California Central District Court
Judge:Percy Anderson
Referred: Margo A Rocconi
Case #: 2:23-cv-07279
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Sep 01, 2023
Terminated:Jan 17, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 28, 2024 2:49 AM PST
Defendant
Cameron Roberson
Defendant
Aaron Twiggs
Plaintiff
Bankers Standard Insurance Company
Represented By
William C Reeves
Morales Fierro And Reeves
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, January 18, 2024
29 29 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Thu 01/18 2:58 PM
IN CHAMBERS ORDER TAKING MOTION UNDER ADVISEMENT by Judge Percy Anderson. A hearing on the MOTION for Default Judgment28 is scheduled for January 22, 2024, at 1:30 p.m. Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 7-15, the Court finds this matter appropriate for decision without oral argument. The hearing calendared for January 22, 2024, is vacated and the matter taken off calendar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kss)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
31 31 judgmentCV Judgment Mon 01/22 10:59 AM
JUDGMENT by Judge Percy Anderson. Pursuant to this Court's January 17, 2024 Minute Order granting Motion for Entry of Default Judgment filed by plaintiff Bankers Standard Insurance Company ("Plaintiff") against defendants Cameron Roberson ("Roberson") and Aaron Twiggs ("Twiggs") (collectively, "Defendants"), it is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED: 1. Plaintiff shall have judgment on its claims for declaratory relief and that Plaintiff has no duty to defend or indemnify Roberson for claims arising out of or related to Los Angeles Superior Court Case No. 23SMCV0063; and 2. Plaintiff shall recover from Defendants its costs of suit. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (aco)
Related: [-]
30 30 order Default Judgment Mon 01/22 8:49 AM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS-COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 7-15, the Court finds that this matter is appropriate for decision without oral argument. The hearing calendared for January 22, 2024, is vacated, and the matter taken off calendar. Accordingly, the Court grants Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment. The Court will enter a Judgment consistent with this Order. (See document for further details).; granting28 MOTION for Default Judgment. (aco)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
28 28 motion Default Judgment Thu 12/21 3:25 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendants Cameron Roberson and Aaron Twiggs filed by Plaintiff Bankers Standard Insurance Company. Motion set for hearing on 1/22/2024 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. Related [+]
Related: [-] eves, William
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
27 27 order Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form Thu 12/21 10:02 AM
ORDER IN RESPONSE TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant Roberson24 by Judge Percy Anderson. The document is stricken. Motion was filed without a hearing date. (rolm)
Related: [-]
26 26 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Thu 12/21 9:54 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Filed Document RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant Roberson24 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or untimely. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (rolm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
25 25 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Wed 12/20 4:14 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant Roberson24 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (aco)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Default Judgment Tue 12/19 8:39 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant Roberson filed by plaintiff Bankers Standard Insurance Company. Related [+]
Related: [-] eves, William
Monday, December 11, 2023
23 23 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Mon 12/11 11:49 AM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson. Plaintiff is hereby directed to file a motion for default judgment or, other appropriate dispositive motion on or before January 11, 2024. Failure to file said dispositive motion by January 11, 2024, will result in dismissal without further notice by the Court. (See document for further details). (aco)
Related: [-]
22 22 order Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form Mon 12/11 10:29 AM
DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Cameron Roberson (bm)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
21 21 motion Clerk to Enter Default Fri 12/08 4:29 PM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant Cameron Roberson filed by plaintiff Bankers Standard Insurance Company. Related [+]
Related: [-] eves, William
Monday, November 27, 2023
20 20 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 11/27 3:53 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Bankers Standard Insurance Company, upon Defendant Cameron Roberson served on 11/16/2023, answer due 12/7/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Cameron Roberson in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service Related [+]
Related: [-] eves, William
Monday, November 13, 2023
19 19 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Mon 11/13 3:57 PM
MINUTES OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Percy Anderson. The Court has reviewed plaintiff's response (Docket No. 17) to the Court's October 31, 2023 Order to Show Cause. (Docket No. 15). The Court discharges the Order to Show Cause. (aco)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2023
18 18 order Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form Mon 11/06 9:56 AM
DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Aaron Twiggs (bm)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 05, 2023
17 17 misc Response Sun 11/05 11:09 AM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Bankers Standard Insurance Companyto Order to Show Cause,15 Related [+]
Related: [-] eves, William
Saturday, November 04, 2023
16 16 motion Clerk to Enter Default Sat 11/04 9:19 AM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Aaron Twiggs filed by Plaintiff Bankers Standard Insurance Company. Related [+]
Related: [-] eves, William
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
15 15 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 10/31 3:04 PM
MINUTES OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Percy Anderson. Accordingly, the court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff to show cause in writing on or before November 7, 2023 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. (See document for further details). (aco)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2023
14 14 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Fri 10/27 3:54 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Bankers Standard Insurance Company, upon Defendant Aaron Twiggs served on 10/7/2023, answer due 10/30/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Aaron Twiggs in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service Related [+]
Related: [-] eves, William
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
13 13 othcmp Amended Complaint/Petition Tue 09/12 7:49 AM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Plaintiff Cameron Roberson, Aaron Twiggs amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 , filed by Plaintiff Bankers Standard Insurance Compan Related [+]
Related: [-] eves, William
Wednesday, September 06, 2023
12 12 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 09/07 10:04 AM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. Accordingly, the Court dismisses Plaintiff's Complaint for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. A district court may, and should, grant leave to amend when it appears that subject matter jurisdiction may exist, even though the complaint inadequately alleges jurisdiction. Therefore, the Court grants Plaintiff leave to amend the Complaint to attempt to adequately allege federal subject matter jurisdiction. Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, if any, shall be filed by no later than September 20, 2023. Failure to file a First Amended Complaint by that date may, without further warning, result in the dismissal of this action without prejudice. (See document for further details). (aco)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 09/07 9:56 AM
STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 09/06 7:47 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Bankers Standard Insurance Company, identifying INA Holdings Corporation. INA Financial Corporation. INA Corporation. Chubb INA Holdings Inc. Chubb Group Holdings Inc. Chubb Limited. Related [+]
Related: [-] eves, William
Tuesday, September 05, 2023
9 9 notice Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening Tue 09/05 4:35 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments No. 1 Civil Cover Sheet should not have been attached to Docket Entry No. 1. Each document should have been filed separately. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (lh)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening Tue 09/05 4:31 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (lh)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 09/05 4:28 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendants Cameron Roberson, Aaron Twiggs. (lh)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Tue 09/05 4:21 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
Related: [-]
5 5 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 09/05 4:20 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 09/05 4:20 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (lh)
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 03, 2023
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Sun 09/03 10:38 AM
Notice of Errata filed by Plaintiff Bankers Standard Insurance Company. Related [+]
Related: [-] eves, William
Friday, September 01, 2023
2 2 notice Summons Request Fri 09/01 4:48 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff Bankers Standard Insurance Company. Related [+]
Related: [-] eves, William
1 1 5 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 09/01 4:08 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-35973949 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Bankers Standard Insurance Company. (Attorney William C Reeves added to party Bankers Standard Insurance Company(pty:pla)) Related [+]
Related: [-] eves, William
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet