Hamilton v. DeJoy
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | David A Ezra |
Case #: | 1:23-cv-01045 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Sep 01, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jul 16, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 28, 2024 6:58 AM CST |
Defendant
Louis DeJoy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chelsea A. Hamilton
13625 Arbor Hill Cv
Manor, TX 78653 |
Docket last updated: 09/15/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
service
Certificate of Service
Thu 08/01 8:51 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chelsea A. Hamilton28 Notice of Appeal.(dm) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Tue 07/23 3:50 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Chelsea A. Hamilton. Filing fee $ 605, receipt number 1820. Per 5th Circuit rules, the appellant has 14 days, from the filing of the Notice of Appeal, to order the transcript. To order a transcript, the appellant should fill out a[LINK:(Transcript Order)] and follow the instructions set out on the form. This form is available in the Clerk's Office or by clicking the hyperlink above. (pg) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
23
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Wed 07/17 11:27 AM
ORDER GRANTING19 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (dm) |
|
Thursday, December 07, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Thu 12/07 10:52 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David A. Ezra for all proceedings. Judge Docket II - Austin no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (bot2) |
|
Wednesday, December 06, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
respm
Response to Motion
Wed 12/06 9:38 AM
RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Louis DeJoy, re24 MOTION to Strike23 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Plaintiff Chelsea A. Hamilton (Goode, David) |
|
Tuesday, December 05, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Strike
Wed 12/06 9:01 AM
MOTION to Strike23 Reply to Response to Motion by Chelsea A. Hamilton. (dm) |
|
Monday, December 04, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Mon 12/04 4:23 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Louis DeJoy, re19 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Louis DeJoy (Goode, David) |
|
22 | 22
misc
Certified Mail Receipt
Mon 12/04 3:50 PM
Certified Mail Receipt by Chelsea A. Hamilton. (dm) |
|
Friday, December 01, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Filing
Fri 12/01 4:45 PM
NOTICE of Filing; Copy of Certified Mail Receipt by Chelsea A. Hamilton (cc3) |
|
Monday, November 27, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Wed 11/29 8:34 AM
Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Chelsea A. Hamilton, re19 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Louis DeJoy (dm) |
|
Tuesday, November 21, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Dismiss
Tue 11/21 8:45 AM
MOTION to Dismiss by Louis DeJoy. (Goode, David) |
|
Wednesday, November 15, 2023 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 11/15 12:06 PM
Text Order DENYING17 Motion entered by Judge Robert Pitman. In light of docket entry 14, the Court discerns no need for the return receipt at issue at this time. Accordingly, this motion is DENIED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tclc) |
||
Thursday, November 02, 2023 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
Thu 11/02 11:00 AM
Text Order GRANTING15 Motion to Substitute Attorney entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that Lianne Noble is withdrawn as counsel of record for Defendant. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that David B. Goode is substituted as counsel of record for Defendant. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tclc) |
||
Tuesday, October 31, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Certified Mail Receipt
Wed 11/01 10:07 AM
Acknowledgment of Receipt of Service. (dm) |
|
Friday, October 27, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 10/30 5:01 PM
MOTION for Release Return Receipt by Chelsea A. Hamilton. (dm) |
|
Wednesday, October 25, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Proposed Order
Wed 10/25 11:05 AM
Proposed Order to15 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Louis DeJoy. (Goode, David) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Substitute Attorney
Wed 10/25 10:02 AM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Louis DeJoy. (Goode, David) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 10/25 12:22 PM
Text Order MOOTING9 Motion entered by Judge Robert Pitman. In light of docket entry 14, indicating that service has been effectuated, this motion is MOOT. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tclc) |
||
Tuesday, October 24, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Tue 10/24 2:25 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chelsea A. Hamilton. Louis DeJoy served on 10/19/2023, answer due 12/18/2023. (dm) |
|
Monday, October 16, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Tue 10/17 12:09 PM
Summons Reissued as to Louis DeJoy, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (dm) |
|
12 | 12
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 10/17 12:04 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Louis DeJoy amending1 Complaint, filed by Chelsea A. Hamilton.(dm) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Wednesday, October 11, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Certified Mail Receipt
Thu 10/12 10:50 AM
Certified Mail Receipt of6 Summons Issued as to USA. (dm) |
|
Thursday, September 28, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Supplement to
Thu 09/28 3:08 PM
SUPPLEMENT to9 MOTION Release Documents by Chelsea A. Hamilton. (pg) |
|
Tuesday, September 26, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 09/26 3:14 PM
MOTION Release Documents by Chelsea A. Hamilton. (pg) |
|
Monday, September 25, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Filing
Tue 09/26 11:54 AM
NOTICE of Filing, Proof of Service by Chelsea A. Hamilton. (dm) |
|
Wednesday, September 20, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Supplement to
Thu 09/21 4:50 PM
SUPPLEMENT to1 Complaint, by Chelsea A. Hamilton. (dm) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Thu 09/21 4:49 PM
Summons Issued as to Louis DeJoy, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (dm) |
|
Tuesday, September 19, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice
Tue 09/19 1:12 PM
NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE SERVICE OF PROCESS by Louis DeJoy (Noble-AUSA, Liane) |
|
Friday, September 15, 2023 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
Fri 09/15 5:13 PM
Text Order DENYING2 Motion to Appoint Counsel entered by Judge Robert Pitman. The Court has applied the factors delineated in Ulmer v. Chancellor, 691 F.2d 209, 212 (5th Cir. 1982) to the case at hand. Plaintiff has not, as of this date, established to this Court's satisfaction that the issues are too complex, that complainant is incapable of bringing them, or that appointed counsel is necessary to present meritorious issues to the Court. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tclc) |
||
Thursday, September 14, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Fri 09/15 3:28 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chelsea A. Hamilton. Louis DeJoy served on 9/11/2023, answer due 11/13/2023. (dm) |
|
Friday, September 01, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Thu 09/07 2:29 PM
Summons Issued as to Louis DeJoy. (pg) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Appoint Counsel
Thu 09/07 2:24 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Chelsea A. Hamilton. (pg) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 09/07 2:22 PM
COMPLAINT *** ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 1173), filed by Chelsea A. Hamilton. *** Video Exhibits located in Clerks Office archive, not available on CM/ECF. (pg) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Request, | ||
Att: 3 Filing Fee, | ||
Att: 4 Motion for Appoint of Counsel | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 09/07 2:25 PM
Case assigned to Judge Docket II - Austin. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (pg) |
||
misc
To be Referred to AU Mag Judge
Thu 09/07 2:26 PM
If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane (pg) |