California Northern District Court
Judge:P Casey Pitts
Case #: 5:23-cv-04417
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Aug 25, 2023
Terminated:Sep 27, 2023
Case in other court:Superior Court of the State of California, 23CV418028
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 21, 2024 12:24 AM PST
Defendant
Varian Medical Systems, Inc.
Represented By
Robert James Wilger
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Alec Scott DiMario
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Alejandro Contreras
Represented By
Randall Edward Strauss
Gwilliam, Ivary, Chiosso, Cavalli And Brewer
contact info
Plaintiff
Anthony Magallanes
Represented By
Randall Edward Strauss
Gwilliam, Ivary, Chiosso, Cavalli And Brewer
contact info

GPO Sep 27 2023
ORDER REMANDING CASE. Signed by Judge P. Casey Pitts on 9/27/2023. (nmc, COURT USER) (Filed on 9/27/2023)

Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, December 04, 2023
16 16 misc Receipt Tue 12/05 4:45 PM
Acknowledgment of Receipt from Santa Clara County Superior Court. (gba, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2023
15 15 utility Remark Mon 11/06 10:11 PM
Certified copy of14 Remand Order and Docket Sheet sent to Santa Clara County Superior Court. (gba, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
14 14 2 pgs order Order Remanding Case Wed 09/27 4:59 PM
ORDER REMANDING CASE. Signed by Judge P. Casey Pitts on 9/27/2023. (nmc, COURT USER)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Proposed Order Wed 09/27 3:24 PM
Proposed Order re10 Stipulation Regarding Remand by Alejandro Contreras, Anthony Magallanes. (Strauss, Randall)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
12 12 30+ pgs order Order on Stipulation Mon 09/18 2:06 PM
ORDER granting 11 Stipulation Allowing Plaintiffs to File the First Amended Complaint for Damages. Signed by Judge P. Casey Pitts on 9/18/2023. (nmc, COURT USER)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
11 11 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 09/12 4:07 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Allowing Plaintiffs to File the First Amended Complaint for Damages filed by Alejandro Contreras, Anthony Magallanes.(Strauss, Randall)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
10 10 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Tue 09/12 4:00 PM
STIPULATION for Remand filed by Alejandro Contreras, Anthony Magallanes. (Strauss, Randall)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 08, 2023
9 9 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Fri 09/08 2:51 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Adjusting Deadline and CMC Time. Reset Deadlines as to Case Management Statement due by 11/16/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/30/2023 at 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (nmc, COURT USER)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 06, 2023
8 8 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Wed 09/06 3:07 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See [LINK:General Order 71] . Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 11/23/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/30/2023 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor. (gba, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 05, 2023
7 7 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 09/05 8:44 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge P. Casey Pitts for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen no longer assigned to case, except for discovery purposes. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.(sfb, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
Thursday, August 31, 2023
6 6 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Thu 08/31 3:36 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (jhf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Thu 08/31 1:39 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Varian Medical Systems, Inc... (Wilger, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Tue 08/29 10:18 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/12/2023. (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 28, 2023
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 08/28 5:22 PM
Civil Cover Sheet by Varian Medical Systems, Inc. . (Wilger, Robert)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Mon 08/28 11:19 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] .Use Current Civil Cover Sheet from our website. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover SheetThis filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re:1 Notice of Removal,,, filed by Varian Medical Systems, Inc. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 25, 2023
2 2 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Fri 08/25 5:37 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Varian Medical Systems, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Siemens Healthineers Holding IV B.V. for Varian Medical Systems, Inc.. re1 Notice of Removal,,, (Wilger, Robert)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 08/25 5:31 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California. Their case number is 23CV418028. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-18587908). Filed byVarian Medical Systems, Inc..(Wilger, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration OF ALEC DIMARIO IN SUPPORT OF CIVIL ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT ON THE BASIS OF FEDERAL QUESTION BY DEFENDANT VARIAN MEDICAL SYSTEM INC.,
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Declaration OF ALEC DIMARIO IN SUPPORT OF CIVIL ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT ON THE BASIS OF FEDERAL QUESTION BY DEFENDANT VARIAN MEDICAL SYSTEM INC.,
Att: 3 Declaration of MICHELLE WILLMORE IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR REMOVAL OF STATE CIVIL ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT ON THE BASIS OF FEDERAL QUESTION BY DEFENDANT VARIAN MEDICAL SYSTEM INC.,
Att: 4 Exhibit A to Declaration of MICHELLE WILLMORE IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR REMOVAL OF STATE CIVIL ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT ON THE BASIS OF FEDERAL QUESTION BY DEFENDANT VARIAN MEDICAL SYSTEM INC.,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet
respoth Answer to Removal Complaint Wed 09/06 2:58 PM
Answer to Removed Complaint (See Doc No.1 -2) by Varian Medical Systems, Inc. (gba, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]