Anson County v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-04189 |
Nature of Suit | 245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Aug 22, 2023 |
Case in other court: | North Carolina Western, 3:23-cv-00426 |
Last checked: Sunday Feb 18, 2024 4:28 AM EST |
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
The Ansul Company
141 Junny Road
Angier, NC 27501 |
|
Defendant
Raytheon Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Defendant
EI Dupont De Nemours & Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Doe Defendants, 1-49
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Protection Co.
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma Management LLC
Archroma Management LLC 4000 Monroe Rd.
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Angus Fire
|
|
Defendant
AGC Inc
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Anson County
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 07/17 3:06 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by The 3M Company, 3M Company, The, 3M Company, 3M Company, 3M Company, 3M Company, 3M Company, 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co.). Associated Cases)Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Bulger, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Wednesday, September 06, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued
Wed 09/06 10:14 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
Friday, August 25, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Fri 08/25 2:22 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: North Carolina Western (associated as of 8/22/2023), 3:23-cv-00426, Anson County v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-04189-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
7 | 7
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Fri 08/25 2:17 PM
Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Western; Case Number 3:23-cv-00426. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Tuesday, August 22, 2023 | ||
6 | 6 Transfer Order of Judicial Panel MDL transferring case to District of South Carolina, MDL# 2873. Matter transferred for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. (rth) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/25/2023.] | |
Tuesday, July 25, 2023 | ||
5 | 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re:1 Notice of Removal, by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP. (Blake, Christopher). Motions referred to Susan C. Rodriguez. [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/25/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: 1 Notice of Removal. In the event transfer is denied by the Judicial Panel on the Multidistrict Litigation (JPML), Defendants Tyco Fire Products, LP and Chemguard, Inc.'s answer will be due 28 days following that denial. So Ordered. Entered by US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez on 7/25/2023. (DLG) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/25/2023.] | ||
Monday, July 17, 2023 | ||
4 | 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tyco Fire Products, LP. (Blake, Christopher) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/25/2023.] | |
3 | 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chemguard, Inc.. (Blake, Christopher) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/25/2023.] | |
2 | 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J. Blake on behalf of Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP (Blake, Christopher) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/25/2023.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Anson County Superior Court, case number 23-CVS-269. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-6145269), filed by Tyco Fire Products, LP, Chemguard, Inc..(Blake, Christopher) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/25/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Anson County complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Cover Sheet | ||
Case assigned to Senior District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the[LINK:Case Assignment Packet] . This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (jm) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/25/2023.] |