Alice Fries v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Sherilyn Peace Garnett |
Referred: | Patricia Donahue |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-07321 |
Nature of Suit | 380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Sep 05, 2023 |
Terminated: | Feb 22, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Los Angeles Superior Court, 23STCV18422 |
Last checked: Sunday Mar 03, 2024 1:42 AM PST |
Defendant
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DOES
|
|
Plaintiff
Alice Fries
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Thursday, February 22, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
order
Compel Arbitration
Mon 02/26 9:52 AM
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION19 by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. The Court GRANTS Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and DISMISSES Plaintiff's FAC without prejudice. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm) |
|
Friday, February 02, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Fri 02/02 4:10 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING THE MOTION (DKT.NO.19 ) UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett: The Court has considered the matter raised with respect to MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION and has concluded that pursuant to Local Rule 7.15, the matter can be decided without oral argument. The Motion noticed for hearing on February 7, 2024, has been taken under submission and off calendar. No appearance by counsel is necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pg) |
|
Thursday, February 01, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Lodging
Thu 02/01 2:41 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Miscellaneous Document22(Krishel, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order proposed order | ||
22 | 22
misc
Miscellaneous Document
Thu 02/01 2:25 PM
Request to appear via zoom video conference filed by Plaintiff Alice Fries re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration19 , Reply (Motion related)21 , Objection/Opposition (Motion related)20 (Krishel, Daniel) |
|
Wednesday, January 24, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Wed 01/24 10:08 AM
REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration19 filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Farrell, Elizabeth) |
|
Wednesday, January 17, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Wed 01/17 9:21 AM
Plaintiff Alice Fries Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration19 filed by Plaintiff Alice Fries.(Krishel, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Daniel Krishel | ||
Wednesday, December 13, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Compel Arbitration
Wed 12/13 10:33 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Motion set for hearing on 2/7/2024 at 01:30 PM before Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. (Farrell, Elizabeth) |
|
Att: 1 99 pgs Declaration of Tiffany Ward, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, December 07, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
order
Extending Answer Due Deadline
Fri 12/08 11:27 AM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT17 by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. shall respond to the First Amended Complaint on or before December 12, 2023. (iv) |
|
Tuesday, December 05, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Tue 12/05 2:36 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. answer now due 12/12/2023, re Amended Complaint/Petition15 filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Farrell, Elizabeth) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, November 28, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Tue 11/28 11:50 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Sherilyn Peace Garnett. In light of the First Amended Complaint (Dkt. No. 15), Defendants Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. No. 12) is DENIED as MOOT, and the hearing scheduled for January 24, 2024, is hereby VACATED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pg) |
|
Wednesday, November 22, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
18
pgs
othcmp
Amended Complaint/Petition
Wed 11/22 9:41 AM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEFENDANT Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Plaintiff Alice Fries(Krishel, Daniel) |
|
Tuesday, November 14, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
trial
Jury Demand
Tue 11/14 12:04 PM
DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiff Alice Fries.. (Krishel, Daniel) |
|
Monday, November 06, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
misc
For Judicial Notice
Mon 11/06 3:51 PM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 12 filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Farrell, Elizabeth) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Dismiss Case
Mon 11/06 3:47 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Motion set for hearing on 1/24/2024 at 01:30 PM before Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. (Farrell, Elizabeth) |
|
Att: 1 26 pgs Memorandum of Points and Authorities iso Motion to Dismiss, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, October 10, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
order
Extending Answer Due Deadline
Wed 10/11 12:39 PM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK. N.A. TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT10 by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. shall respond to the complaint on or before November 6, 2023. (iv) |
|
Thursday, October 05, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
stip
Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days)
Thu 10/05 12:57 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to November 6, 2023 re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Farrell, Elizabeth) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, September 12, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Tue 09/12 10:19 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. answer now due 10/5/2023, re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Farrell, Elizabeth) |
|
Monday, September 11, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Mon 09/11 1:49 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 served on September 5, 2023. (Farrell, Elizabeth) |
|
Friday, September 08, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Fri 09/08 4:35 PM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. (pg) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Fri 09/08 4:12 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) |
|
5 | 5
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Fri 09/08 4:11 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 09/08 4:10 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (jtil) |
|
Tuesday, September 05, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 09/05 12:45 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., (Farrell, Elizabeth) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Tue 09/05 12:41 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Farrell, Elizabeth) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 09/05 12:38 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 23STCV18422 Receipt No: ACACDC-35979463 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attorney Elizabeth Courtney Farrell added to party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(pty:dft))(Farrell, Elizabeth) |
|
Att: 1 39 pgs Exhibit "1" Complaint | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Fri 09/08 3:20 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Alice Fries in Los Angeles Superior Court on 8/3/2023, attached as Exhibit 1. (jtil) |