District Of Columbia District Court
Case #: 1:23-cr-00299
Case Filed:Aug 30, 2023
Last checked: Friday Sep 01, 2023 3:54 AM EDT
Defendant
MICHAEL PLUMMER (1)
Represented By
Kathryn D'Adamo Guevara
Office Of The Federal Defender For Dc
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Paul Vincent Courtney
Doj-Usao
contact info
Cameron Andrew Tepfer
U.S. Attorney'S Office For The District Of Columbia
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/01/2023 4:12 AM EDT
Friday, August 18, 2023
1 1 COMPLAINT as to MICHAEL PLUMMER (1). (zhsj) [1:23-mj-00217-GMH]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Statement of Facts
Monday, August 21, 2023
Arrest of MICHAEL PLUMMER (bb) [1:23-mj-00217-GMH]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION to Appoint Counsel by MICHAEL PLUMMER. (bb) [1:23-mj-00217-GMH]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION for Temporary Detention by USA as to MICHAEL PLUMMER. (bb) [1:23-mj-00217-GMH]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey: In Person Return on Arrest Warrant/ Initial Appearance as to MICHAEL PLUMMER held on 8/21/2023. Defendant was present in the courtroom. Oral Motion to Appoint Counsel by MICHAEL PLUMMER (1); heard and granted. FPD, Kathryn Guevara was appointed for MICHAEL PLUMMER (1). The Court advised the Government of its due process obligations under Rule 5(f). Oral Motion by the Government for Temporary Detention (3-day hold) as to MICHAEL PLUMMER (1); heard and granted. Detention Hearing set for 8/28/2023 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 4- In Person before Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui. Bond Status of Defendant: Committed/Commitment Issued; Court Reporter: FTR Gold; FTR Time Frame: CTRM 6 [4:23:52-4:30:56]; Defense Attorney: Kathryn Guevara; U.S. Attorney: Cameron Tepfer; Pretrial Officer: Natasha Spriggs. (bb) [1:23-mj-00217-GMH]
Related: [-]
MINUTE ORDER as to MICHAEL PLUMMER (1): As required by Rule 5(f), the United States is ordered to produce all exculpatory evidence to the defendant pursuant to Brady v. Maryland and its progeny. Not doing so in a timely manner may result in sanctions, including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges and contempt proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey on 8/21/2023. (bb) [1:23-mj-00217-GMH]
Related: [-]
7 7 Arrest Warrant, dated 8/18/2023, Returned Executed on 8/21/2023 as to MICHAEL PLUMMER. (bb) [1:23-mj-00217-GMH]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 24, 2023
5 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Paul Vincent Courtney appearing for USA. (Courtney, Paul) [1:23-mj-00217-GMH]
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Kathryn D'Adamo Guevara appearing for MICHAEL PLUMMER (Guevara, Kathryn) [1:23-mj-00217-GMH]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 25, 2023
8 8 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Detention Hearing by MICHAEL PLUMMER.(Guevara, Kathryn) [1:23-mj-00217-GMH]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Monday, August 28, 2023
9 9 ORDER granting8 Motion to Continue Detention Hearing as to MICHAEL PLUMMER. Detention Hearing continued to 8/30/2023 at 4:00 PM in Courtroom 4- In Person before Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey on 8/28/2023. (znjb) [1:23-mj-00217-GMH]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
10 10 13 pgs MEMORANDUM in Support of Pretrial Detention by USA as to MICHAEL PLUMMER(Courtney, Paul) [1:23-mj-00217-GMH]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Defendant's Motion to Reduce Sentence Under the Incarceration Reduction Amendment Act of 2016 (redacted version),
Att: 2 Exhibit B - February 25, 2020, Superior Court Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Reduce Sentence
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
11 11 MOTION for Release from Custody by MICHAEL PLUMMER.(Guevara, Kathryn) [1:23-mj-00217-GMH]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A - Release Plan,
Att: 2 28 pgs Exhibit Ex. B - Letters of Support,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. C - Letters from BOP staff,
Att: 4 Exhibit BOP Report
12 12 INDICTMENT as to MICHAEL PLUMMER (1) count(s) 1. (FORFEITURE ALLEGATION) (zstd)
Related: [-]