Yacub et al v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-04227 |
Nature of Suit | 245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Aug 23, 2023 |
Case in other court: | New York Southern, 1:23-cv-06786 |
Last checked: Monday Feb 19, 2024 4:02 AM EST |
Defendant
3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co.)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
as successor in interest to The Ansul Company One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
as successor in interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise 1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Doe Defendants 1- 20
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
as successor in interest to Sandoz Chemical Corporation 4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Fire & Security Corporation, f/k/a UTC Fire & Security Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Fire & Security Americas Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Plaintiff
Amy Yacub
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Veronica Vasquez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kalijah Vasquez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Belinda Rockafellow
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Valicitee Hernandez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sam Hernandez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mario Hernandez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Emery Hernandez
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Terminated: 09/26/2023
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
Terminated: 09/26/2023
as successor in interest to Ciba Inc. 100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, August 23, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 08/23 2:29 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Peterson Adams, Darryl King, Dennis Malenfant, Elvis McGee-Jones, Karl Noble, Frank White, Ben Williams, Albert Razo, Ralph Spear, Francis Stengel, Monique Vandeberg, Dean Weaver, Jerry Wheat, Gregory Wika, Dale Younker, James Harrison, Paul Neal, Robert Neal, Charles B. Rooks, Van Barr, Craig Bennett, Gregory Ching, Randy Engle, Terry Foster, Nicholas Gunter, Timothy Kurtz, Chester McCurdy, Terry Millett, Charles Moon, Rocco Morra, Thomas Patten, Shep Surles, Matthew Thompson, Douglas Tweed, Christopher Wagner, Robert Harris, Sr., Garry Stolz, Brad Edward Wesselmann, Todd Garlick, Alex A. De Soto, Ropert Dipoli, Kenneth Kaufuld, Michael J Richter, Kevin Rooney, Belinda Rockafellow, Paul Dros, Martin Gamble, Timothy Grant, Patricia May, Edward McDaniel Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice As to Personal Injury Claims OnlyAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Lanciotti, Patrick) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 08/13 4:46 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Stephanie Clark, Adam Russell, Jr, Robert Spillers, Gene Grant, Duane Inglin, Anthony Korez, William Morgan, John Hardy, Nancy Baker, Gerald Phillips II, Steve Braselton, William Porche, Matt Deardorff, Robert Mitchell, Mary Valenzuela, Sam Hernandez, Valicitee Hernandez, Kalijah Vasquez, Veronica Vasquez, Amy Yacub, Daryl Carter, Dwayne Doram, Ronald Evans, Darlassa Garth, Rosa Jefferson, Jolyn Love, Lorenza Risley, Anne Sears, Aubrey Campbell, George McMullin, Sadie Graham, Theodore Martin, Tony Miller, Samuel Paparo, Gerald Ruby, Randall Westmoreland Without Prejudice, as to Listed PlaintiffsAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Mindicino, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Tuesday, September 26, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 09/26 3:49 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by John Hardy, James Harrison, Jeff Higdon, Emma Housand, Paul Neal, Robert Neal, Charles B. Rooks, Emery Hernandez, Mario Hernandez, Sam Hernandez, Valicitee Hernandez, Belinda Rockafellow, Kalijah Vasquez, Veronica Vasquez, Amy Yacub, Ramon Armendariz, Van Barr, Craig Barras, Craig Bennett, Jessica Brozda, Gregory Ching, Alisha Cottrell, Gregory Crawford, Clara Crawl-Martin, Edward Crosby, Paul Dros, Randy Engle, Michael Evans, Ronald Evans, Charles Flick, Terry Foster, Daniel Frazier, Darlassa Garth, Jerri Green, Nicholas Gunter, Thomas Hawkins, Sandra Hawley, Edward Hemphill, Sharon Jackson, Rosa Jefferson, Sandra Kieser, Adam Kinder, Timothy Kurtz, Nicholas Leon, Jolyn Love, Airton Mandarino, Angela Martin, Nelson Matias, Leonardo Matos, Henry Maye, Chester McCurdy, Darrel McInturss, James Phillip Mikles, Bertrand Miles, Terry Millett, James Minney, Charles Moon, Rebecca Moore, Rocco Morra, Carter Myers Jr, Jerry Nichols, Richard Parker Jr, Thomas Patten, Jack Pellerin, William Quillin, Robin Reed, Lorenza Risley, Glenn Rung, Anne Sears, Dennis Smith, Paul Spurlock, Lamica Strong, Shep Surles, Matthew Thompson, Douglas Tweed, Christopher Wagner, Elsa Meza, Pilar Rodriguez, Mary Valenzuela, Claude Bocage, Langston Carter, Donald Dokulil, Jeremy Douglas, Steven Eckles, Steven Feinberg, Martin Gamble, Timothy Grant, Stewart Harris, Betty Hayes-Mills, Wayne Hill, Lee Horowitz, Russell Houtz, Darryl Jennings, William Lovell, Richard Manauzzi, Patricia May, Jose Medrano, Tony Miller, Michael Murphy, Samuel Paparo, Cheri Patrick, Mark Patz, Henry Pearson, Daniel Pucci, Mario Ramos, Gerald Ruby, Eric Salazar, William Shaw, Walter Shultz, Deborah Theobald, Randall Westmoreland as to BASF Corporation and National Foam, Inc. Only Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Croner, Andrew) |
|
Friday, August 25, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Fri 08/25 3:52 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Southern (associated as of 8/23/2023), 1:23-cv-06786, Yacub et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-04227-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
5 | 5
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Fri 08/25 3:46 PM
Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:23-cv-06786. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Tuesday, August 22, 2023 | ||
4 | 4 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina. (Signed by MDL Panel on 8/22/2023) (vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/25/2023.] | |
MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina.(vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/25/2023.] | ||
Monday, August 07, 2023 | ||
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Judge John G. Koeltl is no longer assigned to the case. (vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/25/2023.] | ||
Thursday, August 03, 2023 | ||
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/25/2023.] | ||
Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/25/2023.] | ||
Case Designated ECF. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/25/2023.] | ||
Wednesday, August 02, 2023 | ||
3 | 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co)..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/25/2023.] | |
2 | 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/25/2023.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Westchester. Case Number: 62702/2023. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number BNYSDC-28094386).Document filed by 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co)..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/25/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial |