USA v. KHAN
New Jersey District Court | |
Case #: | 2:23-cr-00692 |
Case Filed: | Aug 30, 2023 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 31, 2023 3:43 AM EDT |
Defendant
TAUQIR KHAN (1)
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
USA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 08/31/2023 4:00 AM EDT |
Monday, April 11, 2022 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT as to ABID SYED (1), TARIQ DIN (2), TAMER MOHAMED (3), ABDUL RAUF (4), TAUQIR KHAN (5), NISIM DAVYDOV (6). (seb) [2:22-mj-12096-JBC] | |
Tuesday, April 12, 2022 | ||
Arrest of TAUQIR KHAN (seb) [2:22-mj-12096-JBC] | ||
31 | 31 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark:Initial Appearance as to TAUQIR KHAN held on 4/12/2022. All parties consent to proceed via zoom. Defendant advised of rights. Financial affidavit reviewed and executed. CJA appointed. Bail set $150,000 (unsecured). (Court Reporter/Recorder Zoom.) (seb) [2:22-mj-12096-JBC] | |
33 | 33 CJA 20 as to TAUQIR KHAN: Appointment of Attorney MICHAEL J. PAPPA for TAUQIR KHAN. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 4/12/2022. (seb) [2:22-mj-12096-JBC] | |
34 | 34 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to TAUQIR KHAN (5) $150,000 (unsecured) (Finance notified). Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 4/12/2022. (seb) [2:22-mj-12096-JBC] | |
35 | 35 Appearance Bond Entered as to TAUQIR KHAN in amount of $ 150,000 (unsecured). (seb) [2:22-mj-12096-JBC] | |
36 | 36 WAIVER of Preliminary Examination or Hearing by TAUQIR KHAN (executed on the record). (seb) [2:22-mj-12096-JBC] | |
37 | 37 BRADY ORDER as to TAUQIR KHAN. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 4/12/2022. (seb) [2:22-mj-12096-JBC] | |
Thursday, April 21, 2022 | ||
46 | 46 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to TAUQIR KHAN Time excluded from 4/21/2022 until 6/30/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 4/21/2022. (seb) [2:22-mj-12096-JBC] | |
Tuesday, June 28, 2022 | ||
61 | 61 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to TAUQIR KHAN Time excluded from 6/28/2022 until 9/1/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 6/28/2022. (seb) [2:22-mj-12096-JBC] | |
Thursday, September 01, 2022 | ||
69 | 69 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to TAUQIR KHAN Time excluded from 9/1/2022 until 10/3/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 9/1/2022. (seb) [2:22-mj-12096-JBC] | |
Monday, October 03, 2022 | ||
78 | 78 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to TAUQIR KHAN Time excluded from 10/3/2022 until 11/28/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 10/3/2022. (seb) [2:22-mj-12096-JBC] | |
Monday, October 17, 2022 | ||
81 | 81 Letter from Michael Critchley re Motion to Modify Conditions of Release re 80 MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release (Pre-Trial) (SUAREZ, ARMANDO) [2:22-mj-12096-JBC] | |
Wednesday, November 09, 2022 | ||
89 | 89 ORDER re Travel as to TAUQIR KHAN. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 11/9/2022. (seb) [2:22-mj-12096-JBC] | |
Monday, December 05, 2022 | ||
92 | 92 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to TAUQIR KHAN Time excluded from 12/5/2022 until 1/2/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 12/5/2022. (seb) [2:22-mj-12096-JBC] | |
Wednesday, January 04, 2023 | ||
96 | 96 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to TAUQIR KHAN Time excluded from 1/4/2023 until 2/3/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 1/4/2023. (seb) [2:22-mj-12096-JBC] | |
Friday, February 03, 2023 | ||
100 | 100 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to TAUQIR KHAN Time excluded from 2/3/2023 until 3/31/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 2/3/2023. (seb) [2:22-mj-12096-JBC] | |
Thursday, April 06, 2023 | ||
105 | 105 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to TAUQIR KHAN Time excluded from 4/6/2023 until 6/1/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 4/6/2023. (seb) [2:22-mj-12096-JBC] | |
Thursday, June 15, 2023 | ||
112 | 112 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to TAUQIR KHAN Time excluded from 6/8/2023 until 7/1/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 6/15/2023. (seb) [2:22-mj-12096-JBC] | |
Wednesday, July 12, 2023 | ||
Set/Reset Hearings as to TAUQIR KHAN: Plea Agreement Hearing set for 7/25/2023 at 11:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 1 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. (lr, ) [2:22-mj-12096-JBC] | ||
Thursday, July 20, 2023 | ||
Set/Reset Hearings as to TAUQIR KHAN: Plea Agreement Hearing set for 9/5/2023 at 01:30 PM in Newark - Courtroom 1 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. (lr, ) [2:22-mj-12096-JBC] | ||
Friday, July 21, 2023 | ||
Set/Reset Hearings as to TAUQIR KHAN: Plea Agreement Hearing set for 8/30/2023 at 11:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 1 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. (lr, ) [2:22-mj-12096-JBC] | ||
Wednesday, August 30, 2023 | ||
113 | 113 INFORMATION as to TAUQIR KHAN (1) count(s) 1. (lr, ) | |
114 | 114 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by TAUQIR KHAN (lr, ) | |
115 | 115 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Brian R. Martinotti: Plea Agreement Hearing as to TAUQIR KHAN held on 8/30/2023. Plea entered by TAUQIR KHAN (1) Guilty Count 1. Sentencing set for 1/11/2024 at 10:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 1 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. (Court Reporter/Recorder Nicole Sesta (973-963-5950). (lr, ) (Entered: 08/30/2023) | |
116 | 116 APPLICATION for permission to enter Plea of guilty as to TAUQIR KHAN. (lr, ) | |
117 | 117 PLEA AGREEMENT as to TAUQIR KHAN (lr, ) |