Town of Clinton v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-04274 |
Nature of Suit | 245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Aug 25, 2023 |
Case in other court: | New Jersey, 3:23-cv-04067 |
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 21, 2024 4:10 AM EST |
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
The Ansul Company
141 Junny Road
Angier, NC 27501 |
|
Defendant
Raytheon Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Defendant
John Doe Defendants 1-49
|
|
Defendant
E. I. Du Pont De Nemours & Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corp
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Protection Company
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Angus Fire
|
|
Defendant
AGC Inc
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Town Of Clinton
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 07/17 3:06 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by The 3M Company, 3M Company, The, 3M Company, 3M Company, 3M Company, 3M Company, 3M Company, 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co.). Associated Cases)Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Bulger, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Monday, September 11, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued
Mon 09/11 4:41 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
Wednesday, September 06, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Wed 09/06 11:49 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed) (associated as of 8/25/2023), 3:23-cv-04067, Town of Clinton v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-04274-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
6 | 6
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Wed 09/06 11:42 AM
Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 3:23-cv-04067. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Friday, August 25, 2023 | ||
5 | 5 Order of MDL Panel (CTO-149) transferring case to the District of South Carolina. (jjc, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/6/2023.] | |
Tuesday, August 08, 2023 | ||
4 | 4 ORDER that the time for Defendant's to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint filed by Township of Clinton on 6/7/2023, be and hereby is extended through and including the 28th day after a decision is made to remand this matter to State Court or to transfer this matter to the pleading Multi-district litigation, whichever is earlier. If this matter is neither remanded nor transferred to the pending MDL, the parties are to provide a joint status report no later than 10/1/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 8/8/2023. (kht) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/6/2023.] | |
Thursday, August 03, 2023 | ||
3 | 3 Letter re1 Notice of Removal,.(HERTEN, THOMAS) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/6/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Complaint | ||
Tuesday, August 01, 2023 | ||
Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh no longer assigned to case. (jjc, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/6/2023.] | ||
Monday, July 31, 2023 | ||
2 | 2 Clerk's Letter: Attorney William Powers is not admitted to the Federal Bar of New Jersey. Notice has been mailed to the attorney's address: 3102 Oak Lawn Avenue, Suite 1100 Dallas, TX 75219. (jal, ) Modified on 8/3/2023 (jal, ). [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/6/2023.] | |
Judge Zahid N. Quraishi and Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh added. (jal, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/6/2023.] | ||
Friday, July 28, 2023 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS, LP, CHEMGUARD from Superior Court of Hunterdon County, case number HNT-L-000219-23. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14491426), filed by TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS, LP, CHEMGUARD.(HERTEN, THOMAS) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/6/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service |