Martin v. Hutson
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Sarah S Vance |
Referred: | Karen Wells Roby |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-05113 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination) |
Case Filed: | Sep 06, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jun 25, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 04, 2024 2:53 AM CST |
Defendant
Susan Hutson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jerry Martin, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/15/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
appeal
USCA Case Number
Tue 07/23 2:39 PM
USCA Case Number 24-30451 appealed to USCA, Fifth Circuit for19 Notice of Appeal filed by Jerry Martin, Jr. (ko) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Mon 07/15 11:42 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Jerry Martin, Jr as to18 Judgment. (Filing fee $ 605, receipt number ALAEDC-10611012.) (Vogeltanz, Kevin) |
|
Tuesday, June 25, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
order
Judgment
Tue 06/25 3:18 PM
JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED ADJUDGED AND DECREED that plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Sarah S Vance on 6/25/2024.(cs) |
|
Friday, June 14, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
19
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim
Fri 06/14 2:05 PM
ORDER AND REASONS:7 Hutson's motion to dismiss for Failure to State a Claim is GRANTED. Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Sarah S Vance on 6/14/2024. (cs) |
|
Thursday, May 09, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order Transferring Case
Thu 05/09 11:20 AM
ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Sarah S Vance and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. Judge Brandon S. Long, Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Brandon S. Long on 05/08/2024.(js)(NEF: Sec R & Mag 4) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Related Case(s)
Wed 04/17 3:10 PM
Notice of Related Case(s) Joint Notice of Collateral Proceedings by All Defendants. (Roberts, MaryJo) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Wed 04/10 2:48 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Susan Hutson re7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim re Defendant's Rule 12(b)(6) . (Roberts, MaryJo) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
respm
Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Tue 03/26 7:53 PM
RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Jerry Martin, Jr re7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim re Defendant's Rule 12(b)(6) . (Vogeltanz, Kevin) |
|
Friday, March 15, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Continue
Fri 03/15 10:01 AM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the11 motion of Plaintiff Jerry Martin, Jr. to continue the submission date of Defendant Susan Hutson's motion to dismiss is GRANTED. Plaintiff Jerry Martin, Jr. must file his response to Defendant's motion by March 26, 2024. Defendant Susan Hutson's reply to Plaintiff's response is due no later than April 10, 2024. Signed by Judge Brandon S. Long on 03/14/2024. (js) |
|
Tuesday, March 12, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Continue
Tue 03/12 9:56 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Submission Date of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Jerry Martin, Jr.(Vogeltanz, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, March 01, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
minutes
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Fri 03/01 9:52 AM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the9 motion of Plaintiff Jerry Martin, Jr. to continue the submission date of Defendant Susan Hutson's motion to dismiss is GRANTED. The submission date of Defendant Susan Hutson's motion to dismiss is continued to March 20, 2024. Plaintiff Jerry Martin, Jr. must file his response to Defendant's motion by March 12, 2024. Defendant Susan Hutson's reply to Plaintiff's response is due no later than March 27, 2024. Signed by Judge Brandon S. Long on 02/29/2024.(js) |
|
Tuesday, February 27, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Continue
Tue 02/27 1:36 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Submission Date of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Jerry Martin, Jr.(Vogeltanz, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, February 15, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Thu 02/15 9:35 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim re Defendant's Rule 12(b)(6). Filing attorney selected incorrect submission date. Correct date is 3/6/2024. Clerk took corrective action. (js) |
|
Wednesday, February 14, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim/FRCP12(b)(6)
Wed 02/14 1:46 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim re Defendant's Rule 12(b)(6) by Susan Hutson. Motion(s) will be submitted on 2/29/2024.(Roberts, MaryJo) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Submission | ||
Wednesday, January 24, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 01/24 8:51 AM
ORDER granting5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint, as to Susan Hutson answer due 2/14/2024. Signed by Judge Brandon S. Long on 1/23/2024. (blg) |
|
Friday, January 12, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 01/12 11:14 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint, or Otherwise Plead by Susan Hutson.Attorney MaryJo L. Roberts added to party Susan Hutson(pty:dft).(Roberts, MaryJo) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, December 28, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
28
pgs
order
Order Transferring Case
Thu 12/28 2:18 PM
ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Brandon S. Long. Judge Barry W Ashe no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/27/2023.(lag) |
|
Monday, November 20, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 11/20 4:39 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Susan Hutson on 11/19/2023, answer due 1/18/2024. (Vogeltanz, Kevin) |
|
Thursday, September 07, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Thu 09/07 8:08 AM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (cc) |
|
Wednesday, September 06, 2023 | ||
1 | 1
19
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 09/06 11:36 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against Jerry Martin, Jr (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-10136137) filed by Jerry Martin, Jr.Attorney Kevin S. Vogeltanz added to party Jerry Martin, Jr(pty:pla).(Vogeltanz, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |