Georgia Middle District Court
Case #: 1:23-cr-00021
Case Filed:Aug 08, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Sep 07, 2023 3:23 AM EDT
Defendant
ROGER NORTON FAIRBANK (3)
Represented By
FEDERAL DEFENDERS MIDDLE DISTRICT OF GEORGIA INC
contact info
MICHAEL N SIMPKINS
Federal Defenders Of The Md Ga
contact info
Defendant
LUCIUS LAMAR WILLIAMS (1)
Represented By
NATHANIEL TYRONE HAUGABROOK
contact info
ROBERT ROBINSON MCLENDON, IV
contact info
Defendant
WILLIE GEORGE WILLIAMS (2)
Represented By
R LARS ANDERSON
contact info
Plaintiff
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By
MATTHEW REDAVID, JR
contact info

GPO Dec 20 2024
ORDER SETTING HEARING as to LUCIUS LAMAR WILLIAMS, WILLIE GEORGE WILLIAMS Jury Trial set for 4/21/2025 09:00 AM in Albany before CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER. NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE as to LUCIUS LAMAR WILLIAMS, WILLIE GEORGE WILLIAMS. Pretrial Conference set for 4/4/2025 at 10:00 AM in Albany before CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 12/20/2024. (Attachments: # (1) Required Form Exhibit List) (mab)ORDER SETTING HEARING as to LUCIUS LAMAR WILLIAMS, WILLIE GEORGE WILLIAMS Jury Trial set for 4/21/2025 09:00 AM in Albany before CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER. NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE as to LUCIUS LAMAR WILLIAMS, WILLIE GEORGE WILLIAMS. Pretrial Conference set for 4/4/2025 at 10:00 AM in Albany before CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 12/20/2024. (Attachments: # (1) Required Form Exhibit List) (mab)
GPO Apr 25 2025
ORDER SETTING HEARING as to LUCIUS LAMAR WILLIAMS Jury Trial set for 11/3/2025 09:00 AM in Albany before CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER. NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE as to LUCIUS LAMAR WILLIAMS. Pretrial Conference set for 9/24/2025 at 10:00 AM in Albany before CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 04/25/2025. (Attachments: # (1) Required Form Exhibit List) (mab)

Docket last updated: 04/22/2025 6:05 PM EDT
Tuesday, August 08, 2023
1 1 6 pgs SEALED INDICTMENT as to LUCIUS LAMAR WILLIAMS (1) count(s) 1, 2-3, 4, 6-7, 8, 9, 10, 11, WILLIE GEORGE WILLIAMS (2) count(s) 5, ROGER NORTON FAIRBANK (3) count(s) 8. (mdm)
Related: [-]