendant 3M Company's stated intent to seek transfer of the instant case to pending multidistrict litigation (Doc. 6 at 2) and the conditional transfer order entered in the multidistrict litigation on August 2, 2023. [ THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED. ] (kmt) [Transferred from New Mexico on 8/23/2023.] | |
Thursday, August 03, 2023 | ||
7 | 7 ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR STAY OF RESPONSIVE PLEADING DEADLINE by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. (kmt) [Transferred from New Mexico on 8/23/2023.] | |
6 | 6 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Responsive Pleading Deadline by 3M Company. (Heitz, Amanda) [Transferred from New Mexico on 8/23/2023.] | |
Wednesday, July 26, 2023 | ||
5 | 5 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number ANMDC-8932696 (fs) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [Transferred from New Mexico on 8/23/2023.] | |
4 | 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jennifer M. Rozzoni to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg) [Transferred from New Mexico on 8/23/2023.] | |
3 | 3 NOTICE by 3M Company re1 Notice of Removal, Notification of Multidistrict Litigation (Heitz, Amanda) [Transferred from New Mexico on 8/23/2023.] | |
2 | 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by 3M Company (Heitz, Amanda) [Transferred from New Mexico on 8/23/2023.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M Company Tyco Fire Products LP and Chemguard, Inc. from First Judicial District Court County of Santa Fe, case number D-101-CV-202301158. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by 3M Company.(Heitz, Amanda) [Transferred from New Mexico on 8/23/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 | ||
United States Magistrate Judge Jennifer M. Rozzoni and United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (jg) [Transferred from New Mexico on 8/23/2023.] |