Brown et al v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-04190 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1442 Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Aug 22, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Alabama Northern, 2:23-cv-00906 |
Last checked: Sunday Feb 18, 2024 4:29 AM EST |
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
Allstar Fire Equipment
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corp
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Fire-Dex LLC
780 Progress Dr.
Medina, OH 44256 |
|
Defendant
Globe Manufacturing Company LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Honeywell Safety Products USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Defendant
Lion Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
Mallory Safety and Supply LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Municipal Emergency Services Inc
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
PBI Performance Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Southern Mills Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Stedfast USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
as Successor-inteests to The Ansul Company One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
W L Gore & Associates Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
David Daniel Ackman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Acosta
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Adams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven Aliseo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Larry L Amstead
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roman Anderson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephen M Anderson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dale Andrea
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Antley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andrew Arce
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Arnold
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andrew S Ashby
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary Igor Asnis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ivan Atkins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Justin Avery
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Guadalupe Z Azocar
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew Babbit
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jack Badger
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edward Andrew Ballas, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Arthur Bantle
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wayne Barcomb
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nestor Bariuan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edward L Barnes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Glenn E Barnes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Baskis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wayne Batts
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Beaver
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Beavers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Duane Beerbower
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dale Benest
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Berlanga
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tim Bettendorf
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Douglas Bird
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Duane R Bires
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Blalock
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Russell Blood
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Lee Bogo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Bongerz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Bonkowski
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edward Bosman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Peter Botto
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph C Bowley, IV
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Braun
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joshua Bright
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Britt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Patrick Brogan, III
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Bronaugh
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George Michael Brooks
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Barrett Brown
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Brown
278134 Lieber Correctional Institution PO Box 205
Ridgeville, SC 29472 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles D Brown
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hershel Brown
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jerry Brown
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jim Brune
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael L Bryson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard B Buck
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John W Buehler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Buentiempo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lavon Bunch
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eric Burbank
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Burch
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Burks
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Burns
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jerome David Burris
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Derek Burton, Sr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Williams Burton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vinson Butler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George Cahill
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffrey Michael Calhoun
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gregory David Capes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas M Cardno
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott Cameron Carl
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Carlisle
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Carney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dennis Carr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gregory Carter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Carter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dougs Cassidy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Castandeda
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jose Castro
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Burtis Caudill
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Centanni
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Chaires
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joel Chantry
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ruben Chavez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Salvatore Chines
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Christlieb
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bryan Chvarak
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michiel Cidebaca
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pasquale Cinotti
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George Clark
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dennis Claytor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patrick Click
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Cline
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bartney Coats
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michelle Cohen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maynard Coleman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew B Colmorgen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robin Compton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Lewis Condon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Francis X Connor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jerry Conrad
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Luke Cook
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Cooks
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carrie Shuster Corbitt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David M Cordova
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dennis Cox
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott Creek
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Crider
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jerry Croom
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Cross
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joshua Cuetara
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Clifford Cummings
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Don Cunningham
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Cutino
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Czaplicki
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Orrin L Daniel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Willie Daniels
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bradley Darger
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul Dascenzi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Craig Davies
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donald R Davis
141736 Evans Correctional Institution 610 Highway 9 West
Bennettsville, SC 29512 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gilbert A Davis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew Davis
00270-131 Federal Correctional Institution Duke Unit Post Office Box 1000
Butner, NC 27509 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Davis
Georgetown County Detention Center 2394 Browns Ferry Road
Georgetown, SC 29440 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeremy Dean
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Deason
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Xavier Dehoyos
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Billy Delee
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Glenn Dellatacoma
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Zulim
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
Douglas Bedient
Terminated: 01/18/2024
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Warren Blackwell
Terminated: 01/18/2024
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 09/03 12:19 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kenneth Charles Shaw Et al., Norman Knight, Joe Lafrance, Murl McMillion, LESLI LANDERER, LEONARD JAY MCINTIRE, Hershel Brown, Vinson Butler, Jerry Croom, Christopher Burris Et al., Thomas Thomas, Kenneth Williams, Ronald Eugene Wilson, Christopher Allen Barnes Et al., Jesse Myrick, Eduardo Borela, John Borodkin, Joseph Bowman, Arceal Butler, Sr, Kevin D Cagle, Carlos Caseres, Brian Daniels, Dale Davis, Larry Beemer Et al., James Rozier, Ronald Shockley, RICHARD GLENN DETAMBLE, MICHAEL GALLAGHER, Thomas Martin Et al., Larry German Et al. George Robert Bartlett, Sr. as to German, et al; Perry William Clark as to German, et al; Timothy Aaron Jones as to German, et al; Richard James Chappuis as to Martin, et al; Alan Mark Cosgrove as to Martin, et al; Eugene Perry Forte as to Martin, et al; Christopher William Manfredi as to Martin, et al; Patrick K. McCarthy as to Martin, et al; Alward Fuller Rhew as to Martin, et al; Bruce Swanson as to Martin, et al; Scott Richard Trudell as to Martin, et al; Timothy Paul Nandy as to Shaw, et al; Michael Carl Smith as to Shaw, et al; Larry Warren as to Shaw, et al; Cornelius Wesley as to Shaw, et al; James K. Barnes as to Barnes, et al; Thomas J. Beaudette as to Barnes, et al; Lloyd Nolan Crawford as to Barnes, et al; Kevin Jay Reichert as to Barnes, et al; Richard Thomas Riehle as to Barnes, et al; Michael David Shelton as to Barnes, et al; James Thomas Lane as to Beemer, et al; Michael David Paulette as to Beemer, et al; Rossten Edgar Stroude as to Beemer, et al; Robbie Dotson as to Burris, et al; William Riddock; Of Particular Personal Injury Claims WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
31 | 31
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 09/03 10:51 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Milton Ray Brees, Richard Eric Burks, Edward James Butler, John Robert Cahill, Paul W Callahan, William Cardinal, Stanley William Goglia, Jr, Jose Miguel Gonzalez, Craig Michael Gotham, Ronald James Hawley, George Loushe Hayes, Michael Ivy, John Bryan Keegan, Larry Michael Lisowski, Joseph Arthur Gutierrez, Knud Andres Knudson, Delas Joseph Lancelin, Kevin McGavock, Jan Stewart Goldberg, David Daniel Ackman, Michael Bongerz, Walter Marsh, Michael Paul Harnett, Lawrence Gilmore Hutchinson, Roger Lee Kile, Jeffrey Lynn King, Sr, Richard Dale Kohl, Jr, Andrew Anderson Et al., Bryan Keith Hinson, William W James, Jr, Richard Martinez, Gerald Halli, Joseph George Hudeck, Jr, Lorenzo Hutchins, Phillip A Johnston, Micah Kroll, Nick L McAlpine, Leon W Henderson, James Ivy Johnson, Gregory Kevin Martin, Ronald Charles Green, Michael Joseph, Robert Kinsey, Ronnie Lanthrip, Timothy James Massaro Michael Monroe Carver as to Anderson, et al; Julian Favela, Jr. as to Anderson, et al; Gregory Djuan Jones as to Anderson, et al; Paul Anthony Kresta as to Anderson, et al; Michael Lynn Owens as to Anderson, et al; Stephen Richardson as to Anderson, et al; Of Particular Personal Injury Claims WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 08/14 10:13 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Richard Allan Banks, DONN JOHNSON, BILLY LIPPSE, GREGORY LOGAN, JOHN MANNING, DENNIS MCENTYRE, LOUIS MCLELLAN, SR, MICHAEL MENGEL, AUSTIN MILLER, Doug Morgan, Ronald Lee Bogo, George Michael Brooks, Brian Burks, Jose Castro, Maynard Coleman, James Cutino, Michael P Sprinkle, William St. Claire, Sr, Albert A Stone, Brian P Szwec, Donald Vessey, Lee Vetsch, Archie Walker, Collie Washington, Ronald Williams, Rex Alan Wilson, James Wunderlich, Kimberly Wyttenberg, David Lee Lineberger, Edward Earl Johnson, Stuart Mahaffey, David Wayne Muckerheide, Kingsley Washington Nelson, James O'Brien, Victor Orvis, William Partain, Richard J Peck, Terry Peters, Octavio Plascencia, GORDON SCOTT ELLIS, SR, CHARLES ESPY, ANDY GRANDERSON, GLENN G GRAVES, DAVID GUTIERREZ, KIRK HEYEN, JOHN HOCHMUTH, LLOYD HOFFMAN; WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 07/30 7:47 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Steed Myles, Ben Neiden, Victor Nickoli, Gregory Norris, David Jay Nunn, Craig Nystrom, Frank O'Grady, Thomas O'Meara, Kenneth Orr, Walter R Overstreet, Jr, Marcelino Pajarillo, Corey Robert Palmer, Dale H Patterson, Douglas W Perry, Bradley Peterson, Daniel Arthur Peterson, Robert E Phillips, Adam Plissey, Steve Victor Portillo, Jerry Price, Ellery Ragas, Stuart E Ragnone, Joseph Patrick Brogan, III, Richard Bronaugh, Charles Brown, Charles D Brown, John W Buehler, James Buentiempo, Lavon Bunch, Eric Burbank, Williams Burton, George Cahill, Jeffrey Michael Calhoun, Scott Cameron Carl, James Carney, Mark Carter, Robert Centanni, David Chaires, Michiel Cidebaca, Pasquale Cinotti, Bartney Coats, Matthew B Colmorgen, John Lewis Condon, Jerry Conrad, Luke Cook, David M Cordova, Scott Creek, Clifford Cummings, Kevin Czaplicki, Robert Davis WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-04190-RMG, 2:23-cv-04191-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 07/29 11:02 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Islaam Amin, Robert Anthony, Willie R Braxton, John P Brinkley, Jr, Herbert Lawrence Broughton, Jr, Dean Bruch, Bradley Buhr, Salvatore A D Burrello, James Burris, Keith Bursey, Clarence Bynes, Jr, William Campbell, Richard Acosta, John Adams, Steven Aliseo, Dale Andrea, Andrew Arce, Robert Arnold, Andrew S Ashby, Guadalupe Z Azocar, Edward L Barnes, Wayne Batts, John Beavers, David Berlanga, Tim Bettendorf, Duane R Bires, Charles Blalock, James Braun, Kenneth Britt, Thomas Johnson, John M Kershaw, Joseph Earl Knox, Gordon Koenig, Kevin Kovel, Devin Kurty, Temele Lane, Bocidar Licina, Carl G Liepmann, Fred Lincoln, Erik Lippincott, Stephen M Lobley, Brandon Lyles, Patrick Lyons, Brian Maas, Joseph Madden, John Marquez, Ken Marston, John Martel, Elmer Martin, Ricardo M Mattier WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-03304-RMG, 2:23-cv-03307-RMG, 2:23-cv-04190-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 07/18 9:16 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ROBERT JENNEY, PETER KROM, Don Knight, TONY LUCAS, Richard Legg, JOHN MCPOLIN, James Antley, James Cline, Dennis Cox, Xavier Dehoyos, Michael George Kerby, Rex Charles Lambert, Ronald Jack Lambert, Jr, David W Lester, Noel Manheimer, Kevin James Martin, Raymond Vadeboncoeur, Richard Wagner, William O Warnock, II, Gary Hanna Et al., James O'Donnell, Gregory Paxton, Richard M Reass, William Joseph Rios, Richard James Savidge, Scott Schroeder, Robert Leon Seago, Thomas Martin Et al., ROGER L. FULTZ, DAVID GREGURICH, Robert George, GREGORY HOLMES, Larry German Et al. Alton Brown as to German, et al; Anthony Dukes as to German, et al; Charles Wayne Fletcher as to German, et al; William Wesley Hagins as to German, et al; Charles David Hickman as to German, et al; Dana Hubbard as to German, et al; Daniel Johnson as to German, et al; Chil Ledford as to German, et al; Ronald Charles Maupin as to German, et al; James McTaggert as to German, et al; Louis H. Pauly as to German, et al; Jesse Randal Rodriguez as to German, et al; Walter Gerard Saverse as to German, et al; Scott Joseph Sweeney as to German, et al; Richard Wood as to German, et al; David Ray Yeager as to German, et al; Bernard Joseph Zielinski, Jr. as to German, et al; Gary Hanna as to Hanna, et al; Quarri A Anderson as to Martin, et al; Michael Bednorz, Jr. as to Martin, et al; WITHOUT PREJUDICEITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 07/17 10:33 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Neal Almond, William Rene Arnold, Loyd N Belgarde, Eric Mitchell Campbell, JAMES LEIGHTON KNICKERBOCKER, BRIAN KUTA, James Kilgore, NORVEL LAUHON, RICHARD LAWLESS, DENNIS A. LOUSHE, William Long, PAUL MAGANA, JOE MOREINO, Michael McNeil, Daniel Bonkowski, James Burns, Douglas Cassidy, Burtis Caudill, Tyrone Johnson, Wayne Jones, Edward Klein, Patrick Steven Leon, Alonzo Martinez, Thomas Spalding, Jr, William Stalvey, Reginald Maurice Thomas, Alvin Dwain Washington, Sr, Herbert R Weston, James Joseph Quirk, Joseph Gerard Rizzo, Beryl S Roberts, Jr, Paul Rosenbaum, William Mason Rush, Donald Williams Sabo, Jr, Daniel Pichardo, Casey Porter, Christopher Nathaniel Riley, Ronald Saferite, EDWARD FRENCH, ROBERT GERTH, STANLEY GILLCASH, Robert Gallo, David Gamble, GREGORY HAGANS, James Hammock, Terry Raymond McCall, Rashad McNulty, David Ronald Palumbo, Christopher David Posante, Jay Foster Dill WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) Modified to edit docket text (correct party last name Almond, also in 2:23-cv-03304-RMG; first name Douglas Cassidy, also in 2:23-cv-04190-RMG))on 7/17/2024 (sshe, ) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Monday, June 24, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 06/24 2:20 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by David Michael Alvarez, James Arena, III, Thomas John Arnold, Anthony Wayne Avanzato, Clifford Herbert Baker, Russell Scott Bennett, Stephen M Bennett, Quill Charles Berry, Jr, Robert Allen Bertram, Chris David Blackburn, Lori Kathleen Blackshear, Marshaun Jerome Blake, Sr, Alzina Marie Blanchard, Kevin Lee Bowling, William Michael Breeden, Sr, Gordon Lynn Bonner, James Stephen Boothby, David Michael Boragine, Christopher Mark Boyler, Michael Braddock, Kenneth William Brandes, Marlon L Brandon, William Anthony Branham, Bryan Ray Brewer, David Brigman, Jr, Randy James Brinson, Brady Don Brooke, Donald G Brooks, Cornelus Quintin Brown, David Earl Brown, Sr, Gary Michael Brown, James Gary Brown, Jeffrey Charles Brown, William Bergen Brown, Joseph Alexander Bruce, James Francis Brusco, Wayne Jennings Bryan, Richard Bulacan, Darold Eugene Bunce, Kevin Vance Burgess, William Thomas Burley, Mark Edward Burns, Robert Lee Bushong, Gerald Lawrance Button, LLoyd Carter Byrd, Florencio Villa Caballero, Charles Richard Cable, Joseph Eugene Caffey, Charles John Camarda, III, Orrin L Daniel WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-01240-RMG, 2:23-cv-03304-RMG, 2:23-cv-04190-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Thursday, June 06, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 06/06 3:56 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney James L. Stengel and Paige Pavone and to substitute in their place Joseph C. Orlet, Paul A. Calfo, and Dominique Savinelli by Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC. Response to Motion due by 6/20/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Tuesday, May 21, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 05/21 12:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by August J Matteis, Jr on behalf of Jerome David Burris, Matthew B Colmorgen, Michael Zulim(Matteis, August) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Tuesday, March 12, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 03/12 12:09 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company identifying Corporate Parent Sag Main Holding, LLC, Other Affiliate R&Q Insurance Holdings Ltd., Other Affiliate Obra Capital, Inc. for Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
21 | 21
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 03/12 11:06 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Global Manufacturing Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent MSA Safety Inc. for Global Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Monday, March 11, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 03/11 6:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 03/11 5:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Global Manufacturing Company LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Wednesday, February 28, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 02/28 12:18 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Don Cunningham WITHOUT PREJUDICE Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-04190-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Friday, February 09, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 02/09 10:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige) |
|
Monday, February 05, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 02/05 6:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Global Manufacturing Company LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige) |
|
Thursday, January 18, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 01/18 1:02 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Warren Blackwell WITHOUT PREJUDICE Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-04190-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 01/18 12:45 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Douglas Bedient WITHOUT PREJUDICE Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-04190-RMG(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Friday, October 13, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
Fri 10/13 6:34 PM
TEXT ORDER This Order Relates to Case Nos. et al. (as listed in the motion). The motion to substitute counsel of record (Dkt. No. 3719 in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.) is denied without prejudice. Counsel therein is not in fact attempting to "substitute" existing counsel in any given action for new counsel. Rather it appears counsel is attempting to make an appearance in various actions currently consolidated for pretrial proceedings before this Court. Counsel is directed to CMO 1 (Dkt. No. 3 at 3) (noting that counsel who appeared in the transferor district court prior to transfer need not enter a separate appearance or apply to proceed pro hac vice). To the extent counsel desires to file a notice of appearance related to the matters for which it seeks "substitution," it may do so. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 10/13/2023.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
|
Friday, September 22, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Substitute Attorney
Fri 09/22 1:56 AM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney by PBI Performance Products Inc. Response to Motion due by 10/6/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Van Zandt, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Substitution of Attorney | ||
Friday, August 25, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Fri 08/25 2:31 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Alabama Northern (associated as of 8/22/2023), 2:23-cv-00906, Brown et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-04190-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
7 | 7
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Fri 08/25 2:27 PM
Case transferred in from District of Alabama Northern; Case Number 2:23-cv-00906. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Tuesday, August 22, 2023 | ||
6 | 6 ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of South Carolina for inclusion in MDL 2873; record electronically transferred to Clerk of Court in District of South Carolina. (KAM) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 8/25/2023.] | |
Thursday, August 10, 2023 | ||
5 | 5 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 8/10/23. (SAC) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 8/25/2023.] | |
Thursday, July 13, 2023 | ||
4 | 4 TEXT ORDER granting Defendant 3M Company's3 unopposed motion for an extension of the time to file a responsive pleading until either the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("JPML") transfers this action or until twenty-eight days after the JPML declines to transfer the action. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 7/13/2023. (KSS) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 8/25/2023.] | |
Wednesday, July 12, 2023 | ||
3 | 3 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Notice of Removal by 3M Company. (Radney, W) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 8/25/2023.] | |
2 | 2 NOTICE of Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by 3M Company. (KSS) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 8/25/2023.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M Company from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 01-CV-2023-901983.00.(KSS) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 8/25/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number AALNDC-4381430. related document1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M Company from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 01-CV-2023-901983.00.(KSS). (Radney, W) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 8/25/2023.] |